United States of America v. Doyle et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: LVNV Funding, LLC, Any Unknown Spouse of Anna L. Doyle, Jerry David Stoltz, Anna L. Doyle, Norman Tharp, Ron Stoltz, Cathy Murphy, Any Unknown Heirs or Spouses of Heirs of Ronald L. Stoltz, Any Unknown Heirs or Spouses of Heirs of Estelle J. Stoltz, Donna Copeland and Larry Stoltz
Not Classified By Court: Warning Order Attorney
Case Number: 5:2020cv00028
Filed: February 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Thomas B Russell
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 3/20/2020. Granting #7 Warning Order. Attorney Edward K. Box for Warning Order Attorney appointed. cc: Counsel(KJA)
March 12, 2020 Filing 8 DISCLAIMER of Interest of NORMAN THARP by United States of America. (Campbell, William)
March 5, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Warning Order and Attorney Appointment for 1) Ron Stoltz, as heir of Ronald L. Stoltz and Estelle J. Stoltz; 2) Larry Stoltz, as heir of Ronald L. Stoltz and Estelle J. Stoltz; 3) Jerry David Stoltz, as heir of Ronald L. Stoltz and Estelle J. Stoltz; 4) Donna Copeland, as heir of Ronald L. Stoltz and Estelle J. Stoltz; 5) Cathy Murphy, as heir of Ronald L. Stoltz and Estelle J. Stoltz; 6) Any Unknown Spouse of Anna L. Doyle; 7) Any Unknown Heirs or Spouses of Heirs of Ronald L. Stoltz; and 8) Any Unknown Heirs and Spouses of Heirs of Estelle J. Stoltz by Plaintiff United States of America (Attachments: #1 Affidavit for Issuance, #2 Proposed Order) (Campbell, William)
February 27, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Anna L. Doyle served on 2/21/2020, answer due 3/13/2020. (Campbell, William)
February 18, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. LVNV Funding, LLC served on 2/10/2020, answer due 3/2/2020. (Campbell, William)
February 13, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Norman Tharp served on 2/10/2020, answer due 3/2/2020. (Campbell, William)
February 7, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Anna L. Doyle, LVNV Funding, LLC, Norman Tharp. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Norman Tharp, #2 Summons as to LVNV, #3 Summons as to LVNV) (DJT)
February 6, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell. (DJT)
February 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE against Any Unknown Heirs or Spouses of Heirs of Estelle J. Stoltz, Any Unknown Heirs or Spouses of Heirs of Ronald L. Stoltz, Any Unknown Spouse of Anna L. Doyle, Donna Copeland, Anna L. Doyle, LVNV Funding, LLC, Cathy Murphy, Jerry David Stoltz, Larry Stoltz, Ron Stoltz, Norman Tharp, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-First Promissory Note, #3 Exhibit B-Second Promissory Note, #4 Exhibit C-Real Estate Mortgage, #5 Exhibit D-Subsidy Repayment Agreement, #6 Exhibit E-Real Estate Mortgage, #7 Exhibit F-Reservation of Lien, #8 Exhibit G-Judment Lien) (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Doyle et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LVNV Funding, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Any Unknown Spouse of Anna L. Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry David Stoltz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anna L. Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norman Tharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Stoltz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cathy Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Any Unknown Heirs or Spouses of Heirs of Ronald L. Stoltz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Any Unknown Heirs or Spouses of Heirs of Estelle J. Stoltz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Stoltz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: William F. Campbell
Represented By: Katherine A. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Warning Order Attorney
Represented By: Edward K. Box
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?