Global Hemp, Inc. v. Industrial Hemp Solutions, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Global Hemp, Inc.
Defendant: Marco Vinicio Villatoro, Vini Villatoro, Jeremy Luciano and Industrial Hemp Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv00012
Filed: January 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Thomas B Russell
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 3/25/2020. IT IS ORDERED:1. Counsel who will represent the parties at trial and who have full authority to enter stipulations, to make admissions, and to bind the parties with respect to dates agreed upon or ordered shall be available for a TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ON APRIL 6, 2020 at 9:30 AM CENTRAL TIME. Counsel must call 1-877-848-7030 then give the Access Code 2523122 and #, then when prompted press # again to join the call.2. Pursuant to Rule 26(f) Fed.R.Civ.P. counsel shall discuss and establish a discovery plan which shall be submitted to the Court at the scheduling conference either orally during the telephonic conference or in writing. Counsel are directed to make the mandatory disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(l) Fed.R.Civ.P. by said conference date.3. At the Rule 16 telephonic scheduling conference dates will be fixed for the following, as appropriate to the case: a) Joinder of additional parties and amendments to pleadings. b) Disclosure of deadlines for experts. c) Discovery scope, limits and completion. d) Filing of dispositive motions. e) Exchange of exhibits and final witness lists. f) Conferences before trial, including a final pretrial conference. g) Trial. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel (KPH)
February 20, 2020 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Industrial Hemp Solutions, LLC, Jeremy Luciano, Marco Vinicio Villatoro. (Morgan, Jessica)
February 14, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Industrial Hemp Solutions, LLC, Jeremy Luciano, Marco Vinicio Villatoro. (Sigler, James)
February 7, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by James A. Sigler on behalf of Industrial Hemp Solutions, LLC, Jeremy Luciano, Marco Vinicio Villatoro (Sigler, James)
January 27, 2020 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENT re #1 Complaint, by Global Hemp, Inc.. (Phillips, Jonathan)
January 27, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing re: Patent or Trademark re #1 Complaint. (MNM)
January 27, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Industrial Hemp Solutions, LLC, Jeremy Luciano, and Marco Vinicio Villatoro. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (MNM)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 1/25/2020. Granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jonathan LA Phillips. cc: Counsel(KJA)
January 24, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Jonathan LA Phillips to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $125, receipt number P33004051, filed by Plaintiff Global Hemp, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (MNM)
January 24, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Global Hemp, Inc. (MNM)
January 24, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell. (MNM)
January 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Industrial Hemp Solutions, LLC, Jeremy Luciano, and Marco Vinicio Villatoro. Filing fee $400, receipt number P33004051, filed by Global Hemp, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Summons Tendered) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Global Hemp, Inc. v. Industrial Hemp Solutions, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marco Vinicio Villatoro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vini Villatoro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Luciano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Industrial Hemp Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Global Hemp, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan LA Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?