Kennedy v. Marquette Transportation Company, LLC
Plaintiff: Jeffery Kennedy
Defendant: Marquette Transportation Company, LLC and Marquette Transportation Company Gulf-Inland LLC
Case Number: 5:2023cv00154
Filed: November 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Office: Paducah Office
Presiding Judge: Benjamin Beaton
Referring Judge: Lanny King
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1291 Maritime
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Marquette Transportation Company Gulf-Inland LLC. (Crane, Allan)
January 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Lanny King on 1/18/2024 granting #39 Motion for Attorney Allan C. Crane to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel(JM)
January 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MOTION for Allan C. Crane to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AKYWDC-3957734. by Defendant Marquette Transportation Company Gulf-Inland LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting PHV Admission) (Crane, Allan)
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT (EBOC) by Judge Beaton on 1/10/2024. Telephonic Rule 16 Case Management Conference set for 2/12/2024 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Lanny King. Counsel for the parties shall connect to the conference by dialing the toll-free number 1-877-848-7030 and entering access code 7238577. cc: counsel (JM)
January 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Lanny King on 1/5/2024 granting #36 Motion to Withdraw #36 Counsel of Record. Timothy J. Young, Tammy D. Harris, and Joseph B. Marino of The Young Firm are hereby removed as counsel of record for Plaintiff, Jeffery Kennedy. Megan Misko of The Young Firm and Todd Farmer of Farmer & Wright, PLLC, remain as counsel of record for Mr. Kennedy in this matter. cc: Counsel(JM)
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MOTION to Withdraw Counsel of Record by Plaintiff Jeffery Kennedy (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Misko, Megan)
December 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 TEXT ORDER (EBOC): The Court entered deficiency notices on 11/28/2023 and ordered attorneys Tammy D. Harris, Timothy J. Young, and Joseph Benedict Marino, III to respond by 12/14/2023. Because these attorneys failed to timely cure the deficiency, the Court orders them to cure the deficiency or otherwise show cause why they should not be terminated as counsel within 14 days of this order. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: counsel (JM)
December 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Lanny King on 12/21/2023 granting #33 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Evans Martin McLeod, Magdalini Galitou, and Harrison M. Martin of the law firm of Phelps Dunbar LLP, be withdrawn as counsel of record for Marquette. cc: Counsel (JM)
December 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney . (Continue to receive notice:No) by Defendant Marquette Transportation Company Gulf-Inland LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (McLeod, Evans)
December 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Lanny King on 12/18/2023 denying without prejudice #30 Motion to Substitute Attorney. cc: Counsel(HMC)
December 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Corporate Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(1)) by Marquette Transportation Company Gulf-Inland LLC. (Miller, Bobby) Modified filers on 12/19/2023 (DeW).
December 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Defendants Marquette Transportation Company Gulf-Inland LLC, Marquette Transportation Company, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Substitute) (Miller, Bobby)
December 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Lanny King on 12/14/2023 granting #28 Motion for Attorney Megan C. Misko to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel (JM)
December 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION for Megan C. Misko to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AKYWDC-3938394. by Plaintiff Jeffery Kennedy (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing LA State Bar, #2 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing EDLA) (Farmer, Todd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/13/2023: #3 Proposed Order) (JM).
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 TEXT ORDER: Under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), the Court refers this matter to Magistrate Judge King for hearing and determining all pretrial matters, including non-dispositive motions. Judge King may conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: counsel (JM)
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Magdalini Galitou re #18 Case Transferred In - District Transfer.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 12/14/2023. (KJA)
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Harrison Marc Martin re #18 Case Transferred In - District Transfer.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 12/14/2023. (KJA)
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Evans Martin McLeod re #18 Case Transferred In - District Transfer.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 12/14/2023. (KJA)
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Tammy D. Harris re #18 Case Transferred In - District Transfer.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 12/14/2023. (KJA)
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Megan C. Misko re #18 Case Transferred In - District Transfer.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 12/14/2023. (KJA)
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Joseph Benedict Marino, III re #18 Case Transferred In - District Transfer.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 12/14/2023. (KJA)
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Timothy J. Young re #18 Case Transferred In - District Transfer.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 12/14/2023. (KJA)
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to District Judge Benjamin Beaton. (KJA)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:23-cv-02883. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (KJA) Modified on 11/28/2023 to edit file date (KJA).
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER AND REASONS granting #10 MOTION to Transfer Case ; Case transferred to Western District of Kentucky. The telephone status conference scheduled for 12/5/2023 is CANCELLED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/27/2023.(lag) [Transferred from laed on 11/28/2023.]
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Marquette Transportation Company Gulf-Inland, LLC re #10 MOTION to Transfer Case. (lag) [Transferred from laed on 11/28/2023.]
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to File reply. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/27/2023. (lag) [Transferred from laed on 11/28/2023.]
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum by Marquette Transportation Company Gulf-Inland, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proposed Pleading Reply Memorandum)(McLeod, Evans) [Transferred from laed on 11/28/2023.]
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Jeffery Kennedy re #10 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Western District of Kentucky in Accordance with the Parties Venue Selection and Supplemental Benefits Agreements . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Misko, Megan) [Transferred from laed on 11/28/2023.]
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Telephone Status Conference RESET for 12/5/2023 03:30 PM before Judge Eldon E. Fallon. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/15/2023.(lag) [Transferred from laed on 11/28/2023.]
November 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Telephone Status Conference RESET for 11/16/2023 01:30 PM before Judge Eldon E. Fallon. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/3/2023.(my) [Transferred from laed on 11/28/2023.]
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Western District of Kentucky in Accordance with the Parties Venue Selection and Supplemental Benefits Agreements by Marquette Transportation Company Gulf-Inland, LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 11/29/2023. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Venue Selection Agreement, #3 Exhibit Supplemental Benefits Agreement, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Notice of Submission) (McLeod, Evans) Modified on 11/1/2023 (lag). [Transferred from laed on 11/28/2023.]
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Telephone Status Conference RESET for 11/16/2023 03:30 PM before Judge Eldon E. Fallon.Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 10/18/2023.(my) [Transferred from laed on 11/28/2023.]
September 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Telephone Status Conference RESET for 11/15/2023 08:30 AM before Judge Eldon E. Fallon. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 9/27/2023.(lag) [Transferred from laed on 11/28/2023.]
September 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/19/2024 09:00 AM before Judge Eldon E. Fallon. Telephone Status Conference set for 11/8/2023 08:30 AM before Judge Eldon E. Fallon. Jury Trial set for 5/6/2024 08:30 AM before Judge Eldon E. Fallon. All discovery must be completed by 3/20/2024. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form)(lag) [Transferred from laed on 11/28/2023.]
August 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 9/26/2023 10:30 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk.(lag) [Transferred from laed on 11/28/2023.]
August 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Marquette Transportation Company Gulf-Inland, LLC.Attorney Evans Martin McLeod added to party Marquette Transportation Company Gulf-Inland, LLC(pty:dft).(McLeod, Evans) Modified on 8/30/2023 (lag). [Transferred from laed on 11/28/2023.]
August 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Marquette Transportation Company, LLC served on 8/9/2023, answer due 8/30/2023. (Young, Timothy) [Transferred from laed on 11/28/2023.]
August 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Marquette Transportation Company, LLC. (my) [Transferred from laed on 11/28/2023.]
July 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (ess) [Transferred from laed on 11/28/2023.]
July 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 SEAMAN COMPLAINT with jury demand against Marquette Transportation Company, LLC (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-10053558) filed by Jeffery Kennedy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Megan C Misko added to party Jeffery Kennedy(pty:pla).(Misko, Megan) [Transferred from laed on 11/28/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kennedy v. Marquette Transportation Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery Kennedy
Represented By: Timothy J. Young
Represented By: Joseph Benedict Marino, III
Represented By: Megan C. Misko
Represented By: Tammy D. Harris
Represented By: Todd A Farmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marquette Transportation Company, LLC
Represented By: Bobby R. Miller, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marquette Transportation Company Gulf-Inland LLC
Represented By: Evans Martin McLeod
Represented By: Harrison Marc Martin
Represented By: Magdalini Galitou
Represented By: Bobby R. Miller, Jr.
Represented By: Allan C. Crane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?