AFSCME, et al v. St of LA, et al
Plaintiff: Georgia Tauzin, John Harvey, Jr, Ezra C Bobb, Joseph Sampey, Jr, Karen B Hoyt, Calvin D Carter, Donna Willis, Ruby L Benoit, Cathy L Walls, Barbara Prince, Cheryl B Norwood, Eugene Breasher, Gregory K Collins, Herman E Harris, Eugene Jackson, Rhonda Hoyt, Ephriam White, Shirley Lee, Herman C Clark, Roy G Williams, Annie Hudson, Elmeda A Brown, Willie Thomas, Linda Rice, Blanche Dunbar, Ronald Bell, Henry L Begnaud, Patricia S Armstead, Randall E Caleote, Darlene Ricard, Jo Ann Peshoff, Robert W Carter, Donald A Mitchell, Kaaryn C Guidrez, Trudy B Davis, Natalie Ruddock, Warner Wilson, Ola M Davis, Verna B Baker, Brian A LeBlanc, Theresa Jardoin, Debra Wearry, Berneta E Thomas, Peggy D Doucet, Melvin J Bazile, Rose M Smith, Shirley Hurst, Elouise D Jones, Ophie M Breaux, Joseph R Guillory, Janice M Jackson, Donna R Suire, Arthye Lee Scott, Betty M Jackson, Jack E Clark, Charles R Moran, J W Patterson, George A Cole, Charlie L Daniel, Earnestine Jenkins, Robert E Beasley, Sarah H Jackson, Laura R Thomas, John A Catalanotte, David Simon, Luchell D Burke, Maxince Williams, Norma L Brown, Jerry L Lacaze, Marla Cole, Noney Jackson, Joseph Kelly, Jr, Michael Moore, Peggy D Skinner, Raymond Romero, Gerry L Conway, Martha M Fuselier, Mary L Randall, Jessica Hauser, Mallin W Fontenot, Laura M Charles, Robert E Thompson, Patsy M Horn, Johnny D Ross, Calvin T Royer, Roy Thomas, James N Cain, Steve Simmons, Donna M Wheaton, Janice A Varnado, Paul W Provost, Sr, Thomas O Deal, Alisha F LeBlanc, Cheri Turner, Jerald D Johnson, Milton Scarbrough, James E Mitchell, Zeta F Joubert, Fannie L Dokes, Mark A Square, Bernard Jackson, Sr, Bernard Williams, Clarence J Sullivan, Lorrain M Lewis, Deloris Corbin, Gayle M Pitcher, Louis W Snyder, Michael Hollier, Jean F McCaig, Leslie F Sherman, Charles Ramos, John D Thompson, Marsha K Norton, Robert J Fontenot, Brian K Thacker, James O Abram, Ledell George, Chandra M Jones, Tommy Addison, Mary L McDowell, Johnnie Smith, Clara Mae Wilson, Susan Duhon, Anthony M Paul, Kim L Jarvis, Sharon G Foster, Charlene M Batiste, Lilly M Prince, Beverly J Burton, Glenn Monistere, Berta M Williams, Mae O Booze, Anthony Colletti, Harold Chevalier, Johnny L Vercher, Elmira D Selders, James E Mifflin, Francis Sias, Jennifer Simms, Roy P Guillot, Gloria J Sarpy, Dennis L Brignac, Barbara J Jackson, Elzy Burton, Jr, Wriller M Thompson, Regina G Brown, Elizabeth Thomas, Donald R Jefferson, Barbara Ardoin, Edward L Wilson, Frank Garrett, Jr, Joyce Z Baker, Marlene M Comeaux, Don E Kerbow, Davelyn L Singleton, Kenneth W Haley, Donna L Arceneaux, Darryl C Pinder, Joyce C Irving, Laura Williams, John D Wisenbaker, Debbie M Kidder, Eola S Hills, Lucious Jackson, Jr, Frankie L Pierce, Linda M Lindsey, Coylene K Woodall, Yvonne Marie Hill, Emile Blackburn, Marjorie Evans, Mobil Producing Texas & New Mexico Inc., Dewey L Liles, Alberta Gray, Charles A Davis, Gwendolyn J Preston, Robert C Barber, Thelma D Brown, Paulette H Simmons, John T DeBarge, Lawrence W Draper, Nanette Cooper Thompson, Daniel D Andrus, Jr, Curtis L Coleman, Donald J Baudoin, Linda Cain Devaull, Ora Lee Tyler, Alan S Alexander, Ronald W Lilly, Amos Beverly, Jr, Connie S Boudreaux, Barbara D James, Norman R Johnson, Shirley Perry, Harry R Saucier, Catherine Seals, F B Coan, Jr, Anthony W Gill, Bonnie F Fuller, Glenn J Clifton, Ella L Tillis, Emile Square, Clarice Draper, Angila F Jones, Carolyn B Cooley, Harold Orange, III, John Wright, Jr, Edward E Whiddon, Ray R Hyde, Jessica T Daigle, Veneta B Zeller, Rosa L Freeman, Delores Lodge, Mary E Pate, Rebecca S Vincent, Mary S Fontenot, Charlotte Primas, Patricia A Jones, David Y Clouse, Marie T Jolivette, Ronald Walker, Birdie Matthews, Elbia T Williams, Beverly A Garmon, Linda Fay Hodges, Donald Gallipeau, Linda Quinn, Brenda G Bernard, Miller Thomas, Jr, Steven T Koop, Roy E Spikes, Raphael A Parker, Robia Falghou, Keisha R Fields, Carlton L Miller, Leola Miller, Lowell A Green, Charles P Cruce, Clyde R Adcock, Shanna Werchan, John M Yaeger, Jr, Doris L Wheat, Beverly Bankston, Jonathan Shuler, Rosa R Thomas, Johnny E Snyder, Rosemary Norwood, Linda S DeRise, Hattis Williams, Patra Showers, Iris W Wilcox, Todd M Philson, Edward Mitchell, Gerald K Noel, Barbara Lanford, American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, Council 17, The, Pete M Gimnick, Pearly J Thomas, Betty S Harper, Lucille B Nickerson, Cherry A Allen, Orellia Wagner, Martha L Jenkins, Reva Daigle, Isaac G Rogers, Herbert D Bridges, Joseph Augustine, Jr, Heddy S Catalon, Lee Roy Booker, Brenda Siner, Lorraine Miller, Rufus M Gearen, Laurie Brumfield, Kevin T Bostick, Mary Anthony, Queen F Hughes, Michael Primas, John Daigle, Williamson L Johnson, Watty Jones, Jr, Bobby Bill, Marilyn Trahan, Brenda L Miller, Gloria Aa Arceneaux, Earnest Edwards, Jr, Lelon G Rougeou, Marshalle Bickham, Melvin D Villery, Johanna Crowe, Aldes Ogea, Rosa M Roland, Janice Henry, James P Charles, Linda D Pinder, David Moore, Ronald G Cansler, Louise Watson, Linda M Raymond, J Carter, Eddie H Wellman, Maxine K Williams, Iola Mae Selders, Patricia H Batiste, Donald J Weeks, Barbara Graham, Julia Doherty, Ella Lanier, John C Cormier, Richard A Whalen, Gloria Norwood-Rucker, Roy D Curry, Patsy Story, Century E Wallace, Laura L Evans, Abe J Graves, Lionell Perkins, Carolyn B Hughes, Laurie M Goodwin, Roger Benoit, Robert G Willis, Glenda White, Larry J Fountain, Lula Mae Hart, Robert A Boykin, George A Hill, John A Young, Diane P Shrope, Richard P Cotton, Robert Mautin, Lillian E Freeman, Idavis Yates, Greta B Whitley, James Slaughter, Linda G Baker, Rickey D Braus, Melvin Montgomery, Howard E Skidmore, Annie B Vercher, Donna R Chappel, Anthony L Fedele, Derick E Selders, Louis J Paul, Betty Severio, Dianne M Jackson, Vicky B Hebert, Bobbie F Dominquez, Michael A Savoy, Kenneth E Glasper, John J Babin, Lawrence M Welch, Vickie Ford, Rosetta C Hughes, George P Spivey, III, Jolene Constance, Michael R McCauley, Alton J Bennett, Clara M Arceneaux, Allison Comeaux, George L Marland, Yvonne J Prejean, Craig A Pearce, Uko W O'Connor, Dorothy M Sebille, Clifford E Mott, John A Ihle, Sr, Jackie L VanWinkle, Barbara Ann Amar, Perry M Burgess, Edna Perkins, Ricky L Perkins, Letonia Kirk, Joyce K Miller, Marjorie Toney, John Cosey, Myra J Lee, Earnestine Hinton, Patricia D Olinde, Dawn E Allen, Marie A Marcell, Johnnie Moses, Jr, Dorothy L Williams, Stanley J Hebert, Sandra B Hahn, Winnie G Marshall, Charles M Perkins, Sherman P Gordon, Andre' Brown, Shannon Trautman, Joyce Stevenson, Michael Baxter, Robbie E Berube, Lynette O Gill, Fred Torrence, Theresa D Stewart, Jackie Mixon, Darlene M Giroir, Edward E Dunham, Samuel E Burrell, Agnes D Young, Eddie J Veal, Bernice Hardy, Glen A Monceaux, James R Jenkins, Eddie J Dodd, Kenneth O Baker, Theresa Johnson, Rachael Lessard, Ronald E Bauer, William A Cain, Melvin Spann, Augustine Reed, Larry F Schroeder, Norma J Crittenden, Charlotte R Sullivan, Janice P Bruno, Ronald Wm Coleman, Elliott V Kaplan, Patricia S Palmer, Ruby N Burns, Charles E Blue, Chris J Tamplain, Antoinette M Liuzza, Alvin L Myers, Mary J Lazard, Charlene Trahan, Priscilla Onezine, Todd Maddox, Mary J Earls, Dianne P Ford, Creola L Jacque, William W Ferguson, Regina L Dunn, Lester D Johnson, Mae L Battles, Brenda Harrison, Irell Shelmire, Sadie M Chaney, Freda Cornner, Oradell G Simon, Ethel M Carter, Charles A Shoumake, Roy Warford, Mary Ann Wheat, Darwin G Wilson, Percy J Hawkins, Nancy Nepveux, Edmonia Roberts, Michael H Lafosse, Hollie Royer, Laura D Batiste, Barry J Newcomb, Brenda Kinchen, Clifford V Rachal, Cynthia D Beardon, Martha A Milton, Charles E Wilcox, Robert E Meche, Myra A Pete, Emanuel McClinton, Walter J Matheny, Elmer L Henry, Ella McGee, Samuel W Matthis, Marie C Turner, Norma K Ramos, John R Jackson, Marie P Snyder, Phyllis A Boutte, Theodore Guillory, Helen Barze, Douglas Sanders, Luther J Warden, Jr, Mary P Vallere, Cliff E Augustine, Peggy A Lee, Raymond Holmes, Brenda Hawkins, Ollie R Washington, Sewerage and Water Board of New Orleans, Rod D Broussard, Tricia A Bridges, Tammy Dorsey, Laura C Johnson, Charles A Broussard, Christine W Risin, Daniel D Witmer, Janice E Hiatt, Karen M O'Connor, Alfreda G Gistarb, Lucretia N Zanders, Annie H Lard, Melvin P Istre, John E Anderson, Alzenia J Dorsey, Bessie Davis, Charles V Russo, James D Rhodes, Cheyenne Curran, Melvyn T Duplantis, Jr, George A Miller, Twyla Williams, Priscilla H Pitre, Demetrius Maryland, James A Pickering, Alma Brumfield, Paul Hughes, Larry L Shropshire, Annie M Brown, David A Weaver, Sandra K Lutz, Johnny L Hughes, Sammie S Jackson, Lucinda Ray, Wiliam Lacey, Victoria Jackson, Lee J Trahan, Joseph Blanchard, Mary J Frazier, Alice M Pidgeon, Tony L Johnson, Sandra Ardoin, Nelda A Gill, Jay Harrod, Jr, Brenda Thomas, Robert L Yarbrough, William L Matthai, Geraldine J McGee, Sheila L Bennett, Wendy M Alberes, Regina D Prejean, Orville L Marcantel, Doyce M Creckmore, Leon J Franklin, Paul A St Julian, Malley Sparks, Jr, Michael J Constance, Terry P Bernard, Dorothy M Fields, Joseph E Melancon and Frank Kendall, Jr
Defendant: Civil Service Commission for the State of Louisiana and Louisiana State
Case Number: 2:1990cv04389
Filed: November 2, 1990
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Marcel Livaudais
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:0207
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2001. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2001 Filing 170 Notice or disposal of exhibits by Clerk (REF: 90-4389, 91-857, 91-858) (cca) Modified on 09/24/2001
September 21, 2001 Filing 173 RETURN OF EXHIBITS to atty James Dusty Rhodes by Clerk (REF: ALL CASES) (cca)
September 21, 2001 Filing 172 RETURN OF EXHIBITS to atty James Dusty Rhodes by Clerk (REF: ALL CASES) (cca)
September 21, 2001 Filing 171 RETURN OF EXHIBITS to atty James Dusty Rhodes by Clerk (REF: ALL CASES) (cca) Modified on 10/01/2001
June 26, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER from Court of Appeals: dismissing the appeal [168-1] pursuant to appellant's mtn to dismiss (Clerk) (REF: ALL CASES) (bc) Modified on 07/25/2001
June 26, 2001 Record on appeal returned from U.S. Court of Appeals [0-0] (bc)
April 20, 2001 Transmitted supplemental record on appeal to USCA [168-1] (REF: ALL CASES) (cca) Modified on 04/23/2001
March 20, 2001 Record on Appeal sent to Circuit Court [168-1] USCA Number: 01-30212 (REF: ALL CASES) (cca) Modified on 03/21/2001
March 15, 2001 Payment of appeal fee by defendant LA State of in amount of $ 100.00 [168-1] (REF: 90-4389, 91-857, 91-858) (cca)
March 8, 2001 Payment of appeal fee by defendant LA State of in amount of $5.00 [168-1] (gw)
February 15, 2001 Mail Returned [168-1] appeal addressed to attorney Sheldon David Beychok (REF: ALL CASES) (cca) Modified on 02/15/2001
February 7, 2001 Mail Returned [167-2] judgment addressed to atty Sheldon David Beychok (REF: ALL CASES) (cca) Modified on 02/07/2001
February 5, 2001 Filing 168 Notice of appeal by defendant LA State of from Dist. Court [167-2] judgment entered on 1/9/01 (REF: ALL CASES) (cca)
January 31, 2001 Mail Returned addressed to atty Sheldon David Beychok (Doc 166) (nn)
January 9, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 167 JUDGMENT: in favor of pla James D Rhodes & agst dft St of LA through the Dept of Wildlife & Fisheries for actual damages in the amt of $21,438.19, for liquidated damages in the amt of $21,438.19 together w/reasonable atty's fees & costs & interest from the date of jgm; FURTHER ORDERED that all other claims brought by all other plas agst all other dfts are dismissed as having been previously adjudicated or abandoned by Judge Marcel Livaudais ****CASE CLOSED***** (cca) Modified on 01/11/2001
January 9, 2001 Filing 166 Findings of fact and conclusions of law; all other claims in these three consol actions having been dismissed and/or otherwise adjudicated, these actions should be marked closed by Judge Marcel Livaudais (cca)
August 7, 2000 Filing 165 Deposition of Winton Vidrine taken on 4/25/00 by pla AFSCME (cca)
June 27, 2000 Filing 164 Proposed Findings of fact and conclusions of law filed by plaintiffs (REF: ALL CASES) (cca) Modified on 06/27/2000
June 23, 2000 Filing 163 Post-Trial Memorandum submitted by dft St of LA through the Dept of Wildlife & Fisheries (REF: 90-4389, 91-857, 91-858) (cca)
April 26, 2000 Mail Returned [162-1] order addressed to Sheldon David Beychock, counsel for LA State of (cca)
April 7, 2000 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDERED that post-trial briefs & the transcript of Winton Vidrine are due by 6/26/00; the trial shall not be considered submitted for statistical purposes until receipt of same by Judge Marcel Livaudais (REF: ALL CASES) (cca) Modified on 04/10/2000
March 24, 2000 Mail Returned [161-2] judgment addressed to Sheldon David Beychok of Beychok, Freeman & Brantley (cca)
March 15, 2000 Opinion or Order Filing 161 JUDGMENT: ORDERED that the St of LA & Washington Correctional Institute with regard to named plas is liable for payment (amounts listed in doc) of uncompensated overtime with a total amt of $13,680.05; that dfts State of LA & Washington Correctional Institute is liable to plas' counsel payment for attorneys' fees & costs in the sum of $50,000.00; that dft Southwest Developmental Center is liable to pla Thomas Turmel for uncompensated overtime in the amt of $800.00 by Judge Marcel Livaudais Date signed: 3/14/00 (Ref: All cases) (sw)
February 28, 2000 Filing 160 Transcript of non-jury trial (quantum issues) held on 1/31/00 bfr Judge (Ref: All cases) (sw)
February 28, 2000 Filing 159 Transcript of non-jury trial (liability issues) held on 11/8/99 bfr Judge (Ref: All cases) (sw)
February 14, 2000 Mail Returned [158-1] addressed to attorney Sheldon David Beychok (Ref: All cases) (sw)
February 3, 2000 Filing 158 MINUTE ENTRY 2/2/00: Counsel are to submit their post-trial memo on or bfr 3/17/00, addressing both the liability & the quantum issues concerning the sole remaining claim, that of James D Rhodes as set out in doc by Judge Ivan L. Lemelle (Ref: All cases) (sw)
January 31, 2000 Filing 157 PROCEEDING: Non-jury trial (quantum issues); Reported/Recorded by James Crull; witnesses sworn & testified; post trial briefs due 3/17/00; taken under submission by Judge Marcel Livaudais (Ref: All cases) (sw) Modified on 02/29/2000
November 29, 1999 Mail Returned [156-1] addressed to attorney Sheldon D. Beychok (Ref: All cases) (sw)
November 17, 1999 Mail Returned [Doc #154-1] addressed to atty Sheldon Beychok. (REF ALL CASES) (dno)
November 10, 1999 Filing 156 MINUTE ENTRY (11/9/99): Non-jury Trial on the quantum issues in the James D Rhodes claim shall be held on 1/31/00 at 10:00 am by Judge Marcel Livaudais (REF: all cases) (gw)
November 8, 1999 Filing 155 PROCEEDING: Reported/Recorded by James Crull; Non-jury Trial held ; Ntc of removal of exhibits to all counsel; The only remaining matter in this suit is James D Rhodes as pla & St of LA through Dept of Wildlife & Fisheries; Witnesses sworn & exhibits admitted; Opinion of District Judge that claimant is entitled to some overtime; Stip, oral entered into record; Judge requested a written stip as to funds distributed to other claimants in these consolidated cases; taken under submission; Court stands adjourned by Judge Marcel Livaudais (REF: all cases) (gw)
November 1, 1999 Filing 154 MINUTE ENTRY( 11/1/99): A conference shall be held in Chambers at 10:00 11/3/99 . by Judge Marcel Livaudais (REF: ALL CASES) (tbl) Modified on 11/02/1999
November 1, 1999 Filing 153 Pre-Trial Memorandum by defendant LA State of (REF: ALL CASES) (tbl)
October 25, 1999 Filing 152 Pre-Trial Memorandum by defendant LA State of; no pending mtns; list of wits & exh in 2:90-cv-04389 (REF: ALL CASES) (cca) Modified on 10/28/1999
October 4, 1999 Mail Returned [149-3] minute entry addressed to Sheldon David Beychok (REF: 90-4389, 91-857, 91-858) (pck)
September 23, 1999 Filing 151 Outline of issues to be addressed at trial filed by plas & dft (ijg)
September 23, 1999 Opinion or Order Filing 150 PRE-TRIAL ORDER: PTC held 9/22/99 by Judge Marcel Livaudais Date Signed: 9/22/99 (Ref all cases) (ijg)
September 23, 1999 Filing 149 MINUTE ENTRY( 9/22/99): Pre-Trial Conference held 9/22/99; non-jury trial will commence 11/8/99 at 10:00 a.m.; counsel are to contact the Court by phone conf on or bfr 10/14/99 to advise of the posture of any settlement negotiations by Judge Marcel Livaudais (Ref all cases) (ijg)
September 8, 1999 Filing 148 ANSWER by defendant State of Louisiana, through the Dept of Public Safety & Corrections-Corrections Service, the Dept of Wildlife and Fisheries & the Southwest LA Developmental Ctr to the 8th amd complaint by plaintiffs [129-1] (REF: ALL CASES) (pck)
June 30, 1999 Filing 147 MINUTE ENTRY 6/30/99: A status conf was held on 6/24/99. Upon the joint request of the ptys, the non-jury trial is cont at 10:00 11/8/99. A pre-trial conf shall be held at 2:00 9/22/99 by Judge Marcel Livaudais (Ref: All cases) (sw)
June 25, 1999 Mail Returned [146-1] minute entry addressed to Sheldon David Beychok. (gw)
June 15, 1999 Mail Returned [144-2] order addressed to Sheldon David Beychok counsel for defendant LA State (REF: ALL CASES) (pck)
June 7, 1999 Filing 146 MINUTE ENTRY (6/7/99): Status Conf previously set on 6/9/99 is canceled at counsel's req by Judge Marcel Livaudais (REF: all cases) (gw)
June 4, 1999 Filing 145 MINUTE ENTRY 6/4/99: A status conference is scheduled before Judge at 2:00 6/9/99 by Judge Marcel Livaudais (Ref: All cases) (sw)
March 26, 1999 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER: A pre-trial & status conf was held this date. ORDERED that the non-jury trial is cont at 10:00 7/19/99. A status/pre-trial conf shall be held at 2:45 6/29/99. FURTHER ORDERED that pla Clara Evans contact pla's counsel Gilbert Buras w/in 20 days of date of entry of this M.E. as set out in doc by Judge Marcel Livaudais Date Signed: 3/25/99 (Ref: All cases) (sw)
March 26, 1999 Filing 143 Outline of issues to be addressed at trial (Ref: All cases) (sw)
March 1, 1999 Mail Returned [142-1] order, [141-2] order addressed to Sheldon David Beychok. (gw)
February 23, 1999 Filing 142 NOTICE case reallotted to Magistrate Judge 4 by Clerk effective March 1, 1999 (REF: ALL CASES) (tbl)
January 25, 1999 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDERED that the claims of all plaintiffs, other than James D Rhodes, Clara Evans & Thomas Turmel be dism for failure to prosecute. Non-jury trial & pre-trial conf remain set by Judge Marcel Livaudais (Ref: All cases) (sw)
January 22, 1999 Filing 140 PROCEEDING: Reported/Recorded by James Crull; show cause hrg; case called; there are three plas' remaining; all claims, other than James Rhodes, Thomas Tremell & Clara Evans are dism by Judge Marcel Livaudais (Ref: All cases) (sw)
December 17, 1998 Mail Returned addressed to Sheldon David Beychok (doc no. 139) (ijg)
December 11, 1998 Mail Returned [138-1] minute entry addressed to Sheldon David Beychok. (gw)
December 4, 1998 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER: In order determine which claims remain for trial an order as set out in doc is issued; failure to respond to same will plas shall show cause at 10:00 1/22/99 why claims should not be dism w/prej. Ptys shall conclude disc with respect to plas remaining not later than 1/30/99 by Judge Marcel Livaudais (Ref: All cases) (sw)
December 4, 1998 Filing 138 MINUTE ENTRY 12/4/98: A status conf was held this date. Another status conf shall be held at 10:00 1/22/99. The pre-trial conf remains set at 2:00 3/25/99 & the non-jury trial remains set at 10:00 4/19/99 by Judge Marcel Livaudais (Ref: All cases) (sw)
October 13, 1998 Mail Returned [137-1] addressed to attorney Sheldon D. Beychok (Ref: All cases) (sw)
October 5, 1998 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER: A status conf was held 10/2/98. The non-jury trial remains set on 4/19/99 & the pre-trial conf remains set on 3/25/99. A status conf shall be held at 10:00 12/4/98 by Judge Marcel Livaudais (Ref: All cases) (sw) Modified on 10/05/1998
August 24, 1998 Mail Returned doc no. 136 addressed to Sheldon David Behychok (attempted-not known) (ijg)
August 14, 1998 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER: A status conf was held. Non-jury shall proceed, as scheduled, at 10:00 4/19/99. Final pre-trial conf remains set at 2:00 3/25/99. An addl status conf shall be held at 10:00 10/2/98 by Judge Marcel Livaudais (All cases) (sw)
July 22, 1998 Mail Returned [134-1] M.E. addressed to attorney Sheldon D. Beychok (nn)
July 20, 1998 Record on appeal returned from U.S. Court of Appeals [0-0] (Ref: All cases) (sw)
July 20, 1998 Filing 135 Judgment from Court of Appeals affirming the decision of the District Court [96-1] [95-1] affirming the decision of the District Court (POLITZ, HIGGINBOTHAM & DeMOSS); Issued as mandate on 7/20/98 (Ref: All cases) (sw) Modified on 07/22/1998
July 10, 1998 Filing 134 MINUTE ENTRY (7/10/98): Status Conf previously set on 7/10/98 is cont to 8/13/98 at 10:00 am by Judge Marcel Livaudais (REF: all cases) (gw)
June 5, 1998 Mail Returned addressed to Sheldon David Beychok of Beychok, Freeman & Brantley [133-1] order (ijg)
June 5, 1998 Mail Returned addressed to Sheldon David Beychok of Beychok, Freeman & Brantley [132-1] Scheduling order A status conf was held. Non-jury trial is cont & reset at 10:00 4/19/99; final pre-trial is cont & reset at 2:00 3/25/99. A status conf shall be held at 10:30 7/10/98, [132-2] order (ijg)
May 26, 1998 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER: A status conf was held. Non-jury trial is cont & reset at 10:00 4/19/99; final pre-trial is cont & reset at 2:00 3/25/99. A status conf shall be held at 10:30 7/10/98 by Judge Ivan L. Lemelle for Judge Livaudais (Ref: All cases) (sw) Modified on 05/26/1998
May 22, 1998 Filing 133 NOTICE case reallotted to Magistrate Judge 5, by Clerk (Ref: 90-4389, 91-857, 91-858) (sek)
May 20, 1998 Mail Returned [131-1] addressed to Sheldon D. Beychok (Ref: All cases) (sw)
May 12, 1998 Opinion or Order Filing 131 Motion by plaintiff Roger Benoit and ORDER that the claims of Roger Benoit be dism w/o prej by Judge Marcel Livaudais (Ref: All cases) (sw)
May 1, 1998 Mail Returned [130-1] addressed to attorney Sheldon D. Beychok (Ref: All cases) (sw)
April 23, 1998 Filing 130 MINUTE ENTRY (4/23/98): Status Conf presently set on 4/30/98 is cont to 5/22/98 at 10:00 am by Judge Marcel Livaudais (REF: all cases) (gw)
April 22, 1998 Mail Returned [128-1] motion order for leave to file 8th amd cmp addressed to Sheldon Beychok (nn)
April 20, 1998 Mail Returned [128-1] addressed to attorney Sheldon David Beychok (Ref: All cases) (sw)
April 13, 1998 Mail Returned [127-1] addressed to attorney Sheldon David Beychok (Ref: All cases) (sw)
April 3, 1998 Mail Returned addressed to Sheldon David Beychok [126-1] Scheduling order A status conf shall be held at 10:00 4/1/98, [126-2] order (gw)
April 2, 1998 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER: Status Conf held 10:00 4/1/98; any mtns for sum jgm or applications for preliminary injunctions due by 6/1/98; Non-jury Trial is re-set for 10:00 12/7/98; a final Pre-Trial Conference is re-set for 10:00 11/13/98; Counsel are to conduct disc on the claims of single plas during the next 30 days & schedule visits to Southwest State School & Northwest during the month of May for disc purposes; a Status Conf is set for 10:00 4/30/98 , by Judge Marcel Livaudais Date Signed: 04/01/98 (Ref: 90-4389, 91--857 & 91-858) (sek) Modified on 04/02/1998
April 1, 1998 Filing 129 PLAINTIFF'S EIGHTH AMENDED complaint [1-1]; adding numerous additional plaintiffs. (Ref: all cases) (sek) Modified on 04/06/1998
April 1, 1998 Opinion or Order Filing 128 Motion by plaintiffs AFSCME, et al and ORDER for leave to file 8th amd cmp , by Judge Marcel Livaudais Date Signed: 4/1/98 (Ref: 90-4389, 91-857 & 91-858) (sek)
March 13, 1998 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER: A status conf was held. AFSCME must produce Collective Bargaining Agreements, file an amd cmp listing all remaining plas & remaining claims & any mtn to reinstate plas not later than 4/1/98. Any mtns for sum jgm or applications for preliminary injunctions shall be filed not later than 6/1/98. A status conf shall be held at 10:00 4/1/98 by Judge Marcel Livaudais (Ref: All cases) (sw)
December 30, 1997 Mail Returned [125-1] addressed to attorney Sheldon D. Beychok (Ref: All cases) (sw)
December 22, 1997 Mail Returned [124-1] Scheduling order/minute entry [124-2] addressed to Sheldon David Beychok, atty for defendant LA State. (Ref: 90-4389) (sek)
December 22, 1997 Mail Returned, [123-1], [123-2] Scheduling order, [123-3], [123-4] addressed to Sheldon David Beychok, atty for defendant LA State. (Ref: 90-4389) (sek)
December 17, 1997 Opinion or Order Filing 125 MINUTE ENTRY 12/17/97: The order [123-1] recently entered setting pre-trial & trial dates is amended as follows: non-jury trial shall commence at 10:00 10/19/98. A pre-trial conf shall be held at 10:00 9/18/98. All other deadlines & cut-offs remain the same by Judge Marcel Livaudais (Ref: All cases) (sw)
December 12, 1997 Filing 124 PROCEEDING: Reported/Recorded by James Crull; hrg on rule to show cause; no appearance from certain plas; counsel to submit amd cmp & dism list; court recess by Judge Marcel Livaudais (REF: 90-4389) (pck) Modified on 12/16/1997
December 12, 1997 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER Order to show cause was held 10:00 12/12/97; following which a Status Conf was held ; plaintiffs and defendant shall submit a motion for dismissal w/o prej; all mtns for sum jgm or request for preliminary injunction shall be filed by 5/1/97; Pre-Trial Conference is scheduled for 2:00; Non-jury Trial shall commence 10:00 7/13/98; Status Conf shall be held 10:00 3/13/98 by Judge Marcel Livaudais (tbl)
December 12, 1997 Filing 122 Certification and Response to the orders of the court [121-1] by plaintiffs (REF: ALL CASES) (tbl)
October 1, 1997 Mail Returned [121-1] Scheduling order addressed to attorney Sheldon D. Beychok (Ref: All cases) (sw)
September 23, 1997 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER: A status conf was held this date by phone. Plas' counsel is directed to notify all remaining plas on or bfr 10/5/97 that they are to advise him on or bfr 12/5/97 of any remaining claims which they wish to assert or show cause at 10:00 12/12/97 why their suit should not be dism. All plas who have not responded to plas' counsel are ordered to show cause at 10:00 12/12/97 why their suits should not be dism for failure to prosecute. A status conf shall be held on 12/12/97 following the show cause hrg, to set final disc deadlines & pre-trial & trial dates by Judge Marcel Livaudais (Ref: All cases) (sw)
September 12, 1997 Mail Returned addressed to Sheldon Beychok, atty for the State of La., containing doc. [119-1] (jd)
September 9, 1997 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER from Court of Appeals: Appeal of pla Melvin Duplantis only is dismissed on 6/6/97. The appeal remains open as to pla Ronald Alford, et al. by Clerk, Fifth Circuit (REF: 90-4389) (jd)
September 5, 1997 Opinion or Order Filing 119 Motion by plaintiffs and ORDER that the status onf presently scheduled for 9/18/97 is converted to a phone conf at which a new status conf date shall be established by Judge Marcel Livaudais (Ref: All cases) (sw)
June 17, 1997 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER from Court of Appeals: Appeal of 8/26/96 dism (Ref: 90-4389) (sw) Modified on 06/19/1997
June 6, 1997 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER from Court of Appeals: dismissing Melvin Duplantis' appeal [103-1] by CLERK (Ref: 90-4389) (ps) Modified on 06/12/1997
June 2, 1997 Mail Returned addressed to attorney Sheldon D. Beychok [116-1] Scheduling order The non-jury trial presently set on 6/19/97 is cont. A status conf shall be held at 10:30 9/19/97., [116-2] order (Ref: All cases) (sw)
May 27, 1997 Mail Returned addressed to attorney Sheldon D. Beychok [115-1] Scheduling order, [115-2] minute entry (Ref: All cases) (sw)
May 22, 1997 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER: The pre-trial conf previously scheduled this date was converted to a status conf. The non-jury trial presently set on 6/19/97 is cont. A status conf shall be held at 10:30 9/19/97. The plas are to submit to the court on 7/22/97, a final report of all claims remaining in these consolidated actions to be determined & all plas asserting those claims. The Court advise the ptys that all remaining FLSA issues in this matter shall be resolved at the final trial by Judge Marcel Livaudais (Ref: All cases) (sw)
May 22, 1997 Opinion or Order Filing 115 PROCEEDING: Hrg held for plas' who have not responded timely; all present & ready; case called; no appearance or response from pty plas; court orders that any pla not on the attached list is dism as pty pla; Reported/Recorded by James Crull; court recess by Judge Marcel Livaudais (Ref: All cases) (sw)
May 22, 1997 Filing 114 Response by plaintiffs to court's rule to show cause [110-1] (Ref: All cases) (sw)
May 14, 1997 Mail Returned addressed to Sheldon David Beychok [113-1] (tbl)
May 9, 1997 Mail Returned [111-1] addressed to Sheldon D. Beychok (Ref: All cases) (sw)
May 7, 1997 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDERED that the mtn by plaintiff Melvyn T Duplantis Jr for partial expungement from the record [112-1] be denied by Judge Marcel Livaudais (Ref: All cases) (sw)
April 30, 1997 Opinion or Order Filing 111 Motion by plaintiffs and ORDER that the show cause rule & status conf presently scheduled for 5/2/97 is rescheduled at 10:00 5/22/97 by Judge Marcel Livaudais (Ref: All cases) (sw)
April 22, 1997 Mail Returned addressed to Sheldon David Beychok [110-1] (tbl)
April 21, 1997 Filing 112 Motion by plaintiff Melvyn T Duplantis Jr for partial expungement from record, as to correct an error and UNSIGNED ORDER (Ref: All cases) (sw) Modified on 05/07/1997
April 10, 1997 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER granting plas' motion to continue show cause rule & status conf [109-1] ; Order to show cause RESET to 9:30 5/2/97 by Judge Marcel Livaudais Date Signed: 4/9/97 Ref all cases (kh)
April 10, 1997 Filing 109 MOTION by plaintiffs to continue show cause rule & status conf Ref all cases (kh)
March 21, 1997 Filing 108 Letter to court from W. Brian Babin dated 3/17/97 in re: revised analysis of the present status of the case as of 3/14/97-summary of number of plas involved in the worksites where Gilbert Buras has indicated the plas to be dismissed, the worksites of potential violations & plas in worksites yet to be evaluated. (gw)
March 20, 1997 Payment of fee [103-1] appeal by plaintiff Melvyn T Duplantis Jr in 2:90-cv-04389 in amount of $ 105.00 (gw)
March 17, 1997 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER Pre-Trial Conference of 9:30 3/14/97 was converted to a status conf; Non-jury Trial is continued to 9:30 6/19/97; Pre-Trial Conference shall be held 10:00 5/22/97 ; plas are to submit to the Court on 5/22/97 a final report of all remaining claims by Judge Marcel Livaudais (REF: ALL CASES) (tbl)
March 14, 1997 Filing 106 Status report regarding compliance with order of 2/21/97 for pla notification (Ref: All cases) (sw)
March 13, 1997 Filing 105 MOTION by plaintiffs to continue pre-trial conf & to convert pre-trial conf to status conf to be heard before Judge (Ref: All cases) (sw)
March 13, 1997 Filing 104 Motion by plaintiffs for an exp hrg on their mtn to cont pre-trial conf & to convert pre-trial conf to status conf and UNSIGNED ORDER (Ref: All cases) (sw)
February 24, 1997 Record on Appeal sent to Circuit Court [96-1] (sw)
February 5, 1997 Mail Returned [103-1] appeal addressed to attorney Sheldon D. Beychok (Ref: 90-4389) (sw)
January 21, 1997 Mail Returned addressed to Sheldon David Beychok, [101-1] Scheduling order The order dated 12/6/96 is amd to stip that the pre-trial conf is set at 9:30 3/14/97, [101-2] minute entry (gw)
January 15, 1997 Filing 102 Transcript of non-jury trial held bfr Judge on 7/27/95 (Ref: All cases) (sw)
January 7, 1997 Opinion or Order Filing 101 MINUTE ENTRY 1/6/97: The order dated 12/6/96 is amd to stip that the pre-trial conf is set at 9:30 3/14/97 by Judge Marcel Livaudais (Ref: All cases) (sw)
December 23, 1996 Mail Returned addressed to attorney Sheldon D. Beychock (document no. 100) (Ref: All cases) (sw)
December 6, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER: A status conf was held 12/6/96. Non-jury trial is cont & reset at 9:30 4/10/97, with a pre-trial conf at 9:30 3/13/97. All plas who have not responded timely to plas' counsel Gilbert R. Buras, Jr. are ordered to show cause at 9:30 4/10/97 why their suits should not be dism for failure to prosecute by Judge Marcel Livaudais (Ref: All cases) (sw)
December 6, 1996 Filing 99 MOTION by plas & dft LA State of for continuance of the trial (Ref: All cases) (sw)
December 5, 1996 Mail Returned addressed to attorney Sheldon D. Beychok (document no. 98) (Ref: All cases) (sw)
November 22, 1996 Filing 98 MINUTE ENTRY 11/21/96: At the request of counsel, the pre-trial conf presently set on 11/22/96 is cont at 9:30 12/5/96 by Judge Marcel Livaudais (Ref: All cases) (sw)
October 28, 1996 Filing 97 TRANSCRIPT Order Form by plaintiffs (Ref: All cases) (sw)
October 16, 1996 Payment of appeal filing fee by plaintiffs in amount of $ 105.00 (Ref: All cases) (sw)
October 4, 1996 Payment of fee by defendant State of LA in the amount of $ 105.00 appeal fee (REF: All Cases) (jd)
October 4, 1996 Payment of fee by defendant LA State of in 2:90-cv-04389 in amount of $ 105.00 (gw)
September 30, 1996 Mail Returned doc #95 addressed to Sheldon David Beychok, Esq. (pck)
September 18, 1996 Filing 96 Notice of appeal by defendant State of LA from Dist. Court decision, jgm dated 8/19/96 & entered 8/20/96 (Ref: all cases) (ps) Modified on 09/19/1996
September 18, 1996 Filing 95 Notice of appeal by plas Ronald Alford, Wilbourne L. Anderson, Ralph Bennett, Roland J. Bertoniere, Thomas R. Breland, Troy B. Breland, Gilbert J. Brown, Joseph E. Cerniglia, Jr., Barney Crosby, George E. Denham, Tammy G. Duncan, Shelton Dyess, James L. Dykes, Edward D. Emmons, Harry Jack Forbes, Needham R. Forbes, Jr., Gloria Fortenberry, Guy D. Hammond, Paul W. Hebert, Quitmon Landrum, Titus R. Lawrence, Ronald Linder, John M. McElveen, Paul W. Miller, Gary W. Parker, Wiley J. Pernell, Harry L. Powell, James S. Riley, Jerry E. Rodgers, John F. Rudolph, Ronnie R. Seal, Greg K. Slade, Danny W. Smith, Gerald Smith, Shannon E. Stewart, Michael E. Todd from Dist. Court decision, that portion of jgm dated 8/19/96 & entered 8/20/96 dismissing stip claims (Ref: all cases) (ps) Modified on 09/19/1996
August 27, 1996 Mail Returned addressed to attorney Sheldon D. Beychok (document no. 94) (Ref: All cases) (sw)
August 26, 1996 Filing 103 Notice of appeal by plaintiff Melvyn T Duplantis Jr from the decision of denial on writ of certiorari (Docket #95-C-1155, Supreme Court St of LA, cont on from the jgm affirned-Civil Service Commission's decision on application for appeal, docket #95-CA-1531 (consolidated with Docket Nos. 96-CA-1532 & 95-CA-1533) with its accompanying amendments & attachments, Court of Appeals First Circuit, St of LA, cont on from referee's decision affirmed refering to ntc of decision on application for view of referee's decision, Civil Service Commission State of LA, cont on from Decision on Application for appeal, Docket #10694 (consolidated with docket #10934 & S-10935) with its accompanying amendments & attachments, Civil Service Commission's Referee St of LA, cont on from order on disqualification for benefits-found, discharged from job, but not for misconduct connected with the employment-affirmed, docket #H-595-AT-94, Appeals Tribunal St of LA entered on 8/22/96. (REF: 90-4389) (gw) Modified on 01/28/1997
August 19, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 94 JUDGMENT: ORDERED that the State of LA be found liable to those WCI plas classified as "Correctional Sergeants" who have served in the functional working classification as "Field Officer" at WCI for compensation at their ordinary rate of straight time pay; that the policy of the State of LA requiring pla to use accrued FLSA compensatory time prior to using their accrued annual leave does not violate any laws of the US & plas' claims are dism; that there remain other issues & claims in this proceeding for disposition by this court. The jgm relative to the two issues referenced herein is a final jgm as provided in FRCP 54(B). This court reserves & retains jurisdiction to adjudicate the remaining claims in this litigation by Judge Marcel Livaudais (Ref: All cases) (sw)
August 19, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER: A status conf was held 8/16/96. Non-jury trial is scheduled at 9:30 12/5/96, with a pre-trial conf at 9:30 11/22/96. All plas who have not responded timely to plas' counsel Gilbert R. Buras, Jr. are ORDERED to show cause at 9:30 12/5/96 why their suits should not be dism for failure to prosecute by Judge Marcel Livaudais (Ref: All cases) (sw)
August 13, 1996 Mail Returned addressed to attorney Sheldon D. Beychok (document no. 92) (Ref: All cases) (sw)
August 8, 1996 Filing 92 MINUTE ENTRY 8/7/96: At the request of counsel, the status conf presently set on 8/9/96 is cont at 10:00 8/16/96 by Judge Marcel Livaudais (sw)
August 5, 1996 Mail Returned addressed to attorney Sheldon David Beychok (document nos. 90 & 91) (Ref: All cases) (sw)
July 26, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDERED that a status conference is scheduled before Judge at 9:30 8/9/96 by Judge Marcel Livaudais (Ref: All cases) (sw)
July 26, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 90 Amended Findings and conclusions: ORDERED that the joint mtn for reconsideration of Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law entered on 1/12/96 [83-1] is granted in part & denied in part as stip & that the findings & conclusions are amended only insofar as above indicated by Judge Marcel Livaudais (Ref: All cases) (sw)
June 14, 1996 Mail Returned, addressed to Sheldon David Beychok, Esq. counsel for defendant LA State of (REF: ALL CASES) (pck)
June 7, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER Status Conf held ; Another status conf shall be scheduled once the pending mtns are decided by Judge Marcel Livaudais (REF: all cases) (gw)
June 5, 1996 Mail Returned, (Doc #88) addressed to atty Sheldon Beychok. (REF ALL CASES) (dno)
May 23, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER: A status conf was held this date. A further status conf will be held before Judge at 9:30 6/7/96 by Judge Marcel Livaudais (Ref: All cases) (sw)
May 1, 1996 Mail Returned addressed to attorney Sheldon David Beychok (document no. 87) (Ref: All cases) (sw)
April 25, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER: A status conf was held this date. ORDERED that the pre-trial conf & non-jury trial are cont. A status conf shall be held at 9:00 5/23/96 by Judge Marcel Livaudais (Ref: All cases) (sw)
April 12, 1996 Mail Returned addressed to Sheldon David Beychok, Esq. (Doc No 86) (REF: ALL CASES) (tbl) Modified on 04/18/1996
April 8, 1996 Filing 86 MINUTE ENTRY 4/8/96: At the request of counsel, a status conference is scheduled before Judge at 9:00 4/25/96 by Judge Marcel Livaudais (Ref: All cases) (sw)
March 14, 1996 Filing 85 Memorandum by defendant in support of the joint motion for reconsideration of Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law entered on 1/12/96 [83-1] (REF: ALL CASES) (tbl)
March 14, 1996 Filing 84 Memorandum of Law by plaintiffs in support of the joint motion for reconsideration of Findings of Fact & of Law entered on 1/12/96 [83-1] (REF: ALL CASES) (tbl)
March 14, 1996 Filing 83 MOTION by plaintiffs & defendants for reconsideration of Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law entered on 1/12/96 to be heard before Judge Livaudais & UNSIGNED ORDER; no hrg set (REF: ALL CASES) (tbl) Modified on 03/18/1996
March 1, 1996 Mail Returned addressed to attorney Sheldon D. Beychok (document no. 82) (Ref: All cases) (sw)
February 23, 1996 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER: A status conf was fheld on 2/9/96 A pre-trial conf shall be held regarding this trial phase at 9:45 5/9/96. Non-jury trial on this phase shall commence at 9:30 5/23/96 by Judge Marcel Livaudais Date Signed: 2/22/96 (Ref: All cases) (sw)
January 12, 1996 Filing 81 MINUTE ENTRY( 1/12/96): Status Conf shall be held 10:00 2/9/96 by Judge Marcel Livaudais (REF: All Cases) (jd)
January 12, 1996 Filing 80 Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law. Liability and quantum as to the listed issues which were set for trial have been bifurcated. by Judge Marcel Livaudais (REF: All Cases) (jd) Modified on 03/15/1996
December 5, 1995 Filing 79 Reply by plaintiffs to dft's suppl post-trial memorandum of law [74-1] (REF: ALL CASES) (tbl) Modified on 12/06/1995
November 14, 1995 Filing 78 Suppl Post Trial Reply Memo submitted by defendants LA State, WA Corr Institute. (REF: all cases) (gw)
November 14, 1995 Filing 77 Motion by defendant LA State of & WA Corr Institute for leave to file a suppl reply memo and UNSIGNED ORDER (REF: all cases) (gw)
September 6, 1995 Filing 76 Post-Trial briefs submitted by dfts (REF: ALL CASES) (pck)
August 25, 1995 Filing 75 Post-Trial memo of law submitted plaintiff AFSCME, and individual pla employees of the Washington Correctional Institute (REF: All Cases) (jd) Modified on 08/28/1995
August 25, 1995 Filing 74 Post Trial Memorandum by defendant LA State of questions presented, statements of facts, argument & conclusions of law (Ref: All cases) (sw)
August 2, 1995 Filing 73 Pre-Trial Memorandum by defendant LA State of outlining 3 issues to be tried on 7/27/95 (Ref: All cases) (sw)
July 27, 1995 Filing 72 PROCEEDING: Non-jury Trial held ; oral mtn to partially dismiss-granted; formal mtn to be filed; stip rec'd for filing; witnesses sworn; dft's mtn for jgm as a matter of law-denied; dfts reurge mtn-denied; matter submitted; post-trial briefs due 8/25/95; court recess by Judge Marcel Livaudais (gw)
July 27, 1995 Filing 71 Pre-Trial Memorandum by defendant LA State of outlining 3 issues to be tried on 7/27/95 (Ref: All cases) (sw)
July 24, 1995 Filing 70 Pre-trial statement of issues presented by plaintiffs (Ref: All cases) (sw)
June 23, 1995 Opinion or Order Filing 69 Motion by defendant LA State of and ORDER that the court's previous order of 6/13/95, resetting trial to 7/20/95, be modified so as to reset the trial at 9:30 7/27/95 by Judge Marcel Livaudais (Ref: All cases) (sw)
June 13, 1995 Opinion or Order Filing 68 Motion by plaintiffs and ORDER that the non-jury trial previously scheduled for 6/15/95 is cont & reset at 9:30 7/20/95 by Judge Marcel Livaudais (Ref: All cases) (sw)
May 30, 1995 Opinion or Order Filing 67 JUDGMENT: ORDERED that the complaints of the stip indiviudals be dism w/o prej; that with respect to Ronald Alford, Harry L Powell & Gerald Smith that they be permitted to maintain their actions as plas; that the stip plas employed at Washington Correctional Institute rights shall be adjudicated by Judge Marcel Livaudais Date signed: 5/26/95 (Ref: All cases) (sw)
May 19, 1995 Opinion or Order Filing 66 PROCEEDING: Show cause hrg; all present & ready; argument; counsel to submit dismissal order; court recess by Judge Marcel Livaudais (Ref: All cases) (sw)
May 8, 1995 Filing 65 ANSWER by defendant LA State of to complaint [1-1] & 4th amd cmp [28-1] by plaintiffs (Ref: All cases) (sw)
April 11, 1995 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER: A status conf was held this date by phone. ORDERED that the non-jury trial is cont & re-set at 9:30 6/15/95. A status conf shall be held at 10:00 5/19/95 following the show cause hrg by Judge Marcel Livaudais (Ref: All cases) (sw)
April 6, 1995 Filing 63 Witness list submitted by plaintiffs (Ref: All cases) (sw)
March 7, 1995 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Motion by defendant LA State of and ORDER that Non-jury Trial is set at 9:30 4/20/95; the status conf previously scheduled at 10:00 5/19/95 will be held as scheduled by Judge Marcel Livaudais Date Signed: 3/8/95 (Ref: All cases) (sw)
February 3, 1995 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER: A status conf was held on 2/2/95. Non-jury trial shall commence at 9:30 3/28/95 on the stip issues as to liability only. Non-jury trial shall commence at 9:30 4/20/95 on liability only on the issue of mandatory taking of compensatory time. A status conf shall be held at 10:00 5/19/95 by Judge Marcel Livaudais Date Signed: 2/2/95 (Ref: All cases) (sw)
January 24, 1995 Filing 60 MINUTE ENTRY 1/24/95: The status conf presently set on 1/27/95 is cont at at 2:30 2/2/95 by Judge Marcel Livaudais (Ref: All cases) (sw)
January 6, 1995 Filing 59 Joint discovery schedule & status report (Ref: All cases) (sw)
October 31, 1994 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER: A status conf was held 10/28/94. A revised joint disc schedule & status report shall be prepared by counsel & presented to the court on or bfr 1/6/95. The next status conf is set before Judge at 10:00 1/27/95 by Judge Marcel Livaudais Date Signed: 10/28/94 (Ref: All cases) (sw)
September 30, 1994 Filing 57 Discovery schedule & status report submitted by plas & dft St of LA (Ref: All cases) (sw)
September 21, 1994 Filing 56 Notice of consolidation to establish a master file & a master docket sheet for consolidated cases by Clerk (Ref: All cases) (sw)
July 25, 1994 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER: A status conf was held 7/22/94. A revised joint disc schedule & status report shall be prepared by counsel & presented to the court on or bfr 9/30/94. The next status conf is scheduled before Judge at 10:00 10/28/94 by Judge Marcel Livaudais (Ref: All cases) (sw)
May 4, 1994 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER: A status conf was held 4/29/94. A rule to show cause why plas who had not yet responded to disc was set this date. ORDERED that the claims of all plas listed in doc. no. 53 who plas' counsel has certified as non-responsive be dism w/o prej for failure to show cause why their action should not be dism. The next status conf shall be held at 10:00 7/22/94 by Judge Marcel Livaudais (Ref: All cases) (sw)
April 26, 1994 Filing 53 Affidavit of Gilbert R. Buras, Jr. re individuals whom pla has no FLSA Questionnaire on file. (REF ALL CASES) (dno)
April 22, 1994 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Motion by defendant LA State of and ORDER withdrawing attorneys Charles L. Patin Jr., Melanie Moreland Hartmann & William R. D'Armond and substituting attorney Sheldon David Beychok for same by Judge Marcel Livaudais (Ref: All cases) (sw)
April 22, 1994 Filing 51 Joint discovery schedule submitted by plaintiffs & defendant (Ref: All cases) (sw)
March 4, 1994 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER denying plas' mtn for partial sum jgm seeking dismissal of 7th amd cmp [42-1]; granting mtn by dft LA State of to dism plas' 7th amd cmp for failure to state a claim for which relief can be granted [41-1] & denying mtn by dft LA State of for sum jgm [40-1] by Judge Marcel Livaudais (Ref: All cases) (sw) Modified on 03/07/1994
February 23, 1994 Filing 49 Affidavit of Gilbert R. Buras, Jr. (Ref: All cases) (sw)
February 2, 1994 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDERED that the 1/31/94 order of this court [47-1] is modified as follows: Any pla who has not responded to dft's disc on or bfr 4/25/94 is ordered to show cause at 10:00 4/29/94 why their suit should not be dism for failure to respond to disc by Judge Marcel Livaudais (Ref: All cases) (sw) Modified on 02/02/1994
January 31, 1994 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER: A status conf was held 1/31/94. A rule to show cause why plas who had not yet responded to disc was set this date. Any pla who has not responded to dft's disc on or bfr 4/25/94 is ordered to show cause at 10:00 4/25/94 why their suit should not be dism for failure to respond to disc. Plas' counsel is directed to serve a copy of this order by mail, along with an explanation of its consequences, on any & all plas who have not yet responded to dft's disc on or bfr 2/22/94. Dft is to complete disc respecting AFSCME representatives concerning 207(o) & other issues on or bfr 6/30/94. Plas are to complete disc respecting dft worksite representatives & dfts are to complete disc of individual plas respecting non-FLSA issues on or bfr 11/30/94 & dft is to compete disc respecting individual plas respecting FLSA issues on or bfr 3/1/94. Another Status Conf shall be held on 4/29/94 following the rule to show cause scheduled at 10:00. by Judge Marcel Livaudais (Ref: All cases) (sw)
December 9, 1993 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MINUTE ENTRY 12/9/93: ORDERED that mtns set for hrg at 10:00 12/22/93 bfr Judge will be submitted w/o oral argument by Judge Marcel Livaudais (Ref: All cases) (sw)
December 6, 1993 Filing 45 Memo in opposition by plaintiffs to motions by defendant LA State of for partial summary judgment seeking dismissal of 7th amd cmp [42-1] & to dismiss plas' 7th amd cmp for failure to state a claim for which relief can be granted [41-1] & in reply to plas' motion for summary judgment [40-1] (Ref: All cases) (sw)
December 2, 1993 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MINUTE ENTRY 11/30/93: ORDERED that mtns set for hrg at 10:00 12/8/93 bfr Judge will be submitted w/o oral argument by Judge Marcel Livaudais (Ref: All cases) (sw)
November 30, 1993 Filing 43 Memo in opposition by defendant LA State of to motion for summary judgment [40-1] filed by plaintiffs (Ref: All cases) (sw)
November 23, 1993 Filing 42 MOTION by defendant LA State of for partial summary judgment seeking dismissal of 7th amd cmp to be heard before Judge at 10:00 12/8/93 (Ref: All cases) (sw)
November 23, 1993 Filing 41 MOTION by defendant LA State of to dismiss plas' 7th amd cmp for failure to state a claim for which relief can be granted to be heard before Judge at 10:00 12/8/93 (Ref: All cases) (sw)
November 15, 1993 Filing 40 MOTION by plaintiffs for summary judgment to be heard before Judge at 10:00 12/8/93 (Ref: All cases) (sw) Modified on 12/02/1993
October 19, 1993 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER: A status conf was held 10/15/93. Discovery schedule entered as stipulated. Order to show cause set at 10:00 1/31/94 & another status conf shall be held on 1/31/94 following the rule to show cause at 10:00. Another proposed joint discovery schedule shall be prepared by counsel & presented to the court one week prior to the 1/31/94 stat conf by Judge Marcel Livaudais Date Signed: 10/18/93 (Ref: All cases) (sw)
October 18, 1993 Filing 38 PLAINTIFFS' SEVENTH AMENDED complaint adding numerous additional plaintiffs (Ref: All cases) (sw)
October 18, 1993 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Motion by plaintiffs and ORDER for leave to file 7th amd cmp by Judge Marcel Livaudais (Ref: All cases) (sw)
October 8, 1993 Filing 36 Joint Discovery Schedule by all parties in response to Court's Order of 7/16/93 (RE: ALL CASES) (br)
August 23, 1993 Filing 35 Joint Status Report re case activity from 1/8/93-10/15/93 filed by dfts and plas. (REF: 91-4389, 91-857 & 91-858) (rg)
July 16, 1993 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Status Conf held 10:00 7/16/93; the parties are to meet, confect, and forward to the Court on or bfr 8/20/93 a written status report outlining what has been completed since the last status conf and what the parties expect to complete bfr the next; the parties should prepare a joint discovery schedule which shall detail the projected completion date of discovery, and provide it to the Court one week prior to the next Status Conf which is set for 10:00 a.m. on 10/15/93 by Judge Marcel Livaudais (Re: 90-4389, 91-0857, 91-0858) (br) Modified on 07/19/1993
May 27, 1993 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Motion by defendant LA State ofand ORDER that William R. D'Armond, Melanie Moreland Hartmann, Charles L. Patin Jr. be allowed to enroll as addl counsel for same by Judge Marcel Livaudais Date Signed: 5/28/93 (Ref: All Cases) (sw)
May 20, 1993 Filing 32 Letter to court from attorney Gilbert R. Buras, Jr. in re: projected discovery time (Ref: All Cases) (sw)
January 11, 1993 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER: A Status Conf was held 1/8/93 . Ptys have advised that discovery is proceeding & provided Court with a list, which is attached, of completed & pending interrogatories & request for production. Counsel have also confected a questionnaire form, which is also attached, to assist in providing discovery to the dfts of over 2,000 plas. The ptys are to attempt to complete this phase of discovery on or bfr 4/21/93. Counsel shall meet & develop a tentative trial plan, which shall be submitted to the Court on or bfr 6/21/93. Another status conf shall be held 10:00 7/16/93 by Judge Marcel Livaudais (Ref: All Cases) (sw)
August 11, 1992 Filing 30 MINUTE ENTRY( 8/10/92): A Status Conf was held 8/7/92. A further Status Conf is set for 9:00 1/8/93. by Judge Marcel Livaudais (REF ALL CASES) (dno)
April 30, 1992 Filing 29 PLAINTIFF'S 6TH AMENDED complaint; adding - Civil Serv Comm for the State of Louisiana as an additional deft; 1 summons(es) issued (Ref: All Cases) (sw)
April 29, 1992 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Motion by plaintiffs in 2:90-cv-04389, 2:91-cv-00857, 2:91-cv-00858 and ORDER for leave to file 6th amended complt by Judge Marcel Livaudais Date signed: 4/30/92 (Ref: All Cases) (sw)
April 28, 1992 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER denying motion of deft LA State of to dismiss case (25-1); FURTHER ORDERED that pltf file amended complt w/in 10 days of entry of this order joining the LA State Civil Service Commission as a pty deft. by Judge Marcel Livaudais (REF ALL CASES) (ctp)
April 20, 1992 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTE ENTRY 4/20/92: ORDERED that mtns set for hrg on 4/29/92 at 10:00a.m. bfr Judge will be submitted w/o oral argument by Judge Marcel Livaudais (Ref: All Cases) (sw)
March 30, 1992 Filing 25 MOTION by defendant LA State of to dismiss case to be heard before Judge at 10:00 4/29/92 (Ref: All Cases) (sw)
March 10, 1992 Filing 24 PLAINTIFF'S FIFTH AMENDED complaint adding numerous additional plaintiffs; 1 summons(es) issued (Ref: All Cases) (sw)
March 9, 1992 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Motion by plaintiffs in 2:90-cv-04389, 2:91-cv-00857, 2:91-cv-00858 and ORDER for leave to file fifth amended complt by Judge Marcel Livaudais Date signed: 3/10/92 (Ref: All Cases) (sw)
February 7, 1992 Filing 22 MINUTE ENTRY 2/7/92: A status conference was held this date. Amendments must be filed w/in 60 days. Another status conference is scheduled before Judge at 9:15 8/7/92 by Judge Marcel Livaudais (Ref: All Cases) (sw) Modified on 02/10/1992
January 13, 1992 Filing 21 MINUTE ENTRY 1/13/92: a status conference is scheduled before Judge at 9:30 2/7/92 by Judge Marcel Livaudais (REF: ALL CASES) (sw) Modified on 01/14/1992
January 8, 1992 Filing 20 PLAINTIFF'S 4TH AMENDED complaint adding numerous additional plaintiffs; 1 summons(es) issued (REF: ALL CASES) (sw)
January 7, 1992 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Motion by plaintiffs in 2:90-cv-04389, in 2:91-cv-857, in 2:91-cv-858 and ORDER for leave to file 4th amended complt by Judge Marcel Livaudais (REF: ALL CASES) (sw)
December 5, 1991 Filing 18 RETURN OF SERVICE of S&C on 3rd amended complt executed upon defendant LA State of in 2:90-cv-04389 on 10/9/91 (sw)
November 21, 1991 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Motion by attorney Daniel K. Rester and ORDER that same be allowed to w/draw as counsel for the State of Louisiana & that W. Brian Babin be enrolled in his place by Judge Marcel Livaudais Date signed: 11/22/91 (sw)
September 25, 1991 Filing 16 PLAINTIFF'S 3RD AMENDED complaint adding J O Abram, J E Anderson, P S Armstead, M J Bazile, S E Burrel, E Burton, Jr, C L Coeman, N J Crittenden, C L Daniel, C A Davis, L C Devaull, C Draper, L W Draper, M J Earls, L L Evans, L J Franklin, L E Freeman, K E Glasper, A B Graves, P J Hawkins, E L Henry, E S Hills, E Jackson, D R Jefferson, T Johnson, J D Johnson, A F Jones, P A Jones, M Lewis Jr, E McClinton, L Miller, D Moore, C E Mott, A L Myers, R Norwood, G Norwood-Rucker, P D Olinde, A M Paul, T M Philson, A M Pidgeon, A Reed, A L Scott, I Shelmire, L L Shropshire, P H Simmons, M Spann, G P Spivey III, R Thomas, R R Thomas, M Thomas Jr, C E Walace, E White, G White, E T Williams, M Williams, B Williams, W Wilson, E L Wilson, J D Wisenbaker, C D Beardon, T A Bridges, L D Burke, B Dunbar, K R Fields, D M Giroir, A Gray, R C Hughes, J C Irving, K L Jarvis, C M Jones, M A Marcell, C B Norwood, G M Pitcher, G W Preston, D L Singleton, M C Turner, S Werchan, D M Wheaton, I Yates, L N Zanders, C A Allen, K O Baker, V B Baker, P H Batiste, L D Batiste, M L Battles, C E Blue, E C Bobb, M O Booze, A M Brown, N L Brown, R G Brown, R N Burns, R D Curry, O M Davis, B F Dominquez, M Evans, D M Fields, D P Ford, R L Freeman, B F Fuller, B A Garmon, A G Gistarb, Q F Hughes, D M Jackson, B D James, T Jardoin, M L Jenkins, E Jenkins, E D Jones, L Kirk, L M Lindsey, W G Marshall, M A Milton, F L Pierce, C Ramos, N K Ramos, R M Roland, G J Sarpy, J Slaughter, R M Smith, C R Sullivan, L R Thomas, A B Vercher, O R Washington, M K Williams, D L Williams, J M Yeager Jr, A D Young, M Anthony, C M Arceneaux, D L Arceneaux, G A Arceneaux, C M Batiste, D J Baudoin, R L Benoit, B G Bernard, C S Boudreaux, P A Boutee, J P Bruno, H S Catalon, L M Charles, H Chevalier, M M Comeaux, J T Daigle, R Daigle, S Duhon, M S Fontenot, R J Fontenot, M M Fuselier, L M Goodwin, B Hardy, B Harrison, J Hauser, V B Hebert, J E Hiatt, A Hudson, S H Jackson, M T Jolivette, Z F Joubert, M L McDowel, N Nepveux, L B Nickerson, M K Norton, P Onezine, M E Pate, M A Pete, Y J Prejean, R D Prejean, B Prince, L M Prince, M L Randal, N Ruddock, J Sampey Jr, D M Sebile, F Sias, J Simms, O G Simon, B Siner, M P Snyder, E Thomas, M Trahan, C Trahan, M P Vallere, D Willis, J J Babin, J Z Baker, L G Baker, D R Chappel, J Cosey, T B Davis, M T Duplantis Jr, R Falghou, M P Istre, J R Jenkins, W L Johnson, B A LeBlanc, G A Miller, E Mitchell, R A Parker, I G Rogers, C J Tamplain, E J Veal, J Wright Jr, V B Zeller, A J Dorsey, E Perkins, T Williams, E Blackburn, J T DeBarge, J Moses Jr, M A Savoy, D D Andrus Jr, C E Augustine, J Augustine Jr, H L Begnaud, T P Bernard, J Blanchard, R D Braus, R D Broussard, J P Charles, G J Clifton, R W Coleman, A Comeaux, J C Cormier, J Daigle, P D Doucet, George, K C Guidrez, J R Guillory, T Guillory Jr, S J Hebert, G A Hill, M Hollier, W Jones Jr, D M Kidder, M H Lafosse, M J Lazard, R E Meche, J E Melancon, G A Monceaux, C R Moran, G K Noel, L M Raymond, R Romero, C V Russo, P A St Julian, D R Suire, G Tauzin, L J Trahan, M D Villery, C R Adcock, T Addison, A S Alexander, S Ardoin, R C Barber, R E Bauer, R E Beasley, A J Bennett, R Benoit, R E Berube, K T Bostick, R A Boykin, O M Breaux, C A Broussard, E A Brown, A Brown, P M Burgess, J N Cain, W A Cain Jr, R E Caleote, R G Cansler, C D Carter, R W Carter, H C Clark, J E Clark, D Y Clouse, F B Coan Jr, D A Colbert, G A Cole, M Cole, A Colletti, M J Constance, C B Cooley, F Corner, D M Creekmore, J Crowe, C Curran, T O Deal, L S DeRise, E J Dodd, J DoHerty, W W Ferguson, M W Fontenot, L J Fountain, M J Frazier, D Gallipeau, R M Gearen, N A Gill, A W Gill, L O Gill, B Gill, P M Gimnick, L A Green, R P Guillot, K W Haley, B S Harper, H E Harris, J Harvey Jr, E Hinton, P M Horn, P E Hughes, J A Ihle Sr, J R Jackson, L D Johnson, T L Johnson, N R Johnson, E V Kaplan, F Kendall Jr, D E Kerbow, S T Koop, J L Lacaze, A F LeBlanc, P A Lee, L M Lewis, D L Liles, S K Lutz, T Maddox, O L Marcantel, W J Matheny, W L Matthai, S W Matthis, J F McCaig, M R McCauley, J E Mifflin, J K Miller, C L Miller, B L Miller, J E Mitchell, U W O'Connor, K M O'Connor, A Ogea, H Orange III, J W Patterson, C A Pearce, C M Perkins, J A Peshoff, J A Pickering, D C Pinder, P H Pitre, P W Provost Sr, L Quinn, C V Rachal, L Rice, E Roberts, J D Ross, L G Rougeou, H Royer, C T Royer, D Sanders, H R Saucier, M Scarbrough, L F Schroeder, L F Sherman, C A Shoumake, D P Shrope, J Shuler, S Simmons, D Simon, H E Skidmore, P D Skinner, L W Snyder, J E Snyder, M Sparks Jr, R E Spikes, C J Sullivan, B K Thacker, N C Thompson, R E Thompson, J L VanWinkle, J L Vercher, R S Vincent, L J Warden Jr, D A Weaver, L M Welch, E H Wellman, E E Whiddon, I W Wilcox, R G Williams, L Williams, B M Wiliams, R G Willis, D G Wilson, D D Witmer, R L Yarbrough & J A Young as additional plaintiffs 1 summons issd (sw) Modified on 10/08/1991
September 24, 1991 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Motion by plaintiffs in 2:90-cv-04389 and ORDER for leave to file 3rd amended complt by Judge Marcel Livaudais Date signed: 9/25/91 (sw)
June 11, 1991 Filing 14 MINUTE ENTRY 6/10/91: Ptys have reported to court that discovery is proceeding smoothly, status conference scheduled on 6/13/91 in 2:90-cv-04389, in 2:91-cv-00857, in 2:91-cv-00858 is CANCELLED. by Judge Marcel Livaudais (sw)
June 3, 1991 Filing 13 MINUTE ENTRY 6/3/91: The status conference previously scheduled 6/14/91 at 10:00a.m. will instead be held on 6/13/91 at 10:00a.m. before Judge 2:90-cv-04389, in 2:91-cv-00857, in 2:91-cv-00858 by Judge Marcel Livaudais (sw)
April 12, 1991 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDERED Case consolidated 2:90-cv-4389 with member cases 2:91-cv-857, 2:91-cv-858 ; Mag. Division transferred from Mag. 3 in 91-858 to Mag. 4; all pleadings will only be docketed in and 90-4389; Status Conf set for 10:00 6/14/91 by Judge Marcel Livaudais (sw)
April 1, 1991 Filing 11 MINUTE ENTRY( 3/28/91): Status Conf set 10:00 4/12/91 , by Judge Marcel Livaudais (rg)
March 27, 1991 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying motion by defendant LA State of to dismiss pltfs' complt for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted [3-1] by Judge Marcel Livaudais (sw)
March 19, 1991 Filing 9 PLAINTIFF'S 2ND AMENDED complaint; adding Ethel M Carter, Laurie Brumfield, Anthony L Fedele, Sherman P Gordon, Karen B Hoyt, Carolyn B Hughes, Ray R Hyde, Barbara J Jackson, Bernard Jackson Sr, Betty M Jackson, Janice M Jackson, Sammie S Jackson, Victoria Jackson, Myra J Lee, Geraldine J McGee, Birdie Matthews, George L Marland, Patricia S Palmer, Iola Mae Selders, Louis J Paul, Michael Primas, Derick E Selders, Emile Square, Berneta E Thomas, Pearly J Thomas, Willie Thomas & Doris L Wheat as additional plaintiffs; 2 summons(es) issued (sw) Modified on 09/27/1991
March 19, 1991 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Motion by plaintiff Gregory K Collins, plaintiff Patsy Story, plaintiff Louise Watson, plaintiff Lee Roy Booker, plaintiff Barbara Ardoin, plaintiff Barbara Graham, plaintiff Creola L Jacque, plaintiff Michael Moore, plaintiff Beverly Bankston, plaintiff Laura C Johnson, plaintiff Brenda Thomas, plaintiff Debra Wearry, plaintiff Darlene Ricard, plaintiff Melvin Montgomery, plaintiff Barry J Newcomb, plaintiff Lionell Perkins, plaintiff Christine W Risin, plaintiff Gerry L Conway, plaintiff Wriller M Thompson, plaintiff Richard A Whalen, plaintiff Helen Barze, plaintiff Joseph Kelly Jr, plaintiff Sandra B Hahn, plaintiff Brenda Kinchen, plaintiff Ella L Tillis, plaintiff Mary Ann Wheat, plaintiff Shirley Perry, plaintiff Ronald Bell, plaintiff Deloris Corbin, plaintiff Jay Harrod Jr, plaintiff Barbara Lanford, plaintiff Marjorie Toney, plaintiff Greta B Whitley, plaintiff Clara Mae Wilson, plaintiff Richard P Cotton, plaintiff Hattis Williams, plaintiff Lula Mae Hart, plaintiff Ella Lanier, plaintiff Mark A Square, plaintiff Joyce Stevenson, plaintiff Catherine Seals, plaintiff Brenda Hawkins, plaintiff Annie H Lard, plaintiff Fred Torrence, plaintiff Elmira D Selders, plaintiff Coylene K Woodall, plaintiff Betty Severio, plaintiff Theresa D Stewart, plaintiff Charles P Cruce, plaintiff Shannon Trautman, plaintiff Sheila L Bennett, plaintiff Janice Henry, plaintiff Shirley Lee, plaintiff Rachael Lessard, plaintiff Marshalle Bickham, plaintiff Yvonne Marie Hill, plaintiff Antoinette M Liuzza, plaintiff Johnnie Smith, plaintiff Bessie Davis, plaintiff Eugene Breasher, plaintiff Linda Fay Hodges, plaintiff Demetrius Maryland, plaintiff Dennis L Brignac, plaintiff Thelma D Brown, plaintiff Alma Brumfield, plaintiff Raymond Holmes, plaintiff Ella McGee, plaintiff Cheri Turner, plaintiff Janice A Varnado, plaintiff Beverly J Burton, plaintiff Rhonda Hoyt, plaintiff Lorraine Miller, plaintiff Tammy Dorsey, plaintiff Orellia Wagner, plaintiff Regina L Dunn, plaintiff Ronald Walker, plaintiff J Carter, plaintiff Johnny L Hughes, plaintiff Jackie Mixon, plaintiff Shirley Hurst, plaintiff Earnest Edwards Jr, plaintiff Lucinda Ray, plaintiff Patra Showers, plaintiff Dawn E Allen, plaintiff John A Catalanotte, plaintiff Vickie Ford, plaintiff Noney Jackson, plaintiff Glenn Monistere, plaintiff Cathy L Walls, plaintiff Charlotte Primas, plaintiff Frank Garrett Jr, plaintiff Roy Warford, plaintiff Barbara Ann Amar, plaintiff Sadie M Chaney, plaintiff Lucious Jackson Jr, plaintiff Fannie L Dokes, plaintiff Ora Lee Tyler, plaintiff Local 889 AFSCME and ORDER for leave to file 2nd amended complt by Judge Marcel Livaudais (sw)
March 19, 1991 Filing 7 Reply Memorandum by defendant LA State of in support of its motion to dismiss pltfs' complt for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted [3-1] (sw)
March 18, 1991 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Motion by defendant LA State of and ORDER for leave to file reply memo in support of its mtn to dismiss by Judge Marcel Livaudais Date signed: 3/19/91 (sw)
March 12, 1991 Filing 5 Response (memo in opp) by plaintiffs Gregory K Collins, Patsy Story, Louise Watson, Lee Roy Booker, Barbara Ardoin, Barbara Graham, Creola L Jacque, Michael Moore, Beverly Bankston, Laura C Johnson, Brenda Thomas, Debra Wearry, Darlene Ricard, Melvin Montgomery, Barry J Newcomb, Lionell Perkins, Christine W Risin, Gerry L Conway, Wriller M Thompson, Richard A Helen Barze, Joseph Kelly Jr, Sandra B Hahn, Brenda Ella L Tillis, Mary Ann Wheat, Shirley Perry, Ronald Bell, Deloris Corbin, Jay Harrod Jr, Barbara Lanford, Marjorie Toney, Greta B Whitley, Clara Mae Wilson, Richard P Cotton, Hattis Williams, Lula Mae Hart, Ella Lanier, Mark A Square, Joyce Stevenson, Catherine Seals, Brenda Hawkins, Annie H Lard, Fred Torrence, Elmira D Selders, Coylene K Woodall, Betty Severio, Theresa D Stewart, Charles P Cruce, Shannon Trautman, Sheila L Bennett, Janice Henry, Shirley Lee, Rachael Lessard, Marshalle Bickham, Yvonne Marie Hill, Antoinette M Liuzza, Johnnie Smith, Bessie Davis, Eugene Breasher, Linda Fay Hodges, Demetrius Maryland, Dennis L Brignac, Thelma D Brown, Alma Brumfield, Raymond Holmes, Ella McGee, Cheri Turner, Janice A Varnado, Beverly J Burton, Rhonda Hoyt, Lorraine Miller, Tammy Dorsey, Orellia Wagner, Regina L Dunn, Ronald Walker, J Carter, Johnny L Hughes, Jackie Mixon, Shirley Hurst, Earnest Edwards Jr, Lucinda Ray, Patra Showers, Dawn E Allen, John A Catalanotte, Vickie Ford, Noney Jackson, Glenn Monistere, Cathy L Walls, Charlotte Primas, Frank Garrett Jr, Roy Warford, Barbara Ann Amar, Sadie M Chaney, Lucious Jackson Jr, Fannie L Dokes, Ora Lee Tyler, Local 889 AFSCME to motion by defendant St of LA to dismiss pltfs' complt for failure to state a upon which relief can be granted [3-1] (sw)
March 11, 1991 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE ENTRY 3/11/91: ORDERED that motion by defendant LA State of to dismiss ptlfs' complt for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted [3-1] set for hrg on 3/20/91 at 10:00a.m. bfr Judge will be heard w/o oral argument by Judge Marcel Livaudais (sw)
February 19, 1991 Filing 3 MOTION by defendant LA State of to dismiss pltfs' complt for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted ; hrg set for 3/20/91 at 10:00a.m. bfr Judge (sw)
November 7, 1990 Filing 2 PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED complaint [1-1]; no new ptys added; 2 summons(es) issued (sw)
November 2, 1990 Payment of filing fee in amount of $ 120.00 paid by pltf. (gw)
November 2, 1990 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( 2 summons(es) issued ) (gw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AFSCME, et al v. St of LA, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgia Tauzin
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Harvey, Jr
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ezra C Bobb
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Sampey, Jr
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen B Hoyt
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calvin D Carter
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Willis
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruby L Benoit
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy L Walls
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Represented By: Jerry Louis Gardner, Jr.
Represented By: Louis Leo Robein, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Prince
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl B Norwood
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Breasher
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Represented By: Jerry Louis Gardner, Jr.
Represented By: Louis Leo Robein, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory K Collins
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Represented By: Jerry Louis Gardner, Jr.
Represented By: Louis Leo Robein, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herman E Harris
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Jackson
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Hoyt
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Represented By: Jerry Louis Gardner, Jr.
Represented By: Louis Leo Robein, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ephriam White
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Lee
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Represented By: Jerry Louis Gardner, Jr.
Represented By: Louis Leo Robein, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herman C Clark
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy G Williams
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annie Hudson
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elmeda A Brown
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Thomas
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Rice
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blanche Dunbar
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Bell
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Represented By: Jerry Louis Gardner, Jr.
Represented By: Louis Leo Robein, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry L Begnaud
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia S Armstead
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall E Caleote
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darlene Ricard
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Represented By: Jerry Louis Gardner, Jr.
Represented By: Louis Leo Robein, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jo Ann Peshoff
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert W Carter
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald A Mitchell
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaaryn C Guidrez
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trudy B Davis
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natalie Ruddock
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warner Wilson
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ola M Davis
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Verna B Baker
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian A LeBlanc
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Jardoin
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Wearry
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Represented By: Jerry Louis Gardner, Jr.
Represented By: Louis Leo Robein, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Berneta E Thomas
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peggy D Doucet
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin J Bazile
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose M Smith
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Hurst
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Represented By: Jerry Louis Gardner, Jr.
Represented By: Louis Leo Robein, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elouise D Jones
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ophie M Breaux
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph R Guillory
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice M Jackson
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna R Suire
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthye Lee Scott
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty M Jackson
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack E Clark
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles R Moran
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J W Patterson
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George A Cole
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlie L Daniel
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earnestine Jenkins
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert E Beasley
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah H Jackson
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura R Thomas
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John A Catalanotte
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Represented By: Jerry Louis Gardner, Jr.
Represented By: Louis Leo Robein, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Simon
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luchell D Burke
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maxince Williams
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norma L Brown
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry L Lacaze
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marla Cole
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noney Jackson
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Represented By: Jerry Louis Gardner, Jr.
Represented By: Louis Leo Robein, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Kelly, Jr
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Represented By: Jerry Louis Gardner, Jr.
Represented By: Louis Leo Robein, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Moore
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Represented By: Jerry Louis Gardner, Jr.
Represented By: Louis Leo Robein, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peggy D Skinner
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Romero
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerry L Conway
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Represented By: Jerry Louis Gardner, Jr.
Represented By: Louis Leo Robein, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha M Fuselier
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary L Randall
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Hauser
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mallin W Fontenot
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura M Charles
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert E Thompson
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patsy M Horn
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny D Ross
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calvin T Royer
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Thomas
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James N Cain
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Simmons
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna M Wheaton
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice A Varnado
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Represented By: Jerry Louis Gardner, Jr.
Represented By: Louis Leo Robein, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul W Provost, Sr
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas O Deal
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alisha F LeBlanc
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheri Turner
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Represented By: Jerry Louis Gardner, Jr.
Represented By: Louis Leo Robein, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerald D Johnson
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milton Scarbrough
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James E Mitchell
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zeta F Joubert
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fannie L Dokes
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Represented By: Jerry Louis Gardner, Jr.
Represented By: Louis Leo Robein, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark A Square
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Represented By: Jerry Louis Gardner, Jr.
Represented By: Louis Leo Robein, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernard Jackson, Sr
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernard Williams
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarence J Sullivan
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorrain M Lewis
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deloris Corbin
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Represented By: Jerry Louis Gardner, Jr.
Represented By: Louis Leo Robein, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gayle M Pitcher
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis W Snyder
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Hollier
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean F McCaig
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie F Sherman
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Ramos
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John D Thompson
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marsha K Norton
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert J Fontenot
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian K Thacker
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James O Abram
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ledell George
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chandra M Jones
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommy Addison
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary L McDowell
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnnie Smith
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Represented By: Jerry Louis Gardner, Jr.
Represented By: Louis Leo Robein, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clara Mae Wilson
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Represented By: Jerry Louis Gardner, Jr.
Represented By: Louis Leo Robein, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Duhon
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony M Paul
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim L Jarvis
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon G Foster
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlene M Batiste
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lilly M Prince
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly J Burton
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Represented By: Jerry Louis Gardner, Jr.
Represented By: Louis Leo Robein, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn Monistere
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Represented By: Jerry Louis Gardner, Jr.
Represented By: Louis Leo Robein, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Berta M Williams
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mae O Booze
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Colletti
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Chevalier
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny L Vercher
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elmira D Selders
Represented By: Jerry Louis Gardner, Jr.
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Represented By: Louis Leo Robein, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James E Mifflin
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francis Sias
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Simms
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy P Guillot
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria J Sarpy
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis L Brignac
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Represented By: Jerry Louis Gardner, Jr.
Represented By: Louis Leo Robein, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara J Jackson
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elzy Burton, Jr
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wriller M Thompson
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Represented By: Jerry Louis Gardner, Jr.
Represented By: Louis Leo Robein, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina G Brown
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Thomas
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald R Jefferson
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Ardoin
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Represented By: Jerry Louis Gardner, Jr.
Represented By: Louis Leo Robein, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward L Wilson
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Garrett, Jr
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Represented By: Jerry Louis Gardner, Jr.
Represented By: Louis Leo Robein, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Z Baker
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlene M Comeaux
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don E Kerbow
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Davelyn L Singleton
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth W Haley
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna L Arceneaux
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darryl C Pinder
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce C Irving
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Williams
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John D Wisenbaker
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie M Kidder
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eola S Hills
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucious Jackson, Jr
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Represented By: Jerry Louis Gardner, Jr.
Represented By: Louis Leo Robein, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frankie L Pierce
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda M Lindsey
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coylene K Woodall
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Represented By: Jerry Louis Gardner, Jr.
Represented By: Louis Leo Robein, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvonne Marie Hill
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Represented By: Jerry Louis Gardner, Jr.
Represented By: Louis Leo Robein, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emile Blackburn
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marjorie Evans
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mobil Producing Texas & New Mexico Inc.
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dewey L Liles
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alberta Gray
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles A Davis
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gwendolyn J Preston
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert C Barber
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thelma D Brown
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Represented By: Jerry Louis Gardner, Jr.
Represented By: Louis Leo Robein, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paulette H Simmons
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John T DeBarge
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence W Draper
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nanette Cooper Thompson
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel D Andrus, Jr
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis L Coleman
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald J Baudoin
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Cain Devaull
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ora Lee Tyler
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Represented By: Jerry Louis Gardner, Jr.
Represented By: Louis Leo Robein, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan S Alexander
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald W Lilly
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amos Beverly, Jr
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie S Boudreaux
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara D James
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norman R Johnson
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Perry
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Represented By: Jerry Louis Gardner, Jr.
Represented By: Louis Leo Robein, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry R Saucier
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Seals
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Represented By: Jerry Louis Gardner, Jr.
Represented By: Louis Leo Robein, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: F B Coan, Jr
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony W Gill
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie F Fuller
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn J Clifton
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ella L Tillis
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Represented By: Jerry Louis Gardner, Jr.
Represented By: Louis Leo Robein, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emile Square
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarice Draper
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angila F Jones
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn B Cooley
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Orange, III
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Wright, Jr
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward E Whiddon
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray R Hyde
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica T Daigle
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veneta B Zeller
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa L Freeman
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delores Lodge
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary E Pate
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca S Vincent
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary S Fontenot
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlotte Primas
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Represented By: Jerry Louis Gardner, Jr.
Represented By: Louis Leo Robein, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia A Jones
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Y Clouse
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie T Jolivette
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Walker
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Represented By: Jerry Louis Gardner, Jr.
Represented By: Louis Leo Robein, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Birdie Matthews
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elbia T Williams
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly A Garmon
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Fay Hodges
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Represented By: Jerry Louis Gardner, Jr.
Represented By: Louis Leo Robein, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Gallipeau
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Quinn
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda G Bernard
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miller Thomas, Jr
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven T Koop
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy E Spikes
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raphael A Parker
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robia Falghou
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keisha R Fields
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlton L Miller
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leola Miller
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lowell A Green
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles P Cruce
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Represented By: Jerry Louis Gardner, Jr.
Represented By: Louis Leo Robein, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clyde R Adcock
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shanna Werchan
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John M Yaeger, Jr
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doris L Wheat
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Bankston
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Represented By: Jerry Louis Gardner, Jr.
Represented By: Louis Leo Robein, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Shuler
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa R Thomas
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny E Snyder
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosemary Norwood
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda S DeRise
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hattis Williams
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Represented By: Jerry Louis Gardner, Jr.
Represented By: Louis Leo Robein, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patra Showers
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Represented By: Jerry Louis Gardner, Jr.
Represented By: Louis Leo Robein, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iris W Wilcox
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd M Philson
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Mitchell
Represented By: Gilbert R. Buras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times |