Doe v. Wyndham Hotels and Resorts, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Defendant: Wyndham Hotels and Resorts, Inc, Wyndham Hotel Group, LLC, Super 8 Worldwide, Inc., KY Motel Inc. doing business as Super 8, Sonesta International Hotels Corporation, Red Lion Hotels Corporation, Mata Pita, Inc. doing business as America's Best Value Inn, VHGI Franchising, Inc. and VHGI, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2024cv00008
Filed: January 16, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Benjamin Beaton
Referring Judge: Lanny King
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1514 Civil Action to Restrain Harassment of a Victim
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2024 Filing 30 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re DN16 (text order). Mail sent to Attorney Annie McAdams. (JM)
March 11, 2024 Filing 29 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re DN14 (text order). Mail sent to Attorney Annie McAdams. (JM)
March 11, 2024 Filing 28 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to William Michael Hamilton re #18 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice.Reason for Deficiency: failure to register to file electronically pursuant to GO 2008-03. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 3/28/2024. (KJA)
March 11, 2024 Filing 27 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Guy G. Fisher re #17 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice.Reason for Deficiency: failure to register to file electronically pursuant to GO 2008-03. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 3/28/2024. (KJA)
March 8, 2024 Filing 26 TEXT ORDER: The Court grants the parties' motion to extend the briefing deadlines (DN #25 ) regarding the Wyndham Defendants' motion to dismiss (DN #21 ), and extends the deadline for the plaintiff's response to 03/29/2024 and the Wyndham Defendants' reply to 04/12/2024. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel (JM)
March 7, 2024 Filing 25 Proposed Agreed Order Extending Briefing Deadlines for Wyndham Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Jane Doe. (Richards, E.)
March 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Lanny King on 3/4/2024 granting #23 Motion for Attorney David S. Sager to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel (JM)
March 1, 2024 Filing 23 MOTION for David S. Sager to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AKYWDC-3987919. by Defendant Wyndham Hotels and Resorts, Inc (Fowles, Justin)
March 1, 2024 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(1)) by Wyndham Hotels and Resorts, Inc. (Fowles, Justin)
March 1, 2024 Filing 21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Wyndham Hotels and Resorts, Inc, Wyndham Hotel Group, LLC and Super 8 Worldwide, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Fowles, Justin) Modified filers on 3/4/2024 (KDY).
February 28, 2024 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed Mata Pita, Inc. served on 2/26/2024, answer due 3/18/2024. (KDY)
February 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Lanny King on 2/22/2024 granting #5 Motion for Attorney Annie McAdams to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel (JM)
February 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Lanny King on 2/22/2024 granting #6 Motion for Attorney William Michael Hamilton to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel (JM)
February 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Lanny King on 2/22/2024 granting #4 Motion for Attorney Guy G. Fisher to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel (JM)
February 22, 2024 Filing 16 TEXT ORDER: In response to the Wyndham Defendants' proposed agreed order for an extension of time to file a responsive pleading (DN #15 ), the Court grants the request and extends the deadline to 03/01/2024. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel (JM)
February 21, 2024 Filing 15 Proposed Agreed Order Extending Responsive Pleading Deadline by Wyndham Hotels and Resorts, Inc. (Fowles, Justin)
February 20, 2024 Filing 14 TEXT ORDER: Under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), the Court refers this matter to Magistrate Judge King for hearing and determining all pretrial matters, including non-dispositive motions. Judge King may conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: counsel (JM)
February 16, 2024 Filing 13 SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE as to VHGI Franchising, Inc. COMPLETED on 2/16/2024. Summons signed for on 1/30/2024. (JM)
February 14, 2024 Filing 12 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Sonesta International Hotels Corporation. (JM)
February 14, 2024 Filing 11 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Red Lion Hotels Corporation. (JM)
February 12, 2024 Filing 10 SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE as to VHGI, Inc. COMPLETED on 2/12/2024. (Postal return receipt reflects a signature date of 1/29/2024) (JM)
February 5, 2024 Filing 9 Pro Se (Non Prisoner) Registration to Receive Documents Electronically by KY Motel Inc. (KDY)
February 5, 2024 Filing 8 ANSWER by KY Motel Inc. to #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Attachments) (KDY)
February 2, 2024 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jane Doe. KY Motel Inc. served on 1/29/2024, answer due 2/20/2024. (JM)
January 30, 2024 Filing fee: W M Hamilton PHV $ 150.00 receipt number 300006643 (TNT)
January 26, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION for William Michael Hamilton to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 150. (CK# 4986 for $150 has been forwarded to LV for receipting) Filed by Plaintiff Jane Doe (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (JM)
January 26, 2024 Filing fee: $ 150.00 receipt number 300006625 re #4 MOTION for Guy G. Fisher to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150. filed by Jane Doe (SLK)
January 26, 2024 Filing fee: $ 150.00 receipt number 300006624 re #5 MOTION for Annie McAdams to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150. filed by Jane Doe (SLK)
January 23, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION for Attorney Annie McAdams to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Plaintiff Jane Doe (Filing fee $ 150. CK# 21317 forwarded to LV for receipting) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (JM)
January 23, 2024 Filing 4 MOTION for Attorney Guy G. Fisher to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Plaintiff Jane Doe. Filing fee $ 150 (CK # 607930 sent to LV for receipting). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (JM)
January 17, 2024 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to KY Motel Inc., Mata Pita, Inc., Red Lion Hotels Corporation, Sonesta International Hotels Corporation, Super 8 Worldwide, Inc., VHGI Franchising, Inc., VHGI, Inc., Wyndham Hotel Group, LLC, and Wyndham Hotels and Resorts, Inc. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (MNM)
January 17, 2024 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Benjamin Beaton. (MNM)
January 16, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KY Motel Inc., Mata Pita, Inc., Red Lion Hotels Corporation, Sonesta International Hotels Corporation, Super 8 Worldwide, Inc., VHGI Franchising, Inc., VHGI, Inc., Wyndham Hotel Group, LLC, and Wyndham Hotels and Resorts, Inc. Filing fee $405, receipt number AKYWDC-3957361, filed by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Tendered) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Wyndham Hotels and Resorts, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Annie McAdams
Represented By: E. Douglas Richards
Represented By: Guy G. Fisher
Represented By: Michael W. Hamilton
Represented By: Michael Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyndham Hotels and Resorts, Inc
Represented By: Allison W. Weyand
Represented By: Justin S. Fowles
Represented By: David Sager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyndham Hotel Group, LLC
Represented By: David Sager
Represented By: Allison W. Weyand
Represented By: Justin S. Fowles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Super 8 Worldwide, Inc.
Represented By: Allison W. Weyand
Represented By: Justin S. Fowles
Represented By: David Sager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KY Motel Inc. doing business as Super 8
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonesta International Hotels Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Lion Hotels Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mata Pita, Inc. doing business as America's Best Value Inn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VHGI Franchising, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VHGI, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?