Noles v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Genevieve Carol Noles
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 5:2022cv00129
Filed: September 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Lanny King
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SOCIAL SECURITY ORDER (EBOC) signed by Magistrate Judge Lanny King on 11/17/2022; Social Security Submission due by 2/15/2023. (Attachments: #1 Fact and Law Summary Form) cc: Counsel of Record (MNM)
November 17, 2022 Filing 7 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Genevieve Carol Noles. (MNM)
November 17, 2022 Filing 6 ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD received from Social Security by Commissioner of Social Security. (Ridgell-Boltz, Laura)
November 17, 2022 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Commissioner of Social Security. (Ridgell-Boltz, Laura)
September 20, 2022 Filing 4 Notice of Social Security Case Assignment re #1 Complaint. Social Security Notice due by 10/11/2022. (CDL)
September 20, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF SERVICE pursuant to #General Order 2021-20: The Commissioner of the Social Security Administration and the U.S. Attorney for the Western District of Kentucky having consented to electronic service of process of complaints seeking judicial review pursuant to 205(g) of the Social Security Act, 42 U.S.C. 405(g), this notice shall constitute acceptance of service as outlined in Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(i)(1)(A) and (C). This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official Entry. No document is attached. (CDL)
September 20, 2022 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Lanny King. (CDL)
September 19, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security (Filing fee $ 402; Receipt No. AKYWDC-3661945), filed by Genevieve Carol Noles. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Tendered - Atty General, #3 Summons Tendered - Civil Process Clerk, #4 Summons Tendered - General Counsel) (CDL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Noles v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Genevieve Carol Noles
Represented By: Donna S. Thornton-Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Benjamin Seth Schecter
Represented By: Timothy D. Thompson
Represented By: Laura Ridgell-Boltz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?