Bowen et al v. Paxton Media Group, LLC
Plaintiff: William Bowen and Amy Brasher
Defendant: Paxton Media Group, LLC
Case Number: 5:2021cv00143
Filed: September 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Thomas B Russell
Referring Judge: Greg N Stivers
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2021 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Paxton Media Group, LLC. (Hollon, Jason)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 10/28/2021. Granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; terminating #21 Motion to Amend/Correct. cc: Counsel(KJA)
October 26, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION to Amend/Correct #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by Plaintiff William Bowen (Attachments: #1 Supplement Cert. of Good Standing Oklahoma, #2 Supplement Cert. of Good Standing Texas, #3 Supplement Cert. of Good Standing New York, #4 Proposed Order) (Roberts, Jeffery)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 AGREED ORDER signed by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 10/18/2021 extending time for defendant to respond up to 11/22/2021. cc: Counsel(KJA)
October 15, 2021 Filing 19 Proposed Agreed Order for Extension of Time by Paxton Media Group, LLC. (Hollon, Jason)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 10/14/2021. Granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Brittany L. Brown. cc: Counsel(KJA)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 10/14/2021. Granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for David J. George. cc: Counsel(KJA)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 10/14/2021. Granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Lori G. Feldman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel(KJA)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 10/14/2021. The Court having reviewed the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for William B. Federman (DN #13 ) and having found it incomplete; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED William B. Federman shall supplement his motion by filing a Notice which lists his ECF training method. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel of Record (TJD)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 10/14/2021. Judge Beaton having recused from this case; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED this case is assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. Counsel are instructed to change the civil action number to reflect the initials (GNS) in place and instead of the initials (BJB) on all further pleadings. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel of Record (TJD)
October 6, 2021 Response to #7 Notice of Deficiency, #5 Notice of Deficiency. (MNM)
October 5, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for William B. Federman to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number AKYWDC-3444934. by Plaintiff Amy Brasher (Attachments: #1 Addendum Good Standing Oklahoma, #2 Addendum Good Standing Texas, #3 Addendum Good Standing New York, #4 Proposed Order) (Roberts, Jeffery)
October 5, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Brittany L. Brown to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number AKYWDC-3444929. by Plaintiff William Bowen (Attachments: #1 Addendum Good Standing Florida, #2 Proposed Order) (Roberts, Jeffery)
October 5, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for David J. George to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number AKYWDC-3444064. by Plaintiff Amy Brasher (Attachments: #1 Addendum Good Standing Florida, #2 Proposed Order) (Roberts, Jeffery)
October 5, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Lori G. Feldman to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number AKYWDC-3444056. by Plaintiff William Bowen (Attachments: #1 Addendum Good Standing New York, #2 Addendum Good Standing Washington, #3 Proposed Order) (Roberts, Jeffery)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER OF RECUSAL by Judge Beaton on 10/5/2021. Judge Beaton RECUSES from this matter. The Court REFERS this matter to Chief Judge Stivers for reassignment to another judge for all further proceedings. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: counsel, TD (JM)
October 5, 2021 Response to #8 Notice of Deficiency, #6 Notice of Deficiency. (MNM)
September 24, 2021 Filing 8 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to David J. George re #1 Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 10/8/2021. (KJA)
September 24, 2021 Filing 7 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to William B. Federman re #1 Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 10/12/2021. (KJA)
September 24, 2021 Filing 6 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Lori G. Feldman re #1 Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 10/12/2021. (KJA)
September 24, 2021 Filing 5 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Brittany L. Brown re #1 Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 10/12/2021. (KJA)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Benjamin Beaton for all further proceedings. Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell no longer assigned to case.cc:counsel (KJA)
September 22, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Paxton Media Group, LLC. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (MNM)
September 22, 2021 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell. (MNM)
September 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Paxton Media Group, LLC, filing fee $402, receipt number AKYWDC-3434612, filed by William Bowen and Amy Brasher. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Tendered) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowen et al v. Paxton Media Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Bowen
Represented By: Brittany L. Brown
Represented By: David J. George
Represented By: Jeffery A. Roberts
Represented By: Lori G. Feldman
Represented By: William B. Federman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Brasher
Represented By: Brittany L. Brown
Represented By: David J. George
Represented By: Jeffery A. Roberts
Represented By: Lori G. Feldman
Represented By: William B. Federman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paxton Media Group, LLC
Represented By: Jason R. Hollon
Represented By: Robert E. Maclin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?