United States of America v. An Easement and Right-of-Way Over 5.49 Acres of Land, More or Less, in Calloway County, Kentucky et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: An Easement and Right-of-Way Over 5.49 Acres of Land, More or Less, in Calloway County, Kentucky, Ricky Wayne Cunningham, Celisa Curd Cunningham and FNB Bank, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2021cv00168
Filed: November 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Thomas B Russell
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2022 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Quash Service of Process filed by United States of America. (Chase, James)
January 12, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Tendering Deposit by United States of America (Chase, James)
January 10, 2022 Filing 12 STIPULATION by United States of America. (Chase, James)
December 27, 2021 Filing 11 Objection to #3 Notice of Condemnation, #4 Notice (Other) filed by Celisa Curd Cunningham, Ricky Wayne Cunningham. (Yates, Ryan)
December 27, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Celisa Curd Cunningham, Ricky Wayne Cunningham. (Yates, Ryan)
December 27, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan R. Yates on behalf of Celisa Curd Cunningham, Ricky Wayne Cunningham (Yates, Ryan)
December 27, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Quash Service of Process by Defendants Celisa Curd Cunningham, Ricky Wayne Cunningham (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Ricky Wayne Cunningham, #2 Exhibit Passport of Ricky Wayne Cunningham, #3 Affidavit Affidavit of Celisa Curd Cunningham, #4 Exhibit Passport of Celisa Curd Cunningham, #5 Proposed Order) (Yates, Ryan) (Attachment 2 replaced on 12/28/2021) (MNM).
December 7, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Completion of Service of Pleadings Upon All Defendants as of November 19, 2021 by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt Requested (Green Card Tracking)) (Chase, James)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 12/2/2021. ranting #5 Motion to Deposit Funds. cc: Counsel, dfts pro se, finance USDC(KJGA)
November 16, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Deposit Funds by Plaintiff United States of America (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum in Support) (Chase, James)
November 15, 2021 Filing 4 Declaration of Taking filed by United States of America re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Property Description, #2 Exhibit Map) (MNM)
November 15, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Property Description) (MNM)
November 15, 2021 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell. (MNM)
November 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against An Easement and Right-of-Way Over 5.49 Acres of Land, More or Less, in Calloway County, Kentucky, Celisa Curd Cunningham, Ricky Wayne Cunningham, and FNB Bank, Inc., filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Property Description, #2 Cover Sheet) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. An Easement and Right-of-Way Over 5.49 Acres of Land, More or Less, in Calloway County, Kentucky et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: James S. Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: An Easement and Right-of-Way Over 5.49 Acres of Land, More or Less, in Calloway County, Kentucky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricky Wayne Cunningham
Represented By: Ryan R. Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celisa Curd Cunningham
Represented By: Ryan R. Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNB Bank, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?