Diamond v. Marquette Transportation Company, LLC
Plaintiff: Casey Diamond
Defendant: Marquette Transportation Company, LLC
Case Number: 5:2021cv00001
Filed: January 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Thomas B Russell
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2021 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Marquette Transportation Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent Marquette Transportation Holdings, Inc. for Marquette Transportation Company, LLC. by Marquette Transportation Company, LLC. (Miller, Bobby)
February 25, 2021 Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Marquette Transportation Company, LLC. (Miller, Bobby)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 1/25/2021. Granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Trent Shelton. cc: Counsel(KJA)
January 25, 2021 Response to #10 Notice of Deficiency. (MNM)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 1/22/2021. Granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Samantha M.B. Demuren. cc: Counsel(KJA)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 1/22/2021. Granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice John Benjamin Bireley. cc: Counsel(KJA)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 1/22/2021. Granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Noah M. Wexler. cc: Counsel(KJA)
January 22, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE Motion Pro Hac Vice by Casey Diamond re #6 MOTION for Trent Shelton to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3268170. (Attachments: #1 Motion Pro Hac Vice, #2 Registration Form) (Edwards, Mark)
January 22, 2021 Response to #12 Notice of Deficiency, #13 Notice of Deficiency, #11 Notice of Deficiency. (MNM)
January 21, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE Motion Pro Hac Vice by Casey Diamond re #7 MOTION for Samantha Demuren to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3268196. (Attachments: #1 Motion Pro Hac Vice, #2 Registration Form) (Edwards, Mark)
January 21, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE Motion Pro Hac Vice by Casey Diamond re #8 MOTION for Noah Wexler to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3268199. (Attachments: #1 Motion Pro Hac Vice, #2 Registration form) (Edwards, Mark)
January 21, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE by Casey Diamond re #9 MOTION for John Bireley to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3268205. (Attachments: #1 Motion Pro Hac Vice, #2 Registration Form) (Edwards, Mark)
January 20, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Deficiency re #9 Motion for John Bireley to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Reason for Deficiency: Method of ECF Training. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 1/27/2021. (MNM)
January 20, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Deficiency re #8 Motion for Noah Wexler to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Reason for Deficiency: Method of ECF Training. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 1/27/2021. (MNM)
January 20, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Deficiency re #7 Motion for Samantha Demuren to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Reason for Deficiency: Method of ECF Training. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 1/27/2021. (MNM)
January 20, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Deficiency re #6 Motion for Trent Shelton to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Reason for Deficiency: Method of ECF Training. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 1/27/2021. (MNM)
January 20, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for John Bireley to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3268205. by Plaintiff Casey Diamond (Attachments: #1 Good Standing, #2 Registration Form) (Edwards, Mark) (Main Document 9 replaced on 1/20/2021) (MNM). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/20/2021: #3 Proposed Order) (MNM).
January 20, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Noah Wexler to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3268199. by Plaintiff Casey Diamond (Attachments: #1 Good Standing, #2 Registration Form) (Edwards, Mark) (Main Document 8 replaced on 1/20/2021) (MNM). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/20/2021: #3 Proposed Order) (MNM).
January 20, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Samantha Demuren to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3268196. by Plaintiff Casey Diamond (Attachments: #1 Good Standing, #2 Registration form) (Edwards, Mark) (Main Document 7 replaced on 1/20/2021) (MNM). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/20/2021: #3 Proposed Order) (MNM).
January 20, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Trent Shelton to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3268170. by Plaintiff Casey Diamond (Attachments: #1 Good Standing, #2 Registration form) (Edwards, Mark) (Main Document 6 replaced on 1/20/2021) (MNM). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/20/2021: #3 Proposed Order) (MNM).
January 12, 2021 Filing 5 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Noah M. Wexler re #1 Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 1/26/2021. (KJA)
January 12, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Ben Bireley re #1 Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 1/26/2021. (KJA)
January 4, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Marquette Transportation Company, LLC. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (MNM)
January 4, 2021 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell. (MNM)
January 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Marquette Transportation Company, LLC, filed by Casey Diamond. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Tendered) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diamond v. Marquette Transportation Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Casey Diamond
Represented By: Ben Bireley
Represented By: Mark Edwards
Represented By: Noah M. Wexler
Represented By: Samantha M.B. Demuren
Represented By: Trent A. Shelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marquette Transportation Company, LLC
Represented By: Bobby R. Miller, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?