United States of America v. Conner
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Dana G. Conner
Case Number: 5:2020cv00030
Filed: February 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Thomas B Russell
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Dana G. Conner served on 3/13/2020, answer due 4/3/2020. (Campbell, William)
February 10, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Dana G. Conner. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (DJT)
February 7, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell. (DJT)
February 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE against Dana G. Conner, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-1995 Note, #3 Exhibit B-1995 Mortgage, #4 Exhibit C-Subsidy Repayment Agreement, #5 Exhibit D-Assumption Agreement, #6 Exhibit E-1998 Mortgage, #7 Exhibit F-Reamortization Agreement, #8 Exhibit G-Notice of Acceleration) (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Conner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana G. Conner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: William F. Campbell
Represented By: Katherine A. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?