United States of America v. Jones
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Mitchell S. Jones
Case Number: 5:2020cv00116
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Thomas B Russell
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jesse E. Wright on behalf of Mitchell S. Jones (Wright, Jesse)
July 30, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, AND NOTICE OF DISCHARGE IN BANKRUPTCY by Mitchell S. Jones. (Wright, Jesse)
July 29, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Mitchell S. Jones served on 7/21/2020, answer due 8/11/2020. (Campbell, William)
July 15, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Mitchell S. Jones. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (MNM)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell. (MNM)
July 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mitchell S. Jones, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Promissory Note, #2 Exhibit B - Real Estate Mortgage, #3 Exhibit C - Subsidy Repayment Agreement, #4 Cover Sheet, #5 Summons Tendered) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchell S. Jones
Represented By: Jesse E. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: William F. Campbell
Represented By: Katherine A. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?