Lancaster v. Big G Express, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Zachary Lancaster
Defendant: Big G Express, Inc. doing business as RTR Transportation Services, Aerias Williams, Big G Express, Inc., RTR Transportation Services and JARRETT LOCKRIDGE
Intervenor: Kentucky Employers' Mutual Insurance
Case Number: 5:2024cv00056
Filed: April 2, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Benjamin Beaton
Referring Judge: Lanny King
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity Action
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2024 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(1)) by Kentucky Employers' Mutual Insurance. (Smith, Darren)
May 10, 2024 Filing 20 MOTION to Intervene by Intervenor - Pending Kentucky Employers' Mutual Insurance (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Intervening Complaint, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Smith, Darren)
May 9, 2024 Filing 19 TEXT ORDER: Under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), the Court refers this matter to Magistrate Judge King for hearing and determining all pretrial matters, including non-dispositive motions. Judge King may conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: counsel (JM)
May 9, 2024 Filing 18 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Aerias Williams. (Service was attempted by the Secretary of State. Postal mark states: "Not Deliverable as Addressed/Unable to Forward) (JM)
May 6, 2024 Filing 17 SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE as to Aerias Williams COMPLETED on 5/6/2024. (JM)
May 6, 2024 Filing 16 SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE as to JARRETT LOCKRIDGE COMPLETED on 5/6/2024. (JM)
May 6, 2024 Filing 15 SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE as to Big G Express, Inc. (Greg Thompson) COMPLETED on 5/6/2024 (JM)
May 6, 2024 Filing 14 SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE as to Big G Express, Inc. COMPLETED on 5/6/2024. (JM)
April 23, 2024 Filing 13 Diversity Case Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(2)) by Big G Express, Inc., Aerias Williams, RTR Transportation Services and Jarrett Lockridge. (Gay, Matthew) Modified filers and docket text on 4/24/2024 (KDY).
April 23, 2024 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(1)) by RTR Transportation Services. (Gay, Matthew)
April 23, 2024 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(1)) identifying Corporate Parent Big G Holdings, Inc. for Big G Express, Inc. by Big G Express, Inc.. (Gay, Matthew) Modified corporate parent and docket text on 4/24/2024 (KDY).
April 23, 2024 Filing 10 DEFENDANTS ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint, by Big G Express, Inc., Aerias Williams, RTR Transportation Services, Jarrett Lockridge. (Gay, Matthew) Modified filers and docket text on 4/24/2024 (KDY).
April 11, 2024 Filing 9 Diversity Case Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(2)) (Attachments: #1 SUPPLEMENTAL STATEMENT - NAMES) by Zachary Lancaster. (Adams, Olivia)
April 11, 2024 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(1)) by Zachary Lancaster. (Adams, Olivia)
April 5, 2024 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Big G Express, Inc., JARRETT LOCKRIDGE, RTR Transportation Services, Aerias Williams. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (Attachments: #1 Summons issued to Jarrett Lockridge, #2 Summons issued to RTR Transportation Services, #3 Summons issued to Aerias Williams) (JM)
April 5, 2024 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Zachary Lancaster. (Attachments: #1 SUMMONS, #2 SUMMONS, #3 SUMMONS, #4 SUMMONS, #5 CIVIL COVER SHEET, #6 CORP DISCLOSER, #7 DIVERSITY DISCLOSUR, #8 SUPPLIMENTAL DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE) (Adams, Olivia)
April 3, 2024 Filing 5 Summonses Issued as to Big G Express, Inc., Aerias Williams. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summonses. Attested Complaint emailed to filing attorney. (DeW)
April 2, 2024 Filing 4 Diversity Case Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(2)) by Zachary Lancaster. (DeW)
April 2, 2024 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(1)) by Zachary Lancaster. (DeW)
April 2, 2024 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Benjamin Beaton. (DeW)
April 2, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Zachary Lancaster against Big G Express, Inc., Aerias Williams. (Filing fee $405, receipt number AKYWDC-4007115.) (Attachments: #1 Summons TENDERED, #2 Summons TENDERED, #3 Cover Sheet BLANK) (DeW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lancaster v. Big G Express, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachary Lancaster
Represented By: Chip Adams, II
Represented By: Olivia Anne Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big G Express, Inc. doing business as RTR Transportation Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aerias Williams
Represented By: Matthew B. Gay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big G Express, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew B. Gay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RTR Transportation Services
Represented By: Matthew B. Gay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JARRETT LOCKRIDGE
Represented By: Matthew B. Gay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Kentucky Employers' Mutual Insurance
Represented By: Darren R. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?