Robertson v. Swaney et al
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Robertson
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company, Trustgard Insurance Company, Randall Swaney, Grange Insurance Company and Randall Swaney doing business as Billboard Utility Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 5:2021cv00010
Filed: January 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Benjamin Beaton
Referring Judge: Lanny King
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SCHEDULING ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lanny King: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 3/8/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 6/28/2021. Daubert Motion due by 4/1/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 4/1/2022. Expert Discovery due by 12/31/2021. Expert Witness (Defendant) due by 11/1/2021. Expert Witness (Plaintiff) due by 9/1/2021. Fact Discovery due by 8/31/2021. Joinder of Parties due by 6/28/2021. Telephonic Status Conference set for 6/21/2021 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Lanny King. Counsel for the parties may connect to the telephonic status conference by dialing the toll-free meeting number 1-877-848-7030 and entering access code 7238577# when prompted. cc: Counsel of Record (MNM)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 REFERENCE ORDER signed by Judge Benjamin Beaton. Case reassigned to Magistrate Magistrate Judge Lanny King. cc: counsel (JM)
March 9, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE Consent and Reference of Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge by Randall Swaney (Attachments: #1 Exhibit AO-85 Attachment) (Givens, Colton)
March 8, 2021 Filing 20 RULE 26 INITIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Allstate Insurance Company. (McCall, William)
March 8, 2021 Filing 19 RULE 26 INITIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Jacqueline Robertson. (Tveite, Charles)
March 4, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosures by Randall Swaney (Givens, Colton)
February 25, 2021 Filing 17 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Randall Swaney. (Givens, Colton)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER by Judge Beaton: The parties have filed an agreed order to dismiss Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Grange Insurance Company without prejudice #15 . Accordingly, Defendant Grange Insurance Company is DISMISSED from the case under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2). Plaintiff's claims against all other Defendants remain pending. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc:counsel (JM)
February 4, 2021 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Grange Insurance Company by Defendant Grange Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Agreed Order Dismissing Grange) (Steinmetz, Robert)
February 3, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to #8 Crossclaim by Randall Swaney. (Givens, Colton)
February 3, 2021 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Grange Insurance Company for Trustgard Insurance Company; Other Affiliate : Grange Mutual Holding Company filed by Trustgard Insurance Company (Steinmetz, Robert) Modified on 2/3/2021 to add other affiliate (JM).
February 3, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by Trustgard Insurance Company. (Steinmetz, Robert)
February 3, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Consent to Removal by Grange Insurance Company, Trustgard Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal (Steinmetz, Robert)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT (EBOC) by Judge Benjamin Beaton on 1/29/2021. Telephonic Rule 16 Case Management Conference set for 3/8/2021 at 2:00 p.m. C.T. (3:00 p.m. E.T.) before Magistrate Judge Lanny King. Counsel for the parties shall connect to the Telephonic Status Conference by dialing the toll-free number 1-877-848-7030 and entering access code 7238577. cc: Counsel (KD)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER by Judge Benjamin Beaton on 1/28/2021. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), the Court REFERS this matter to U.S. Magistrate Judge Lanny King for hearing and determining all pretrial matters, including non-dispositive motions. Judge King may conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel (KD)
January 27, 2021 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allstate Insurance Company. (McCall, William)
January 27, 2021 Filing 8 CROSSCLAIM against Randall Swaney and Randall Swaney d/b/a Billboard Utility Solutions, LLC. filed by Allstate Insurance Company. (McCall, William) Modified text to include d/b/a party on 1/28/2021 (JM).
January 27, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Allstate by Allstate Insurance Company. (McCall, William)
January 27, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by William L. McCall on behalf of Allstate Insurance Company (McCall, William)
January 27, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Randall Swaney and Randall Swaney d/b/a Billboard Utility Solutions, LLC. (Givens, Colton) Modified filers on 1/28/2021 (JM).
January 27, 2021 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal. cc: Counsel of Record, Graves Circuit Court (MNM)
January 27, 2021 Filing 3 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Benjamin Beaton. (MNM)
January 26, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Randall Swaney. (MNM)
January 26, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Randall Swaney from Graves Circuit Court, case number 21-CI-00001 (filing fee $402, receipt number 0644-3272025). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court File, #2 Cover Sheet) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robertson v. Swaney et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: William L. McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustgard Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert L. Steinmetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall Swaney
Represented By: Colton W. Givens
Represented By: Thomas N. Kerrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grange Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert L. Steinmetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall Swaney doing business as Billboard Utility Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Colton W. Givens
Represented By: Thomas N. Kerrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Robertson
Represented By: Mark Edwards
Represented By: Charles A. Tveite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?