Casey v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Cynthia S. Casey
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 5:2022cv00100
Filed: August 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Benjamin Beaton
Referring Judge: Lanny King
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SOCIAL SECURITY ORDER (EBOC) signed by Magistrate Judge Lanny King on 9/29/2022; Social Security Submission due by 12/28/2022. (Attachments: #1 Fact and Law Summary Form) cc: Counsel of Record (MNM)
September 28, 2022 Filing 9 ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD received from Social Security by Commissioner of Social Security. (Wang-Grimm, Jessie)
September 28, 2022 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Commissioner of Social Security. (Wang-Grimm, Jessie)
September 26, 2022 Filing 7 TEXT ORDER: The parties having consented to the jurisdiction of a magistrate judge to conduct all further proceedings in this case under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 (DN #6 ), the Court reassigns this case to Magistrate Judge King. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel, LLK-CM (SMJ)
September 23, 2022 Filing 6 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Cynthia S. Casey. (JM)
September 23, 2022 Filing 5 CASE REASSIGNED to Judge Benjamin Beaton pursuant to General Order No. 2019-11. (cc:counsel, BB-CM) (MHB)
August 4, 2022 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #1 Complaint, #2 Case Assignment, #4 Notice of Social Security Case Assignment. ERROR: Clerk inadvertently assigned case to District Judge. Case has been reassigned to Magistrate King. (CDL)
August 3, 2022 Magistrate Judge Lanny King added. Judge Beaton no longer assigned to case. (CDL)
August 3, 2022 Filing 4 Notice of Social Security Case Assignment re #1 Complaint.Social Security Notice due by 8/24/2022. (CDL) (Main Document 4 replaced on 8/4/2022) (CDL).
August 3, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF SERVICE pursuant to #General Order 2021-20: The Commissioner of the Social Security Administration and the U.S. Attorney for the Western District of Kentucky having consented to electronic service of process of complaints seeking judicial review pursuant to 205(g) of the Social Security Act, 42 U.S.C. 405(g), this notice shall constitute acceptance of service as outlined in Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(i)(1)(A) and (C). This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official Entry. No document is attached. (CDL)
August 3, 2022 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge King. (CDL) (Main Document 2 replaced on 8/4/2022) (CDL). Modified judge on 8/4/2022 (JM).
August 3, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security (Filing fee $402; Receipt No. AKYWDC-3629545), filed by Cynthia S. Casey.(Attachments: #1 Summons Tendered, #2 Cover Sheet) (CDL) (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/4/2022) (CDL). (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/4/2022) (CDL). (Attachment 2 replaced on 8/4/2022) (CDL).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Casey v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia S. Casey
Represented By: Donald R. Green, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Benjamin Seth Schecter
Represented By: Timothy D. Thompson
Represented By: Jessie A. Wang-Grimm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?