Zakutney v. Moore et al
Plaintiff: Gary Zakutney
Defendant: 02Prime Solutions, LLC, Sustainability Management Partners, LLC and Darline Moore
Case Number: 5:2021cv00018
Filed: February 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Thomas B Russell
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2021 Filing 12 REPLY re #11 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim filed by Gary Zakutney. (Kelly, David)
April 6, 2021 COUNTERCLAIM against Gary Zakutney, filed by Sustainability Management Partners, LLC, Darline Moore. (SEE DN #11 ) (KJA)
April 6, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against All Defendants by Sustainability Management Partners, LLC, Darline Moore. (Whitehead, Clifford)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 3/9/2021. Granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer up to 4/7/2021. cc: Counsel(KJA)
March 3, 2021 Filing 9 REPLY re #8 Response to Motion, #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by 02Prime Solutions, LLC, Darline Moore, Sustainability Management Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A email between counsel) (Whitehead, Clifford)
March 2, 2021 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Gary Zakutney. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Denying Defendants' Motion to Extend Time) (Kelly, David)
March 2, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendants 02Prime Solutions, LLC, Darline Moore, Sustainability Management Partners, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Whitehead, Clifford)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 2/22/2021. Granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Clifford R. Whitehead. cc: Counsel(KJA)
February 18, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Clifford R. Whitehead to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3287123. by Defendants 02Prime Solutions, LLC, Darline Moore, Sustainability Management Partners, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Henning, Jeffrey)
February 18, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey W. Henning on behalf of 02Prime Solutions, LLC, Darline Moore, Sustainability Management Partners, LLC (Henning, Jeffrey)
February 10, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to 02Prime Solutions, LLC, Darline Moore, and Sustainability Management Partners, LLC. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). Attested copy of Complaint emailed to counsel. (MNM)
February 9, 2021 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell. (MNM)
February 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 02Prime Solutions, LLC, Darline Moore, and Sustainability Management Partners, LLC, filing fee $402, receipt number 0644-3282483, filed by Gary Zakutney. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Tendered) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zakutney v. Moore et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Zakutney
Represented By: David L. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 02Prime Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Henning
Represented By: Clifford R. Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sustainability Management Partners, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Henning
Represented By: Clifford R. Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darline Moore
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Henning
Represented By: Clifford R. Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?