McNally v. The Kingdom Trust Company
Plaintiff: Daniel McNally
Defendant: The Kingdom Trust Company
Case Number: 5:2021cv00068
Filed: June 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Thomas B Russell
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-reply to Plaintiff Motion to Remand by Defendant The Kingdom Trust Company (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order) (Farah, Licha)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion re #15 MOTION to Remand filed by Daniel McNally. (Shannon, William)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 7/14/2021. Granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply; see order for specifics. cc: Counsel(KJA)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 7/9/2021. Granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Paul J. Scarlato. cc: Counsel,ECF packet sent with order.(KJA)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Response to #8 Notice of Deficiency, #18 Notice of Deficiency, #10 Notice of Deficiency, #14 Notice of Deficiency, #9 Notice of Deficiency. All deficiencies have now been satisfied. (MNM)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE of filing Certificate of Good Standing for Paul J. Scarlato by Daniel McNally re #13 MOTION for Paul J. Scarlato to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing for Scarlato) (Shannon, William)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 RESPONSE to Motion re #15 MOTION to Remand filed by The Kingdom Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Class Action Complaint, #2 Exhibit Kingdom Trust Company Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit McNally Opposition to Def. Kingdom Motion to Dismiss, #4 Exhibit Kingdom Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #5 Exhibit Civil Minutes-Order Granting Motion to Dismiss) (Farah, Licha)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss by Plaintiff Daniel McNally (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Shannon, William)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of filing proposed order by Daniel McNally re #15 MOTION to Remand (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Shannon, William)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Deficiency re #15 Motion to Remand. Reason for Deficiency: Proposed Order. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 7/13/2021. (MNM)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 7/2/2021 granting #11 Motion for Hugh D. Berkson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel; mailed to attorney Berkson with ECF registration packet(MNM)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 7/2/2021 granting #12 Motion for Alan Rosca to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel; mailed to attorney Rosca with ECF registration packet(MNM)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION to Remand by Plaintiff Daniel McNally (Shannon, William) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/7/2021: #1 Proposed Order) (MNM).
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Deficiency re #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice.Reason for Deficiency: certificate of good standing. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 7/9/2021. (KJA)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION for Paul J. Scarlato to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Plaintiff Daniel McNally Filing fee $ 125; receipt no. P33004128. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (KJA) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/9/2021: #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (MNM).
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for Alan Rosca to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Plaintiff Daniel McNally (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Receipt P33004126) (KJA)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for Hugh D. Berkson to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Plaintiff Daniel McNally (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Receipt P33004127) (KJA)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Paul Scarlato re #1 Notice of Removal.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 7/6/2021. (KJA)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Hugh D. Berkson re #1 Notice of Removal.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 7/6/2021. (KJA)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Alan Rosca re #1 Notice of Removal.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 7/6/2021. (KJA)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant The Kingdom Trust Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Farah, Licha)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal. cc: Counsel of Record, Calloway Circuit Court (MNM)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Kingdom Trust Company. (MNM)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Whitney N. Williams on behalf of The Kingdom Trust Company. (MNM)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Licha H. Farah, Jr. on behalf of The Kingdom Trust Company. (MNM)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell. (MNM)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Kingdom Trust Company from Calloway Circuit Court, case number 21-CI-00147 (filing fee $402, receipt number 0644-3359625). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Summons, #3 Exhibit C - State Summons, #4 Exhibit D - Motion to Dismiss Filed in State Action, #5 Exhibit E - Exhibits to Motion to Dismiss, #6 Exhibit F - Proposed Order for Motion to Dismiss, #7 Cover Sheet) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McNally v. The Kingdom Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel McNally
Represented By: Paul Scarlato
Represented By: Alan Rosca
Represented By: William K. Shannon
Represented By: Hugh D. Berkson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Kingdom Trust Company
Represented By: Whitney N. Williams
Represented By: Licha H. Farah, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?