El v. Booth, et al
Petitioner: Sean Alim El
Respondent: Agent, Ken S. Booth, John Allen Campbell and Girth
Case Number: 5:2023cv00063
Filed: May 4, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Benjamin Beaton
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity Action
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2023 Filing 17 Response to #16 Notice of Deficiency filed by Sean Alim El. (JM)
May 25, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Deficiency re #15 Notice of Liability; Improper Impound. This filing has not been signed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 6/26/2023. (JM)
May 24, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Liability; Improper Impound by Sean Alim El (JM) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/2/2023: #1 Signature page (Tendered on 6/2/2023)) (JM).
May 24, 2023 Filing 14 APPENDIX: Notice of Default Judgment by Sean Alim El (JM)
May 24, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE OF WRIT IN THE NATURE OF DISCOVERY by Sean Alim El (JM)
May 24, 2023 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT by Sean Alim El (JM)
May 19, 2023 Filing 11 REGISTRATION TO RECEIVE DOCUMENTS ELECTRONICALLY by Sean Alim El (JM)
May 19, 2023 Response to #10 Notice of Deficiency, filed by Sean Alim El. Registration refiled with pertinent case number affixed. See DN #11 for viewing. (JM)
May 15, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Deficiency re #9 Notice of Registration to Receive Documents Electronically. Petitioner failed to affix the case number(s) to which the request has been made. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 6/14/2023. (JM)
May 12, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Registration to Receive Documents Electronically by Sean Alim El (*Note- this form is incomplete as Petitioner did not indicate which case(s) the request pertains to as required.) (JM)
May 12, 2023 Filing 8 Diversity Case Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(2)) by Sean Alim El. (JM)
May 12, 2023 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Agent, Ken S. Booth, John Allen Campbell, filed by Sean Alim El. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Summons) (JM)
May 12, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Financial Statement Affidavit by Sean Alim El re #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (JM)
May 12, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Sean Alim El (JM)
May 12, 2023 Response to #4 Notice of Deficiency, filed by Sean Alim El. (Complaint has been tendered on court form, IFP motion has been filed, and 7.1(a)(2) disclosure statement has been filed. (JM)
May 5, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Deficiency re #1 Complaint to Sean Alim El. Reason for Deficiency: Documents need to be submitted on correct form(Complaint), IFP, or Filing fee to be paid if no IFP filed; File a Rule 7.1(a)(2) disclosure statement. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 6/5/2023. (CDL)
May 5, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE ON SUMMONS re #1 Complaint - missing summons. (CDL)
May 5, 2023 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Benjamin Beaton. (CDL)
May 4, 2023 Filing 1 VERIFIED PETITION FOR INJUNCTION, RELIEF, AND RESTITUTION against Agent, Ken S. Booth, John Allen Campbell, (No Filing Fee Paid), filed by Sean Alim El. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (CDL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: El v. Booth, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Agent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ken S. Booth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John Allen Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Girth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sean Alim El
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?