Pinero v. Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Vicki L. Pinero
Defendant: Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc., Jackson Hewitt Inc and Crescent City Tax Service, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2008cv03535
Filed: May 22, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: Other Statutory Actions Office
County: Acadia
Presiding Judge: Daniel E. Knowles
Presiding Judge: Sarah S. Vance
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 26:7430 IRS Tax Suit
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDERED that 172 Motion for Confidentiality Order; 189 Motion to Compel 192 Motion to Compel or in the Alternative Motion to Stay Discovery are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. This Order reserves the rights of the parties to re-urge the motions should the parties move to lift the stay and should the District Court grant such a motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III on 4/8/10. (sek, )
February 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER Resetting ORAL ARGUMENT on 172 MOTION for Confidentiality Order, 189 Motion to Compel, 192 MOTION to Compel Deposition of Plaintiff Vicki L. Pinero, or alternatively, MOTION to Stay Discovery, : Motion Hearing RESET for 4/14/2010 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles III. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III on 2/22/10.(sek, )
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER Resetting ORAL ARGUMENT on 172 MOTION for Protective Order/MOTION to Quash, 192 MOTION to Compel Deposition of Plaintiff Vicki L. Pinero, or alternatively, MOTION to Stay Discovery, 189 MOTION to Compel : Motion Hearing RESET for 2/24/2010 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles III. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III on 1/19/10.(sek, )
November 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER Resetting Hearing on 172 MOTION for Confidentiality Order, 189 MOTION to Compel & 192 MOTION to Compel Deposition of Plaintiff Vicki L. Pinero, or alternatively, MOTION to Stay Discovery: Motion Hearing RESET for 1/20/2010 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles III. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III on 11/25/09.(sek, )
September 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER granting 203 Motion to Stay as set forth herein. Signed by Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance on 9/22/09. (rll, )
September 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER granting 204 Joint MOTION to Stay Ruling & Continue Hearings filed by Vicki L. Pinero, Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc., Jackson Hewitt Inc. ORDER Resetting ORAL ARGUMENT on 192 MOTION to Compel Deposition of Plaintiff Vicki L. Pinero, or alternatively, MOTION to Stay Discovery, 179 MOTION for Protective Order / Confidentiality Order and 189 MOTION to Compel to 12/2/2009 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles III. The Court will also withhold ruling on plaintiff's motion for leave to file 4th amended complaint 173 for 60 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III on 9/16/09.(sek, )
September 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 204 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Stay Ruling, Joint MOTION to Continue Hearings by Vicki L. Pinero, Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc., Jackson Hewitt Inc. Motion(s) referred to Daniel E. Knowles, III. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Shartle, Bryan)
September 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 203 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Stay Case for 60 Days by Vicki L. Pinero, Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc., Jackson Hewitt Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Shartle, Bryan)
September 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 172 Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc.'s and Jackson Hewitt Inc.'s Motion for Protective Order & motion to quash. The motion is granted in part to the extent that the protective order will issue and the four subpoenas issued by this Court are quashed. It is denied in part to the extent that the seven other subpoenas issued by other district courts are not quashed. Further Ordered that Ace Cash Express, Inc.'s 182 Motion for Protective Order; Motion to Quash is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III. (sek, )
September 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 201 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc., Jackson Hewitt Inc re 189 MOTION to Compel. (Wein, Andrew)
September 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 200 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 198 Notice (Other). Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is Other Filings/Notice of Filing Bankruptcy. Clerk took corrective action, no further action is necessary. (bbc, )
September 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 199 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Vicki L. Pinero re 179 MOTION for Protective Order / Confidentiality Order. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Proposed Order)(Shartle, Bryan)
September 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 198 NOTICE OF FILING BANKRUPTCY by Crescent City Tax Service, Inc. (Hedrick, Lisa) Modified on 9/14/2009 to edit text/event (bbc, ).
September 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 197 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 195 Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion. Attachments have duplicate description. For attachment, select either a category OR enter a description, but not both since this results in duplicate docket text. Clerk took corrective action. No further action is necessary. (rll, )
September 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 195 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Vicki L. Pinero re 192 MOTION to Compel Deposition of Plaintiff Vicki L. Pinero, or alternatively, MOTION to Stay Discovery. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-G, # 2 Exhibits H-J)(Shartle, Bryan) Modified on 9/10/2009 to edit description of attachments (rll, ).
September 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER granting 193 MOTION to Expedite Hearing filed by Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc., Jackson Hewitt Inc. ORDER Setting ORAL ARGUMENT on 192 MOTION to Compel Deposition of Plaintiff Vicki L. Pinero, or alternatively, MOTION to Stay Discovery : Motion Hearing set for 9/23/2009 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles III. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III on 9/23/09.(sek, )
September 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 196 Minute Order. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III: Motion Hearing held on 9/9/2009. Ordered that 172 MOTION for Protective Order, MOTION to Quash; 182 MOTION for Protective Order and MOTION to Quash & 173 MOTION for Leave to File Fourth Amended Class Action Complaint are taken under advisement. (sek, )
September 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 193 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite Hearing by Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc., Jackson Hewitt Inc. Motion(s) referred to Daniel E. Knowles, III. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Jackson, Veronica)
September 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 192 MOTION to Compel Deposition of Plaintiff Vicki L. Pinero, or alternatively,, MOTION to Stay Discovery by Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc., Jackson Hewitt Inc. Motion(s) referred to Daniel E. Knowles, III. Motion Hearing set for 9/30/2009 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles III. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Hearing, # 2 Certificate, # 3 Memorandum in Support, # 4 Exhibit A, # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit C, # 7 Exhibit D, # 8 Exhibit E, # 9 Proposed Order)(Jackson, Veronica)
September 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER denying pla's 185 MOTION for Leave to File Excess-Page Reply to Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Fourth Amended Class Action Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance on 9/9/09.(rll, )
September 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER Setting ORAL ARGUMENT on 189 MOTION to Compel : Motion Hearing set for 9/23/2009 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles III. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III on 9/9/09.(sek, )
September 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 189 MOTION to Compel Discovery by Vicki L. Pinero. Motion(s) referred to Daniel E. Knowles, III. Motion Hearing set for 9/23/2009 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles III. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate, # 2 Notice of Hearing, # 3 Memorandum in Support, # 4 Exhibit A, # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit C, # 7 Exhibit D, # 8 Exhibit E, # 9 Exhibit F, # 10 Exhibit G, # 11 Exhibit H, # 12 Exhibit I)(Shartle, Bryan) Modified on 9/9/2009 to edit text (rll, ).
September 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 188 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Vicki L. Pinero re 182 MOTION for Protective Order and MOTION to Quash. (Shartle, Bryan)
September 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 187 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Vicki L. Pinero re 173 MOTION for Leave to File Fourth Amended Class Action Complaint. (caa, )
September 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER granting 185 Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III on 9/4/2009. (caa, )
September 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 185 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Excess-Page Reply to Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Fourth Amended Class Action Complaint by Vicki L. Pinero. Motion(s) referred to Daniel E. Knowles, III. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Pleading, # 2 Proposed Order)(Shartle, Bryan) Modified on 9/4/2009 to edit text (rll, ).
September 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER granting 183 MOTION to Expedite. ORDER Setting ORAL ARGUMENT re 182 MOTION for Protective Order and MOTION to Quash : Motion Hearing set for 9/9/2009 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles III. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III on 9/3/09.(sek, )
September 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 183 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite Hearing by ACE Cash Express, Inc.. Motion(s) referred to Daniel E. Knowles, III. Motion Hearing set for 9/9/2009 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles III. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Notice of Hearing, # 3 Proposed Order)(Foote, Jason)
September 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 182 MOTION for Protective Order and, MOTION to Quash by ACE Cash Express, Inc.. Motion(s) referred to Daniel E. Knowles, III. Motion Hearing set for 9/9/2009 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles III. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Rule 37 Certificate)(Foote, Jason) Modified on 9/3/2009 to edit text (rll, ).
September 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER Setting ORAL ARGUMENT on 179 MOTION for Protective Order / Confidentiality Order : Motion Hearing set for 9/23/2009 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles III. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III on 9/2/09.(sek, )
September 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 180 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc., Jackson Hewitt Inc re 173 MOTION for Leave to File Fourth Amended Class Action Complaint. (Jackson, Veronica)
September 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 179 MOTION for Protective Order / Confidentiality Order by Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc., Jackson Hewitt Inc. Motion(s) referred to Daniel E. Knowles, III. Motion Hearing set for 9/16/2009 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles III. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Hearing, # 2 Memorandum in Support, # 3 Affidavit Rule 26(c) Certification, # 4 Proposed Order)(Wein, Andrew)
August 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 178 DEFICIENT: MOTION to Quash And For Protective Order by ACE Cash Express, Inc.. Motion(s) referred to Daniel E. Knowles, III. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Foote, Jason) Modified on 8/31/2009 (rll, ).
August 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 177 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Vicki L. Pinero re 172 MOTION for Protective Order MOTION to Quash. (Shartle, Bryan)
August 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER Setting ORAL ARGUMENT on 172 MOTION for Protective Order & MOTION to Quash and 173 MOTION for Leave to File Fourth Amended Class Action Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 9/9/2009 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles III. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III on 8/25/09.(sek, )
August 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 175 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 172 MOTION for Protective Order, MOTION to Quash. Filing attorney selected incorrect hearing time. Correct hearing time is 11:00 AM. Clerk took corrective action. No further action is necessary. (rll, )
August 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 174 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc., Jackson Hewitt Inc regarding 172 MOTION for Protective Order MOTION to Quash (Jackson, Veronica)
August 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 173 MOTION for Leave to File Fourth Amended Class Action Complaint by Vicki L. Pinero. Motion(s) referred to Daniel E. Knowles, III. Motion Hearing set for 9/9/2009 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles III. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Pleading, # 2 Notice of Hearing, # 3 L.R. 7.6 Certificate, # 4 Memorandum in Support)(Shartle, Bryan)
August 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 172 MOTION for Protective Order, MOTION to Quash by Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc., Jackson Hewitt Inc. Motion(s) referred to Daniel E. Knowles, III. Motion Hearing set for 9/9/2009 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles III. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Hearing, # 2 Affidavit Rule 37 Certificate, # 4 Exhibit A, # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit C, # 7 Exhibit D, # 8 Exhibit E, # 9 Exhibit F, # 10 Exhibit G, # 11 Exhibit H, # 12 Exhibit I, # 13 Exhibit J, # 14 Exhibit K, # 15 Exhibit L, # 16 Exhibit M)(Jackson, Veronica) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/25/2009: # 17 Memorandum in Support) (rll, ). Modified on 8/25/2009 to attach complete copy of Memorandum in Support & edit hearing time (rll, ).
August 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER denying pla's 168 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for De Novo Review of April 21, 2009 Dispositive Magistrate Ruling. Signed by Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance on 8/18/09. (rll, )
August 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER denying pla's 167 Motion to Expedite Consideration of Motion to Modify Scheduling Order. Signed by Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance on 8/18/09. (rll, )
August 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 169 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc., Jackson Hewitt Inc re 166 MOTION for Extension of Deadlines, 167 MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Motion to Modify Scheduling Order (Rec. Doc. 166). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Wein, Andrew)
August 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 168 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for De Novo Review of April 21, 2009 Dispositive Magistrate Ruling by Vicki L. Pinero. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Proposed Pleading)(Shartle, Bryan)
August 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 167 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Motion to Modify Scheduling Order (Rec. Doc. 166) by Vicki L. Pinero. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Shartle, Bryan)
August 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 166 MOTION for Extension of Deadlines by Vicki L. Pinero. Motion Hearing set for 9/2/2009 10:00 AM before Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Hearing, # 2 Memorandum in Support)(Shartle, Bryan)
August 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER dismissing as moot 156 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III on 8/10/09. (sek, )
August 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 164 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 163 Return of Service (Non Summons & Complaint). Document has been stricken pursuant to Rule 5(d) of the FRCP. (rll, )
August 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 163 DOCUMENT STRICKEN. Return of Service of Republic Bank & Trust Company served on A.Brown on 7/28/2009 by Vicki L. Pinero.(Homes, Justin) Modified on 8/6/2009 (rll, ).
August 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 162 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc., Jackson Hewitt Inc re 156 MOTION to Compel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Jackson, Veronica)
July 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 161 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/29/2010 02:00 PM before Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance. Jury Trial set for 11/8/2010 08:30 AM before Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance. Signed by Clerk for Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance. (Attachments: # 1 Pretrial Notice Form)(rll, )
July 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 160 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 159 Statement of Corporate Disclosure. Filing attorney did not enter corporate parents at the prompt 'Search for a corporate parent or other affiliate'. Clerk took corrective action by adding corporate parent Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc. for Jackson Hewitt Inc. and Invesco Ltd. for Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc. No further action is necessary. (rll, )
July 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 159 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc., Jackson Hewitt Inc identifying Corporate Parent Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc. for Jackson Hewitt Inc; Corporate Parent Invesco, Ltd. for Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc. (Wein, Andrew) Modified on 7/30/2009 to edit text to add corporate parents (rll, ).
July 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 158 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Crescent City Tax Service, Inc. (Tweedel, Brett)
July 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER Setting ORAL ARGUMENT on 156 MOTION to Compel : Motion Hearing set for 8/12/2009 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles III. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III on 7/24/09.(sek, )
July 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 156 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by Vicki L. Pinero. Motion(s) referred to Daniel E. Knowles, III. Motion Hearing set for 8/12/2009 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles III. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Hearing, # 2 Rule 37.1 Certificate, # 3 Memorandum in Support, # 4 Exhibit A, # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit C)(Shartle, Bryan) Modified on 7/24/2009 to edit text (rll, ).
July 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER granting 154 Motion for Extension of Time; defendant, Crescent City Tax Service, Inc. d/b/a Jackson Hewitt Tax Service, is hereby granted an extension of time until August 14, 2009, within which to respond to plaintiff's Second Request for Production of Documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III on 7/16/09. (sek, )
July 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 154 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Discovery by Crescent City Tax Service, Inc.. Motion(s) referred to Daniel E. Knowles, III. (Attachments: # 1 7.6E Certificate, # 2 Proposed Order)(Buck, Thomas) Modified on 7/16/2009 to edit description of attachment (rll, ).
July 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 153 NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 7/30/2009 12:30 PM before courtroom deputy by telephone, by Clerk.(bbc, )
July 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER granting 147 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 119 Amended Complaint as to Crescent City Tax Service, Inc. answer due 6/29/2009. Signed by Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance on 7/2/09. (rll, )
July 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER granting 146 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 119 Amended Complaint as to Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc. answer due 6/29/2009; Jackson Hewitt Inc answer due 6/29/2009. Signed by Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance on 7/2/09. (rll, )
June 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ANSWER to 119 Amended Complaint by Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc., Jackson Hewitt Inc.(Wein, Andrew)
June 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ANSWER to 119 Amended Complaint by Crescent City Tax Service, Inc..(Buck, Thomas)
June 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 148 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 146 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer. Document should have been linked to another document by checking the box 'Should the document you are filing link to another document' or by selecting a related document on other appropriate screen. Clerk took corrective action by linking document to document #119. No further action is necessary. (rll, )
June 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 147 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re 119 Amended Complaint by Crescent City Tax Service, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Buck, Thomas)
June 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 146 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re 119 Amended Complaint by Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc., Jackson Hewitt Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wein, Andrew) Modified on 6/29/2009 to add link (rll, )..
June 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER granting dft Crescent City Tax Service, Inc. d/b/a Jackson Hewitt Tax Service's 143 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as set forth therein. Signed by Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance on 6/24/09. (rll, )
June 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 144 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 143 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 119 Amended Complaint. Filing attorney incorrectly changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the district judge. Clerk took corrective action. No further action is necessary. (rll, )
June 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 143 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 119 Amended Complaint by Crescent City Tax Service, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Buck, Thomas) Modified on 6/22/2009 to delete referral (rll, ).
June 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER granting 141 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 119 Amended Complaint as to Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc. answer due 6/26/2009; Jackson Hewitt Inc answer due 6/26/2009. Signed by Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance on 6/17/09. (rll, )
June 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 141 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re 119 Amended Complaint by Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc., Jackson Hewitt Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- Stipulation, # 2 Proposed Order)(Jackson, Veronica)
June 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 140 DEFICIENT: STIPULATION by Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc., Jackson Hewitt Inc re 119 Amended Complaint (Wein, Andrew) Modified on 6/15/2009 (bbc, ).
June 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER & REASONS 59 87 123 127 DENYING Crescent City's Motion to Dismiss; Granting in Part & Denying in part Jackson Hewitt's Motion to dismiss; DENYING dfts' Motion to Strike Class Allegations. Signed by Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance on 6/5/09. (bbc, )
June 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER denying 124 Request/Statement of Oral Argument filed by Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc., Jackson Hewitt Inc and 122 Request/Statement of Oral Argument, filed by Vicki L. Pinero. Signed by Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance on 6/3/09.(ala, )
June 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 137 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc., Jackson Hewitt Inc re 127 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(ecm, )
June 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER granting 135 Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum. Signed by Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance on 6/3/09. (ecm, )
May 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 135 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Further Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Third Amended Complaint by Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc., Jackson Hewitt Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Proposed Pleading Memorandum in Support, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B)(Wein, Andrew) Modified on 5/27/2009 to edit description of attachment (rll, ).
May 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 134 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Vicki L. Pinero re 121 MOTION for Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court re 117 Order on Motion for Leave to File Amended Class Action Complaint. (rll, )
May 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER granting pla's 132 Motion for Leave to File Reply in Response to Dft's Opposition to Pla's Motion for De Novo Review of April 21, 2009 Dispositive Magistrate Ruling. Signed by Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance on 5/26/09. (rll, )
May 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 132 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply by Vicki L. Pinero. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Proposed Pleading - Reply to Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for De Novo Review of April 21, 2009 Dispositive Magistrate Ruling)(Shartle, Bryan)
May 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER & REASONS denying pla's 66 Motion for Reconsideration of 1/7/2009 Order dismissing a number of pla's claims as set forth therein. Signed by Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance on 5/20/09. (rll, )
May 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 130 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc., Jackson Hewitt Inc re 121 MOTION for Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court re 117 Order on Motion for Leave to File Amended Class Action Complaint. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Gray, Veronica) Modified on 5/20/2009 to delete duplicate text (rll, ).
May 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 129 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Vicki L. Pinero re 127 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint, 123 MOTION to Dismiss Case. (Shartle, Bryan)
May 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER that the May 13, 2008 hearing previously scheduled before the undersigned Magistrate Judge is hereby CANCELLED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III on 5/8/09.(sek, )
May 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 127 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint by Crescent City Tax Service, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/27/2009 10:00 AM before Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Notice of Hearing)(Buck, Thomas)
May 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 126 DEFICIENT: MOTION to Dismiss on Rule 12(b)(6) by Crescent City Tax Service, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/27/2009 10:00 AM before Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support on Rule 12(b)(6), # 2 Notice of Hearing)(Buck, Thomas) Modified on 5/8/2009 (rll, ).
May 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 125 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 123 MOTION to Dismiss Case. Motion to Dismiss Case and Notice of Hearing were incorrectly filed as one PDF. The Notice of Hearing should have been filed as an attachment. All future filings should be entered this way. Clerk took corrective action to split the Notice of Hearing from the Motion and reattach same to docket entry. No further action is necessary. (rll, )
May 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 124 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc., Jackson Hewitt Inc regarding 123 MOTION to Dismiss Case (Wein, Andrew)
May 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 123 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc., Jackson Hewitt Inc. Motion Hearing set for 5/27/2009 10:00 AM before Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D)(Wein, Andrew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/5/2009: # 6 Main Document, # 7 Notice of Hearing) (rll, ). Modified on 5/5/2009 to split Main Document & Notice of Hearing and reattach (rll, ).
April 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 122 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by Vicki L. Pinero regarding 121 MOTION for Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court re 117 Order on Motion for Leave to File Amended Class Action Complaint (Shartle, Bryan) Modified on 5/1/2009 to remove duplicate text (rll, ).
April 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 121 MOTION for Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court re 117 Order on Motion for Leave to File Amended Class Action Complaint by Vicki L. Pinero. Motion Hearing set for 5/27/2009 10:00 AM before Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Hearing, # 2 Memorandum in Support)(Shartle, Bryan) Modified on 5/1/2009 to modify text (rll, ).
April 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER Resetting Hearing on 103 MOTION to Amend : Motion Hearing RESET for 5/13/2009 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles III. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III on 4/27/09.(sek, )
April 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 119 Third AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against all defendants filed by Vicki L. Pinero.(Shartle, Bryan)
April 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 118 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue and Reschedule Hearing by Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc., Jackson Hewitt Inc. Motion(s) referred to Daniel E. Knowles, III. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Farnet, Glenn)
April 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER denying 77 plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File 3rd amended complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III on 4/21/09. (sek, )
April 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER Setting ORAL ARGUMENT on 103 MOTION to Amend: Motion Hearing set for 4/29/2009 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles III. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III on 4/20/09.(sek, )
April 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER granting 114 Motion to Expedite Hearing on Motion for Extension of Time to File Amended Class Action Complaint; granting 113 Motion for Extension of Time to File Amended Class Action Complaint; amended complaint shall be filed no later than 5 days after Magistrate Knowles rules on pla's current motion for leave to file the third amended class action complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance on 4/15/09. (rll, )
April 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 114 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Time to File Amended Class Action Complaint as Ordered by the Court During the April 1, 2009 Hearing by Vicki L. Pinero. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Shartle, Bryan)
April 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 113 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint as Ordered by the Court During the April 1, 2009 Hearing by Vicki L. Pinero. Motion Hearing set for 4/29/2009 10:00 AM before Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Hearing, # 2 Memorandum in Support)(Shartle, Bryan)
April 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 112 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Vicki L. Pinero re 77 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Class Action Complaint. (sek, )
April 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER granting 107 Motion for Leave to File reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III on 4/13/09. (sek, )
April 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 110 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Vicki L. Pinero re 103 MOTION to Amend/Correct Document Number 77. (sek, )
April 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER granting 106 Motion for Leave to File reply re motion to amend. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III on 4/13/09. (sek, )
April 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 108 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc., Jackson Hewitt Inc re 107 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Defendants' Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Class Action Complaint. (Gray, Veronica)
April 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 107 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Defendants' Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Class Action Complaint by Vicki L. Pinero. Motion(s) referred to Daniel E. Knowles, III. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Pleading, # 2 Proposed Order)(Shartle, Bryan) Modified on 4/10/2009 to edit desc of attachments (bbc, ).
April 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 106 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply by Vicki L. Pinero. Motion(s) referred to Daniel E. Knowles, III. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Proposed Pleading Plaintiff's Reply to Memorandum in Opposition to Ex Parte Motion to Amend Document No. 77)(Shartle, Bryan)
April 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 105 Supplemental Memorandum filed by Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc., Jackson Hewitt Inc, in opposition of 77 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Class Action Complaint. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Gray, Veronica)
April 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 104 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc., Jackson Hewitt Inc re 103 MOTION to Amend/Correct Document Number 77. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Gray, Veronica)
April 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 103 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Amend/Correct Document Number 77 by Vicki L. Pinero. Motion(s) referred to Daniel E. Knowles, III. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Pleading Third Amended Class Action Complaint, # 2 Proposed Exhibit II, # 3 Proposed Order)(Shartle, Bryan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/7/2009: # 4 Proposed Exhibit II) (rll, ). Modified on 4/7/2009 to attach corrected Exhibit II (rll, ).
April 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 102 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 101 Supplemental Memorandum. Record doc#98 ordered supplemental memorandum to be filed. Images of attachments were deleted. Attachments to doc#77 are pending leave to be filed. If these attachments are to be amended, a properly formatted MOTION for leave to amend doc#77 should be filed. (bbc, )
April 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 101 Supplemental Memorandum filed by Vicki L. Pinero, in Support of 77 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Class Action Complaint. (Shartle, Bryan) (Images of Attachments deleted - attached to pending motion for leave to file - see doc#77) Modified on 4/7/2009 (bbc, ).
April 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 100 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Vicki L. Pinero re 66 MOTION for Reconsideration re 54 Order on Motion for Leave to File, Order on Motion to Certify Class, Order on Motion to Dismiss Case, Order on Motion to Strike. (rll, )
April 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER granting 92 pla's Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Further Support of Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance on 4/6/09. (rll, )
April 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 98 Minute Order. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III: Motion Hearing held on 4/2/2009. Ordered that, to the extent that Defendant's 58 MOTION to Stay may appear to conflict with the district judge's order to submit a discovery schedule it is DENIED IN PART; however, defendants' motion to stay is GRANTED IN PART, that is, insofar as the defendant seeks to temporarily delay merits based discovery until after the class certification phase of this case. Further Ordered that no later than Monday, April 6, 2009, plaintiff shall file a supplemental brief regarding the prescription issue identified more specifically as set forth in document. Any reply shall be filed no later than Wednesday, April 8, 2009. MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Class Action Complaint 77 filed by Vicki L. Pinero shall be deemed submitted for determination on April 8, 2009 at 5:00 P.M. (sek, )
April 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 97 Minute Order. Proceedings held before Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance: Motion Hearing held on 4/1/2009 re 59 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, MOTION to Strike Class Allegations in Second Amended Complaint filed by Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc., Jackson Hewitt Inc.; 66 MOTION for Reconsideration re 54 Order on Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Vicki L. Pinero. Motions argued & SUBMITTED; pla ORDERED to amend fraud claim within 15 days. (Court Reporter Toni Tusa.) (rll, )
March 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 96 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Vicki L. Pinero re 77 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Class Action Complaint. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(sek, )
March 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER granting 90 Motion for Leave to File 3rd Amended Class Action Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III on 3/31/09. (sek, )
March 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting 88 MOTION to Expedite Hearing on 87 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint Motion Hearing set for 4/1/2009 before Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance. Signed by Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance on 3/31/09.(bbc, )
March 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 93 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 92 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Reconsideration. Filing attorney incorrectly changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the district judge. Clerk took corrective action. No further action is necessary. (bbc, )
March 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 92 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum re their Motion for Reconsideration by Vicki L. Pinero. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Pleading Reply, # 2 Proposed Order)(Shartle, Bryan) Modified on 3/31/2009 to remove referral & edit text (bbc, ).
March 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 91 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Vicki L. Pinero re 87 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. (Shartle, Bryan)
March 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 90 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Opposition Memoranda to Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Class Action Complaint by Vicki L. Pinero. Motion(s) referred to Daniel E. Knowles, III. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Pleading, # 2 Proposed Pleading Exhibit A, # 3 Proposed Pleading Exhibit B, # 4 Proposed Pleading Exhibit C, # 5 Proposed Order)(Shartle, Bryan) Modified on 3/30/2009 to edit description of attachment (rll, ).
March 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 89 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 88 MOTION to Expedite Hearing. Filing attorney incorrectly changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the district judge. Clerk took corrective action. No further action is necessary. (rll, )
March 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 88 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite Hearing by Crescent City Tax Service, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Buck, Thomas) Modified on 3/26/2009 to remove referral (rll, ).
March 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by Crescent City Tax Service, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/15/2009 10:00 AM before Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Notice of Hearing)(Buck, Thomas)
March 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 86 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Crescent City Tax Service, Inc. re 77 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Class Action Complaint. (Buck, Thomas)
March 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 85 DEFICIENT: RESPONSE to Motion filed by Crescent City Tax Service, Inc. re 77 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Class Action Complaint Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion. (Buck, Thomas) Modified on 3/25/2009 (rll, ).
March 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 84 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Vicki L. Pinero re 59 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint MOTION to Strike Class Allegations in Second Amended Complaint. (Shartle, Bryan)
March 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 83 DEFICIENT: MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amending Complaint by Crescent City Tax Service, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/1/2009 10:00 AM before Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Notice of Hearing)(Buck, Thomas) Modified on 3/25/2009 (rll, ).
March 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 82 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc., Jackson Hewitt Inc re 66 MOTION for Reconsideration re 54 Order on Motion for Leave to File, Order on Motion to Certify Class, Order on Motion to Dismiss Case, Order on Motion to Strike. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- Transcript, # 2 Exhibit B- Unreported cases)(Gray, Veronica) Modified on 3/24/2009 to edit text (rll, ).
March 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 81 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc., Jackson Hewitt Inc re 77 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Class Action Complaint. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- Unreported Cases)(Gray, Veronica)
March 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 80 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on December 3, 2008 before Judge Sarah S. Vance. Court Reporter/Recorder Toni Tusa, Telephone number (504) 589-7778. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 21 days from the filing of this transcript to file with the Court a Redaction Request. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/2/2009. (clu, )
March 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting 75 MOTION to Continue Hearing on 59 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, MOTION to Strike Class Allegations in Second Amended Complaint; 66 MOTION for Reconsideration re 54 Order: Motion Hearing reset for 4/1/2009 10:00 AM before Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance with oral argument only having been granted on Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance on 3/2/09.(rll, )
February 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER Setting ORAL ARGUMENT on 77 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Class Action Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 4/1/2009 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles III. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III on 2/27/09.(sek, )
February 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Class Action Complaint by Vicki L. Pinero. Motion(s) referred to Daniel E. Knowles, III. Motion Hearing set for 4/1/2009 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles III. (Attachments: # 1 R. 7.6E Certificate, # 2 Notice of Hearing, # 3 Memorandum in Support, # 4 Proposed Pleading Third Amended Class Action Complaint, # 5 Proposed Exhibit T.Part 1, # 6 Proposed Exhibit T.Part 2, # 7 Proposed Exhibit U, # 8 Proposed Exhibit V, # 9 Proposed Exhibit W, # 10 Proposed Exhibit X, # 11 Proposed Exhibit Y, # 12 Proposed Exhibit Z, # 13 Proposed Exhibit AA.Part 1, # 14 Proposed Exhibit AA.Part 2, # 15 Proposed Exhibit BB, # 16 Proposed Exhibit CC, # 17 Proposed Exhibit DD, # 18 Proposed Pleading EE, # 19 Proposed Exhibit FF, # 20 Proposed Exhibit GG.Part 1, # 21 Proposed Exhibit GG.Part 2, # 22 Proposed Exhibit HH, # 23 Proposed Exhibit II)(Shartle, Bryan) Modified on 2/27/2009 to edit desc of attachments (rll, ). (doc#103 is a motion to amend/correct attachments of the proposed 3rd amd cmp and exhibit II) (bbc, ).
February 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting 74 MOTION to Continue Hearing on Motion to Stay Discovery filed by Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc., Jackson Hewitt Inc. ORDER Resetting ORAL ARGUMENT on 58 MOTION to Stay Discovery : Motion Hearing RESET for 4/1/2009 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles III. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III on 2/25/09.(sek, )
February 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 75 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration Currently Set for March 4, 2009 by Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc., Jackson Hewitt Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Banks, Gina)
February 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 74 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue Hearing on Motion to Stay Discovery and Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Currently Set for March 4, 2009 by Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc., Jackson Hewitt Inc. Motion(s) referred to Daniel E. Knowles, III. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Banks, Gina) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/25/2009: # 2 Proposed Order) (rll, ). Modified on 2/25/2009 to attach corrected image of Proposed Order (rll, ).
February 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 73 DEFICIENT: EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION TO CONTINUE AND RESCHEDULE HEARINGS ON MOTIONS TO DISMISS THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND TO STAY DISCOVERY by Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc., Jackson Hewitt Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Gray, Veronica) Modified on 2/23/2009 (rll, ).
February 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER DENYING 69 Request/Statement of Oral Argument re 66 MOTION for Reconsideration of 1/7/09 54 Order. Signed by Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance on 2/19/09.(bbc, )
February 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting 64 Request/Statement of Oral Argument filed by Jackson Hewitt dfts re their 59 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint ORAL ARGUMENT hearing set for 3/4/09 at 10:00AM. Signed by Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance on 2/11/09.(bbc, )
February 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER Setting ORAL ARGUMENT 58 MOTION to Stay Discovery : Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2009 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles III. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III on 2/11/09.(sek, )
February 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 69 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by Vicki L. Pinero regarding 66 MOTION for Reconsideration re 54 Order on Motion for Leave to File, Order on Motion to Certify Class,, Order on Motion to Dismiss Case, Order on Motion to Strike (Shartle, Bryan) Modified on 2/12/2009 to edit text (rll, ).
February 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 68 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 65 MOTION to Seal Document. Filing attorney did not attach Proposed Order at initial filing. Proposed Order provided to Clerk & image attached to original filing. Also, this motion is NOT set for hearing and is NOT referred to the Magistrate. This motion will be decided by the District Judge. Clerk has taken corrective action. No further action is necessary. (bbc, )
February 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 67 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Vicki L. Pinero re 58 MOTION to Stay Discovery. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Shartle, Bryan)
February 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MOTION for Reconsideration of 54 Order Dismissing pla's claims for unauthorized disclosure of tax returns by Vicki L. Pinero. Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2009 10:00 AM before Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Hearing, # 2 Memorandum in Support)(Shartle, Bryan) Modified on 2/11/2009 to edit text (bbc, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/11/2009: # 3 Proposed Sealed Documents (see doc#65)) (bbc, ).
February 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 65 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Seal Document (Exhibit A to doc#66 Motion for reconsideration) by Vicki L. Pinero. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Hearing, # 2 Memorandum in Support)(Shartle, Bryan) Modified on 2/10/2009 (bbc, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/11/2009: # 3 Proposed Order, # 4 Proposed Sealed Docs (Ex A to doc#66)) (bbc, ).
February 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 59 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint MOTION to Strike Class Allegations in Second Amended Complaint. Filing attorney incorrectly changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the district judge. Clerk took corrective action. Filing attorney attached a Request/Statement for Oral Argument to this motion instead of filing it as a separate entry. Clerk took corrective action by separating the request and docketing it as a separate entry. All future requests for oral argument must be filed separately. No further action is necessary. (rll, )
February 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 58 MOTION to Stay Discovery. Filing attorney should have changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the magistrate judge. Clerk took corrective action. Filing attorney selected incorrect hearing date. Correct hearing date is 3/4/2009. Clerk took corrective action. No further action is necessary. (rll, )
February 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 58 MOTION to Stay Discovery. Filing attorney attached a Request/Statement for Oral Argument to this motion instead of filing it as a separate entry. Clerk took corrective action by separating the request and docketing it as a separate entry. All future requests for oral argument must be filed separately. (rll, )
February 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 64 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc., Jackson Hewitt Inc regarding 59 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, MOTION to Strike Class Allegations in Second Amended Complaint. (rll, )
February 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 61 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc., Jackson Hewitt Inc regarding 58 MOTION to Stay Discovery. (rll, )
February 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, MOTION to Strike Class Allegations in Second Amended Complaint by Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc., Jackson Hewitt Inc. Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2009 10:00 AM before Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Motion to Dismiss, # 2 Notice of Hearing, # 3 Memorandum in Support, # 4 Request for Oral Argument, # 5 Exhibit A)(Gray, Veronica) Modified on 2/10/2009 to delete referral & edit text reflect disposition of request for oral argument (rll, ). REQUEST FOR ORAL ARGUMENT DOCKETED SEPARATELY
February 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MOTION to Stay Discovery by Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc., Jackson Hewitt Inc. Motion(s) referred to Daniel E. Knowles III. Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2009 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles III. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Notice of Hearing, # 3 Request for Oral Argument, # 4 Exhibit A, # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit C, # 7 Affidavit Pursuant to Local Rule 37.1, # 8 Proposed Order to Stay Discovery)(Gray, Veronica) Modified on 2/10/2009 to add referral, correct hearing date & edit text to reflect disposition of request for oral argument (rll, ). REQUEST FOR ORAL ARGUMENT DOCKETED SEPARATELY
January 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against all defendants filed by Vicki L. Pinero. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit R, # 2 Exhibit S)(Shartle, Bryan)
January 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 56 Supplemental Memorandum filed by Crescent City Tax Service, Inc. in Opposition to 12 MOTION to Certify Class. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(rll, )
January 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting 50 MOTION for Leave to File A Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Class Certification filed by Crescent City Tax Service, Inc.. Signed by Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance on 1/14/09.(rll, )
January 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting in part & denying in part dfts' 18 20 Motion to Dismiss w/out prej & with leave to amend within 20 days. The Court DENIES as premature pla's 12 Motion for Class Certification. Signed by Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance on 1/7/09. (bbc, )
December 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER withdrawing 46 Motion to Stay discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III on 12/9/08. (sek, )
December 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance: Motion Hearing held on 12/3/2008 re 18 MOTION to Dismiss Case Rule 12(b)(6), 20 MOTION to Dismiss all claims asserted in Pla's Class Action Complaint and First Amended Class Action Complaint, MOTION to Strike: Motions argued and submitted. (Court Reporter Toni Tusa.) (rll, )
December 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 50 MOTION for Leave to File A Supplemental Brief. Filing attorney incorrectly changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the district judge. Clerk took corrective action. Attachment has duplicate description. For attachment, select either a category OR enter a description, but not both since this results in duplicate docket text. Clerk took corrective action. No further action is necessary. (rll, )
December 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 50 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File A Supplemental Brief by Crescent City Tax Service, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Supplemental Brief In Opposition to Class Certification, # 3 Exhibit 1)(Buck, Thomas) Modified on 12/2/2008 to remove referral & edit desc of attachments (rll, ).
December 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 49 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Vicki L. Pinero re 46 MOTION to Stay Discovery. (Shartle, Bryan)
November 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Setting Oral Hearing on 46 MOTION to Stay Discovery : Motion Hearing set for Oral Hearing 12/10/2008 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles III. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III on 11/25/2008.(caa, )
November 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 46 MOTION to Stay Discovery. Filing attorney should have changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the magistrate judge. Clerk took corrective action. Filing attorney selected incorrect hearing date. Correct hearing date is 12/10/2008_. Clerk took corrective action. No further action is necessary. (rll, )
November 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MOTION to Stay Discovery by Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc., Jackson Hewitt Inc. Motion(s) referred to Daniel E. Knowles III. Motion Hearing set for 12/10/2008 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles III. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Local Rule 37.1 Certificate, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Notice of Hearing, # 5 Proposed Order)(Farnet, Glenn) Modified on 11/24/2008 to add referral & edit hearing date (rll, ).
November 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 45 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Vicki L. Pinero re 12 MOTION to Certify Class. (rll, )
November 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting pla's 38 Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Mtn for Class Certification. Signed by Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance on 11/18/08. (rll, )
November 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 43 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Support filed by Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc., Jackson Hewitt Inc re 20 MOTION to Dismiss all claims asserted in Pla's Class Action Complaint and First Amended Class Action Complaint, MOTION to Strike. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(rll, )
November 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting dft Jackson Hewitt Tax Service, Inc. and Jackson Hewitt Inc.'s 37 Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance on 11/18/08. (rll, )
November 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting 39 MOTION to Continue Hearing on 12 MOTION to Certify Class, 20 MOTION to Dismiss all claims asserted in Pla's Class Action Complaint and First Amended Class Action Complaint, MOTION to Strike: Motion Hearing reset for 12/3/2008 10:00 AM before Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance. Signed by Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance on 11/18/08.(rll, )
November 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting 33 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Veronica Gray for Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc. and Jackson Hewitt Inc. Signed by Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance on 11/12/08. (rll, )
November 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 39 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue Hearing on Motions by Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc., Jackson Hewitt Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Farnet, Glenn)
November 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 38 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Memoranda in Opposition to Motion for Class Certification by Vicki L. Pinero. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Proposed Pleading Reply to Memoranda in Opposition to Motion for Class Certification)(Shartle, Bryan)
November 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 37 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Further Support of Motion to Dismiss by Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc., Jackson Hewitt Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Reply Memorandum, # 3 Unpublished Opinions 1, # 4 Unpublished Opinions 2)(Farnet, Glenn)
November 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 36 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc., Jackson Hewitt Inc re 12 MOTION to Certify Class. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit)(Banks, Gina)
November 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Request for Judical NOTICE by Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc., Jackson Hewitt Inc>. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Banks, Gina) Modified on 11/5/2008 (rll, ).
November 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 33 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $5.). Filing attorney should have changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion Y/N?' before clicking the Next button. Clerk modified docket text to reflect 'Exparte'. No further action is necessary. (rll, )
November 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 33 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $5 - PAID.) by Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc., Jackson Hewitt Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-B, # 2 Proposed Order)(Banks, Gina) Modified on 11/4/2008 to edit text & fee status (rll, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/6/2008: # 3 Financial Sheet) (rll, ). Modified on 11/6/2008 to edit fee status & attach financial sheet (rll, ).
November 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 32 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Crescent City Tax Service, Inc. re 12 MOTION to Certify Class. (Buck, Thomas)
October 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER: considering the pending subpoena issued to the Jefferson Parish Sheriff's Office; 30 Ordered that the Jefferson Parish Sheriff's Office comply with the subpoena & allow inspection & copying of the documents referenced in the subpoena by Crescent City Tax Service, Inc. as set forth in document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III on 10/28/08. (sek, )
October 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 30 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Compel Inspection of Documents by Vicki L. Pinero, Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc., Jackson Hewitt Inc, Crescent City Tax Service, Inc.. Motion(s) referred to Daniel E. Knowles, III. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Order)(Buck, Thomas)
October 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 29 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Vicki L. Pinero re 20 MOTION to Dismiss all claims asserted in Pla's Class Action Complaint and First Amended Class Action Complaint, MOTION to Strike, 18 MOTION to Dismiss Case Rule 12(b)(6). (rll, )
October 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting pla's 26 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in Memorandum in Opposition to dfts' Motions to Dismiss and Strike. Signed by Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance on 10/22/08. (rll, )
October 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 26 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Opposition to Motions to Dismiss and Strike. Filing attorney should have changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion Y/N?' before clicking the Next button. Clerk modified docket text to reflect 'Exparte'. No further action is necessary. (rll, )
October 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 26 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Opposition to Motions to Dismiss and Strike, by Vicki L. Pinero. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Proposed Pleading Memorandum in Opposition to Motions to Dismiss and Strike)(Shartle, Bryan) Modified on 10/22/2008 to edit text (rll, ).
October 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting 24 Joint MOTION to Continue and Reschedule Hearings on 12 MOTION to Certify Class, 18 MOTION to Dismiss Case Rule 12(b)(6), 20 MOTION to Dismiss all claims asserted in Pla's Class Action Complaint and First Amended Class Action Complaint, MOTION to Strike: Motion Hearing set for 11/12/2008 10:00 AM before Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance. Signed by Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance on 10/2/08.(rll, )
September 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 24 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Continue and Reschedule Hearings on Motions by Vicki L. Pinero, Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc., Jackson Hewitt Inc, Crescent City Tax Service, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Homes, Justin)
August 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER 22 Joint MOTION to Continue Hearing on 12 MOTION to Certify Class, 18 MOTION to Dismiss Case Rule 12(b)(6), 20 MOTION to Dismiss all claims asserted in Pla's Class Action Complaint and First Amended Class Action Complaint MOTION to Strike: Motion Hearing set for 10/15/2008 10:00 AM before Judge Sarah S. Vance with oral argument. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 8/20/08.(rll, )
August 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 22 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Continue and Reschedule Hearings on Motions by Vicki L. Pinero, Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc., Jackson Hewitt Inc, Crescent City Tax Service, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Homes, Justin)
August 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting 14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Andrew S. Wein, Donna L. Wilson for Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc. and Jackson Hewitt Inc. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 8/11/08. (rll, )
August 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 15 MOTION to Dismiss & Alternative Motion to Strike Class Action Allegations. Filing attorney selected only one relief for a multiple-relief motion. To select multiple reliefs, you must select all applicable reliefs by clicking the additional relief(s) under 'Available Events' before clicking the Next button. Clerk took corrective action by re-docketing the document using the reliefs MOTION to Dismiss and MOTION to Strike. No further action is necessary. (rll, )
August 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss Case Rule 12(b)(6) by Crescent City Tax Service, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/3/2008 10:00 AM before Judge Sarah S. Vance. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Notice of Hearing)(Buck, Thomas)
August 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting 16 Request/Statement of Oral Argument on 15 MOTION to Dismiss & Alternative Motion to Strike Class Action Allegations : Motion Hearing set for 9/10/2008 10:00 AM before Judge Sarah S. Vance with oral argument. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 8/8/08.(rll, )
August 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss all claims asserted in Pla's Class Action Complaint and First Amended Class Action Complaint and alternative MOTION to Strike Class Action Allegations by Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc., Jackson Hewitt Inc. Motion Hearing set for 9/3/2008 10:00 AM before Judge Sarah S. Vance. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit A pt 1, # 3 Exhibit A pt 2, # 4 Notice of Hearing)(rll, ) Modified on 8/12/2008 to remove referral info (rll, ).
August 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc., Jackson Hewitt Inc regarding 15 MOTION to Dismiss & Alternative Motion to Strike Class Action Allegations (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Request for Oral Argument, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Request for Oral Argument)(Farnet, Glenn)
August 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ERROR: REDOCKETED AS DOC #20 -- MOTION to Dismiss & Alternative Motion to Strike Class Action Allegations by Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc., Jackson Hewitt Inc. Motion Hearing set for 9/3/2008 10:00 AM before Judge Sarah S. Vance. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support Rule (12)(b)(6), # 2 Exhibit A - Part 1, # 3 Exhibit A - Part 2, # 4 Notice of Hearing)(Farnet, Glenn) Modified on 8/11/2008 (rll, ).
August 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 14 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $10 - PAID) by Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc., Jackson Hewitt Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Exhibit Good Standing Certificate - Wein, # 3 Exhibit Good Standing Certificate - Wilson, # 4 Exhibit Certification - Wein, # 5 Exhibit Certification - Wilson)(Farnet, Glenn) Modified on 8/4/2008 (gec, ). Modified on 8/11/2008 to edit fee status & attach financial sheet (rll, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/11/2008: # 6 Financial Sheet) (rll, ).
July 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by Vicki L. Pinero regarding 12 MOTION to Certify Class (gec, )
July 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to Certify Class by Vicki L. Pinero. Motion Hearing set for 8/20/2008 10:00 AM before Judge Sarah S. Vance. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Notice of Hearing)(gec, )
July 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting 10 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 7/31/08. (gec, )
July 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 10 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Supporting Memorandum in Excess of Permitted Page Limitation by Vicki L. Pinero. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Order, # 2 Motion for Class Certification, # 3 Notice of Hearing Notice of Hearing, # 4 Request for Oral Argument, # 5 Proposed Pleading Memorandum in Support of Motion for Class Certification, # 6 Exhibit A)(Shartle, Bryan)
July 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 9 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against all defendants filed by Vicki L. Pinero. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A.Part 1, # 2 Exhibit A.Part 2, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F.Part 1, # 8 Exhibit F.Part 2, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I.Part 1, # 12 Exhibit I.Part 2, # 13 Exhibit I.Part 3, # 14 Exhibit J.Part 1, # 15 Exhibit J.Part 2, # 16 Exhibit K.Part 1, # 17 Exhibit K.Part 2, # 18 Exhibit L, # 19 Exhibit M, # 20 Exhibit N, # 21 Exhibit O, # 22 Exhibit P, # 23 Exhibit Q)(Shartle, Bryan)
July 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting 7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc. and Jackson Hewitt Inc answer due 8/4/2008. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 7/10/08. (ala, )
July 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 7 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc., Jackson Hewitt Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Farnet, Glenn)
July 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc. on 5/22/2008, answer due 7/21/2008; Jackson Hewitt Inc on 5/22/2008, answer due 7/21/2008. (Shartle, Bryan)
June 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Crescent City Tax Service, Inc. on 6/4/2008, answer due 8/4/2008. (Shartle, Bryan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/13/2008: # 1 Main Document) (rll, ).
June 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STIPULATED ORDER TO PRESERVE EVIDENCE as set forth in document 3 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III on 6/13/08. (sek, )
June 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 3 EXPARTE/CONSENT Consent MOTION for Protective Order to Preserve Evidence by Vicki L. Pinero. Motion(s) referred to Daniel E. Knowles, III. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Stipulated Order to Preserve Evidence)(Shartle, Bryan)
May 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc., Jackson Hewitt Inc, Crescent City Tax Service, Inc. (rll, )
May 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc., Jackson Hewitt Inc, Crescent City Tax Service, Inc. (Filing fee $ 350.) filed by Vicki L. Pinero. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A pt 1, # 2 Exhibit A pt 2, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F pt 1, # 8 Exhibit pt 2, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I pt 1, # 12 Exhibit I pt 2, # 13 Exhibit I pt 3, # 14 Exhibit I pt 4, # 15 Exhibit I pt 5, # 16 Exhibit J pt 1, # 17 Exhibit J pt 2, # 18 Exhibit J pt 3, # 19 Exhibit K pt 1, # 20 Exhibit K pt 2, # 21 Exhibit L, # 22 Exhibit M, # 23 Exhibit N, # 24 Exhibit O, # 25 Exhibit P, # 26 Exhibit Q)(rll, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/22/2008: # 27 Civil Cover Sheet) (rll, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pinero v. Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicki L. Pinero
Represented By: Bryan C. Shartle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson Hewitt Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crescent City Tax Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?