Marquette Transportation Company Gulf-Inland, LLC
Plaintiff: Marquette Transportation Company Gulf-Inland, LLC
Case Number: 5:2022cv00105
Filed: August 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Benjamin Beaton
Referring Judge: Lanny King
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Ad Interim Stipulation to Value of Vessel and Letter of Undertaking, Directing Notice and Restraining Prosecution of Claims by Plaintiff Marquette Transportation Company Gulf-Inland, LLC (Attachments: #1 Letter of Undertaking, #2 Proposed Order) (Miller, Bobby)
September 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE signed by Magistrate Judge Lanny King on 9/26/22 granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Kent B. Ryan. cc: Counsel(DJT)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Lanny King on 9/16/2022 granting #5 Motion for Attorney Allan C. Crane to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel (JM)
September 16, 2022 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: Under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), the Court refers this matter to Magistrate Judge King for hearing and determining all pretrial matters, including non-dispositive motions. Judge King may conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel (SMJ)
August 22, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Allan C. Crane to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number AKYWDC-3642599. by Plaintiff Marquette Transportation Company Gulf-Inland, LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Crane, Allan)
August 22, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for Kent B. Ryan to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number AKYWDC-3642581. by Plaintiff Marquette Transportation Company Gulf-Inland, LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Ryan, Kent)
August 12, 2022 Filing 3 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Benjamin Beaton. (CDL)
August 11, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Marquette Transportation Company Gulf-Inland, LLC. (CDL)
August 11, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR EXONERATION FROM OR LIMITATION OF LIABILITY filed by Marquette Transportation Company Gulf-Inland, LLC, (Filing fee $402; Receipt No. AKYWDC-3635874).(Attachments: #1 Verification of Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Value, #3 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Pending Freight, #4 Cover Sheet) (CDL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marquette Transportation Company Gulf-Inland, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marquette Transportation Company Gulf-Inland, LLC
Represented By: Bobby R. Miller, Jr.
Represented By: Allan C. Crane
Represented By: Kent B. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?