Noffsinger v. Pennyroyal Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jessica E. Noffsinger
Defendant: Pennyroyal Services, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2020cv00143
Filed: August 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Thomas B Russell
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2020 Filing 9 RULE 26 INITIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Jessica E. Noffsinger. (Korus, Tyler)
October 20, 2020 Filing 8 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Pennyroyal Services, Inc.. (Johnson, Craig)
October 19, 2020 Filing 7 RULE 26 INITIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Pennyroyal Services, Inc.. (Johnson, Craig)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 10/14/2020. IT IS ORDERED:1. Counsel shall be available for a TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ON OCTOBER 20, 2020 at 11:15 AM CENTRAL TIME. The Court will place the call to counsel.2. Pursuant to Rule 26(f) Fed.R.Civ.P. counsel shall discuss and establish a discovery plan which shall be submitted to the Court at the scheduling conference either orally during the telephonic conference or in writing. Counsel are directed to make the mandatory disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(l) Fed.R.Civ.P. by said conference date.3. At the Rule 16 telephonic scheduling conference dates will be fixed for the following, as appropriate to the case: a) Joinder of additional parties and amendments to pleadings. b) Disclosure of deadlines for experts. c) Discovery scope, limits and completion. d) Filing of dispositive motions. e) Exchange of exhibits and final witness lists. f) Conferences before trial, including a final pretrial conference. g) Trial. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc:counsel (KPH)
September 15, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pennyroyal Services, Inc.. (Johnson, Craig)
September 15, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Pennyroyal Services, Inc.. (Johnson, Craig)
August 26, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Pennyroyal Services, Inc. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (MNM)
August 26, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell. (MNM)
August 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Pennyroyal Services, Inc. Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-3169331, filed by Jessica E. Noffsinger. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Tendered) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Noffsinger v. Pennyroyal Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica E. Noffsinger
Represented By: Tyler Z. Korus
Represented By: Robert L. Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pennyroyal Services, Inc.
Represented By: Chad M. Zimlich
Represented By: Craig L. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?