In The Matter of Whitetail Vessel Company, LLC, as Owner, and Inland Marine Service, Inc., as Owner pro hace vice,
Petitioner: In The Matter of Whitetail Vessel Company, LLC, as Owner, and Inland Marine Service, Inc., as Owner pro hace vice,
Case Number: 5:2021cv00129
Filed: September 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Thomas B Russell
Nature of Suit: Marine
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Affidavit of Publication by In The Matter of Whitetail Vessel Company, LLC, as Owner, and Inland Marine Service, Inc., as Owner pro hace vice, (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Sullivan, Megan)
October 4, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Publication by In The Matter of Whitetail Vessel Company, LLC, as Owner, and Inland Marine Service, Inc., as Owner pro hace vice, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Legal Notice) (Sullivan, Megan)
September 24, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE to Claimants of Action Brought for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability by In The Matter of Whitetail Vessel Company, LLC, as Owner, and Inland Marine Service, Inc., as Owner pro hace vice, (Sullivan, Megan)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 9/20/2021. Granting [] Motion for Ad Interim Stipulation and Directing Issuance of Notice. cc: Counsel(KJA)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 9/20/2021. Granting #3 Motion for Restraining Order. cc: Counsel(KJA)
September 9, 2021 MOTION for Ad Interim Stipulation and Directing Issuance of Notice by Petitioner In The Matter of Whitetail Vessel Company, LLC, as Owner, and Inland Marine Service, Inc., as Owner pro hace vice, (SEE DN #3 FOR FULL VIEWING) (KJA)
September 9, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Restraining Order by Petitioner In The Matter of Whitetail Vessel Company, LLC, as Owner, and Inland Marine Service, Inc., as Owner pro hace vice, (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proposed Order) (Sullivan, Megan)
September 8, 2021 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell. (MNM)
September 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR EXONERATION FROM OR LIMITATION OF LIABILITY, In The Matter of Whitetail Vessel Company, LLC, as Owner, and Inland Marine Service, Inc., as Owner pro hace vice, of the M/V Bobby Thompson, Official No. 518256. Filing fee $402, receipt number 0644-3419651. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Vessel Value, #2 Exhibit B - Stipulation of No Pending Freight, #3 Exhibit C - Stipulation of Pending Freight, #4 Exhibit D - Letter of Undertaking, #5 Exhibit E - Stipulation for Costs) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In The Matter of Whitetail Vessel Company, LLC, as Owner, and Inland Marine Service, Inc., as Owner pro hace vice,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: In The Matter of Whitetail Vessel Company, LLC, as Owner, and Inland Marine Service, Inc., as Owner pro hace vice,
Represented By: Megan A. Sullivan
Represented By: Robert Nienhuis
Represented By: Todd M. Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?