Tomelleri v. Davenport Tackle Company, LLC
Plaintiff: Joseph R. Tomelleri
Defendant: Davenport Tackle Company, LLC doing business as Fast Eddie's Bait & Tackle
Case Number: 5:2020cv00131
Filed: August 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Thomas B Russell
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 9/3/2020 granting #6 Motion for Oliver P. Maguire to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel; attorney Maguire - regular mail with registration packet(MNM)
August 31, 2020 Response to #5 Notice of Deficiency. Verified attorney Oliver P. Maguire is in good standing with all state bars listed in his motion. (MNM)
August 28, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Oliver P. Maguire to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3172334. by Plaintiff Joseph R. Tomelleri (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Statement of Applicant, #3 Proposed Order) (Sparks, Robert)
August 17, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Oliver P. Maguire re #1 Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 9/4/2020. (KJA)
August 7, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Davenport Tackle Company, LLC. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (MNM)
August 6, 2020 Filing 3 REPORT ON THE FILING OR DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION OR APPEAL REGARDING A COPYRIGHT by Joseph R. Tomelleri re #1 Complaint. cc: Register of Copyrights (MNM)
August 6, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell. (MNM)
August 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Davenport Tackle Company, LLC, filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-3156396, filed by Joseph R. Tomelleri. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Tendered) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tomelleri v. Davenport Tackle Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph R. Tomelleri
Represented By: Oliver P. Maguire
Represented By: Amy L. Hunt
Represented By: Robert R. Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davenport Tackle Company, LLC doing business as Fast Eddie's Bait & Tackle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?