Wilson v. Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership
Plaintiff: Rhonda Wilson
Defendant: Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Unknown Defendant, Walmart Starco, LLC, Wal-Mart.Com USA, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Walmart Fulfillment Services, LLC, Walmart Center Subway, LLC, Wal-Mart #739, Walmart, Inc., Wal-Mart TRS, LLC, Wal-Mart Shadow Center Monticello, KY, LLC, Wal-Mart Transportation, LLC, Wal-Mart Realty Company, Walmart #00709, WSE Management, LLC and Walmart Claims Services, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2021cv00051
Filed: April 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Benjamin Beaton
Referring Judge: Lanny King
2 Judge: Thomas B Russell
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lanny King: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 5/24/2021. Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosure due by 6/2/2021. Amended Pleadings/Joinder of Parties due by 8/6/2021. Expert Witness (Plaintiff) due by 8/22/2022. Expert Witness (Defendant) due by 5/26/2022. Expert Discovery due by 6/16/2022. Fact Discovery due by 3/17/2022. Telephonic Status Conference set for 8/2/2021 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Lanny King. Dispositive/Daubert Motions due by 7/18/2022. cc:counsel (JM)
May 12, 2021 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership. (Sharpe, Felix)
May 3, 2021 Filing 9 Proposed Agreed Order by Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership. (Sharpe, Felix)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AMENDED ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT (EBOC) by Judge Beaton on 4/19/2021; Telephonic Rule 16 Case Management Conference set for 5/24/2021 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Lanny King. Counsel for the parties shall connect to the Telephonic Conference by dialing the toll-free number 1-888-848-7030 and entering access code 7238577#. cc: counsel (JM)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT (EBOC) by Judge Beaton on 4/19/2021; Telephonic Rule 16 Case Management Conference set for 5/24/2021 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Lanny King. Counsel for the parties shall connect to the Telephonic Conference by dialing the toll-free number 1-888-848-7030 and entering access code 7238577#. cc: counselcc: counsel (JM)
April 19, 2021 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: Under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), the Court REFERS this matter to U.S. Magistrate Judge Lanny King for hearing and determining all pretrial matters, including non-dispositive motions. Judge King may conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: counsel (JM)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Benjamin Beaton for all further proceedings. Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell no longer assigned to case. cc:counsel, CM-Beaton (KJA)
April 13, 2021 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal. cc: Counsel of Record, Calloway Circuit Court (MNM)
April 13, 2021 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand previously filed in state court action by Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership. (MNM)
April 13, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Other Affiliates WSE Management, LLC and WSE Investment, LLC for Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership. (MNM)
April 13, 2021 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell. (MNM)
April 13, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership from Calloway Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-00332 (filing fee $402, receipt number 0644-3323531). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2 - Affidavit of Counsel, #4 Exhibit 3 - Requests for Admissions to Plaintiff, #5 Exhibit 4 - Plaintiff's Responses to Requests for Admissions, #6 Exhibit 5 - State Court File, #7 Cover Sheet) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Felix H. Sharpe, II
Represented By: Christopher R. Cashen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Defendant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Starco, LLC
Represented By: Felix H. Sharpe, II
Represented By: Christopher R. Cashen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart.Com USA, LLC
Represented By: Felix H. Sharpe, II
Represented By: Christopher R. Cashen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership
Represented By: Felix H. Sharpe, II
Represented By: Christopher R. Cashen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Fulfillment Services, LLC
Represented By: Felix H. Sharpe, II
Represented By: Christopher R. Cashen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Center Subway, LLC
Represented By: Felix H. Sharpe, II
Represented By: Christopher R. Cashen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart #739
Represented By: Felix H. Sharpe, II
Represented By: Christopher R. Cashen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Represented By: Felix H. Sharpe, II
Represented By: Christopher R. Cashen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart TRS, LLC
Represented By: Felix H. Sharpe, II
Represented By: Christopher R. Cashen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Shadow Center Monticello, KY, LLC
Represented By: Felix H. Sharpe, II
Represented By: Christopher R. Cashen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Transportation, LLC
Represented By: Felix H. Sharpe, II
Represented By: Christopher R. Cashen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Realty Company
Represented By: Felix H. Sharpe, II
Represented By: Christopher R. Cashen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart #00709
Represented By: Felix H. Sharpe, II
Represented By: Christopher R. Cashen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WSE Management, LLC
Represented By: Felix H. Sharpe, II
Represented By: Christopher R. Cashen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Claims Services, Inc.
Represented By: Felix H. Sharpe, II
Represented By: Christopher R. Cashen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Wilson
Represented By: Jonathan D. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?