In Re: American Commercial Lines LLC
Defendant: Andrew Joseph, III and Csilla Fekete
Petitioner: Laurin Maritime AB, Anglo-Atlantic Steamship Limited, American Commercial Lines LLC, Whitefin Shipping Co. Limited and Laurin Maritime (America) Inc.
Claimant: Randy White, Sr., Muracin Vilceus, Robert Jackson, Dorian Sippio, Frankcard Goodjoint, Sr., Linda C. Davis, Guatam Rumar Sau, Crayton A. Martin, Enos Jones, Cleveland Ford, Acy J. Cooper, Jr., Dwayne V. Burrell, Kenneth Black, Marco Hunt, Regional Broussard, Rahjonae M. Briggs, Wayne A. Louviere, Hillary J. Prader, Lloyd J. Buchanan, James Lang, Henry Bass, Jr., Deanca W. Ward, Carl McCloud, Glenn Stevenson, Ashley N. Rome, Carmen Dor Lornisca, Anthony J. Faulkin, Alexander Scott, Idomene J. Nicolas, Robert W. Williams, Ashis Halder, Eric R. Briggs, Ervin J. Broyard, Johnathan P. Morrissey, Bianca Ward, Albert L. Smith, Craig Stieber, Enrique Miguel Johnson, Trudence Morgan, Pravakar Digar, Terrell L. Pye, Melvin A. Robinson, Robert Richardson, John A. Jefferson, Warren Roberts, Gary McKenzie, Rao Mukund, Peola O. Desdunes, Hugh J. Latulas, Edmond Jose Joseph, Travis A. Crawford, Emmet Pembrook, Anthony Marrero, Dieubon St. Juste, Deborah Bruce, Alfred Wilson, Jackson N. Shenica, Warren Dupar, Shawn M. Randolph, Nathan H. Scott, Carlton Young, Donald Roberts, Oles Chery, Eldridge E. Payton, Jean Pierre Louis, Sujit Roy, Darryl W. Prater, Odell Causey, Wendell B. Powell, Lawrence Garrett, Leonard S. Kenner, Eugene Collins, Demetrius Wilby, Johnny W Barrett, Frederick Johnson, Gail L. Moore, Bruce Goodrich, Adrine M. Briggs, Anthony Bell, Jahda Muhammad, Edwina Gibson, Annette M. Sorapuru, Frederico P. Cardiche, Gregory Carter, Corey Howard, Deborah Wooding, Lazaro Miranda, Valerie R. Moore, Luxeen Fremont, Michael LaGarde, Dayshawn M. Matthews, Jaquelin Ornelus, Weeks Marine, Inc., Wilmuin LePree, Dominic H. Green, Michael Vial, Rudolph Price, III, Melvin C. Ainey, Eddie Simmons, Raham Williams, Edmond K. Bailey, Vernon J. Pratt, Jr., Dralanjala Overshown, Jerome Williams, Jr., Manel Charles, Sherman J. Briggs, Sr., Jeffrey M. Kelly, Gwendolyn F. Green, Charles Chapman, Sr., Travis Alford, Melvin Smith, Ralph D. Taylor, Fred Alfred, Renaldo Smith, Marshall Jackson, Jr., Shannon R. Briggs, Wesley E. Boradbridge, Byron D. Alexander, Adrien Sterling, Ronald Taylor, Davie Hooker, Josue Isbeck, Marvin D. Mitchell, Melvin Hollins, Gayle Williams, Jefferson Magee, Justin L. Overton, Lewis Rothell, Michael Hammond, Ronald C. Hill, Milton Smith, Odlia Camille, Carmen Dorange, Meria Fremont, Wilbert Smith, Manas Mandal, Terry Thompson, Gour Gopal Das, Shelete Ramsey, Sherman Calice, New Orleans City, Harvey Jack, Marie Sterling, Steven M. Micoulin, Dedrick Lebeau, T, Sidney M. Givens, Thomas L. Atkinson, Alton C. Pitts, James R. Lee, Anita Richard, Anata Shas-Das, Norman S. Brasly, Steven Jude Dinet, Sr., Gland E. Alfred, Dieumafaite Nicolas, Connieyne Jackson, Hillery Jackson, Walter Leon Jenkins, Jr., Isaac Henderson, Norwood Allen, Cheryl S. Miller, Prosanta Guha, Edmond Joseph, Henry Glover and Doris Dequir
Counter Defendant: John Bavaret
Case Number: 2:2008cv04046
Filed: July 28, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: Personal Property: Other Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Ivan LR Lemelle
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 46:0181
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2014 Filing 22 USCA JUDGMENT issued as mandate on 2/3/2014; Ordered that the judgment of the District Court is affirmed. USCA judge name: JOLLY, SOUTHWICK, HAYNES. (lag, )
September 28, 2012 Filing 21 JUDGMENT entered in favor of Anglo-Atlantic Steamship Limited, Laurin Maritime (America) Inc., Laurin Maritime AB, Whitefin Shipping Co. Limited against D.R.D. Towing Company, L.L.C. and the MV Mel Oliver, and D.R.D. and the MV Mel Oliver are liable to and shall pay respective stipulated recoverable damages, plus interest and costs, as set forth in record document number 1368 . All claims by D.R.D. against TINTOMARA interests and ACL are dismissed; All claims by D.R.D. for the benefit of limitation of liability are rejected and dismissed; All claims by TINTOMARA interests against ACL and all claims by ACL against TINTOMARA interests are dismissed; and All claims by John Bavaret are rejected and dismissed. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle. (Reference: 08-4023, 08-4046, 08-4261, 08-4600)(ijg, )
September 2, 2011 Filing 20 USCA JUDGMENT issued as mandate on 9/1/11 as to #12 Notice of Appeal, #11 Notice of Appeal, #13 Notice of Appeal. ORDERED that the judgment of the District Court is affirmed in part and dismissed in part. USCA judge name: Higginbotham, Owen and Haynes. (Filed in Master Case 08-4007, doc. no. 1373). (mmv, )
September 2, 2011 Filing 19 Appeal Record Returned (original exhibits and/or non-electronic documents) from U.S. Court of Appeals: #9 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, #10 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. (Filed in Master Case 08-4007, doc. no. 1372). (mmv, )
September 2, 2011 Filing 18 USCA JUDGMENT issued as mandate on 9/1/11 as to #10 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, #9 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. ORDERED that the judgment of the District Court is affirmed in part and dismissed in part. USCA judge name: Higginbotham, Owen and Haynes. (Filed in Master Case 08-4007, doc. no. 1371). (mmv, )
January 25, 2011 Filing 17 USCA JUDGMENT issued as mandate on 1/21/2011 as to #15 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. ORDERED that the judgment of the District Court is reversed and the cause is remanded for further proceedings; USCA judge name: KING, STEWART, OWEN. (lag, )
April 14, 2010 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM of USCA - the court has granted appellant's motions to reinstate these appeals re: #9 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by American Commercial Lines LLC, #10 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Anglo-Atlantic Steamship Limited, Whitefin Shipping Co. Limited, Laurin Maritime AB (plh, )
February 9, 2010 Filing 15 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL by American Commercial Lines, Inc. (from Master Case, CA 08-4007, doc. no. 852). (lag, )
October 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER of USCA dismissing #9 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, #10 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, by Clerk. (lag, )
August 20, 2009 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEAL by D.R.D. Towing Company, L.L.C. (gec, )
August 13, 2009 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Laurin Maritime AB, Whitefin Shipping Co. Limited, Anglo-Atlantic Steamship Limited, Laurin Maritime (America) Inc. (master case 08-4007, doc #758). (gec, )
August 13, 2009 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEAL by American Commercial Lines LLC. (master case 08-4007, doc #757). (gec, )
June 15, 2009 Filing 10 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL by Laurin Maritime (America) Inc., Laurin Maritime AB, Whitefin Shipping Co. Limited, Anglo-Atlantic Steamship Limited. (master case 08-4007, doc #729) (blg)
June 10, 2009 Filing 9 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL by American Commercial Lines LLC, American Commercial Lines Inc. (lag, )
January 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Ivan L. R. Lemelle for all further proceedings. Judge Lance M Africk no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk.(car, )
August 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER consolidating 2:08-cv-04007-LMA-KWR with 08-4012, 08-4023, 08-4025, 08-4031, 08-4046, 08-4055, 08-4058, 08-4059, 08-4060 with instructions on filing stated herein. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk. (REF: ALL CASES)
July 28, 2008 Filing 6 STIPULATION For Costs (Cash Bond) by American Commercial Lines LLC (cms, )
July 28, 2008 Filing 5 AD INTERIM STIPULATION by American Commercial Lines LLC (cms, )
July 28, 2008 Filing 4 Notice of Related Case(s) by American Commercial lines LLC (cms, ) Modified on 8/11/2008 (cms, ).
July 28, 2008 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Value as to Fred O. Budwine (cms, )
July 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER approving security, directing issuance of notice, and restraining prosecution of claims; deadline to file claims is 12/1/08.. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 7/28/08. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Claimants)(cl, )
July 28, 2008 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability (Filing fee $ 350.) filed by American Commercial Lines LLC. (Attachments: #1 Verification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(cl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: American Commercial Lines LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Randy White, Sr.
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Muracin Vilceus
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Robert Jackson
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Dorian Sippio
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Frankcard Goodjoint, Sr.
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Linda C. Davis
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Guatam Rumar Sau
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Crayton A. Martin
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Enos Jones
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Cleveland Ford
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Acy J. Cooper, Jr.
Represented By: Val Patrick Exnicios
Represented By: Carlos Alberto Ramirez
Represented By: Amy Collins Fontenot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Dwayne V. Burrell
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Kenneth Black
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Marco Hunt
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Regional Broussard
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Rahjonae M. Briggs
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Wayne A. Louviere
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Hillary J. Prader
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Lloyd J. Buchanan
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: James Lang
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Henry Bass, Jr.
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Deanca W. Ward
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Carl McCloud
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Glenn Stevenson
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Ashley N. Rome
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Carmen Dor Lornisca
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Anthony J. Faulkin
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Alexander Scott
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Idomene J. Nicolas
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Robert W. Williams
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Ashis Halder
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Eric R. Briggs
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Ervin J. Broyard
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Johnathan P. Morrissey
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Bianca Ward
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Albert L. Smith
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Craig Stieber
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Enrique Miguel Johnson
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Trudence Morgan
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Pravakar Digar
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Terrell L. Pye
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Melvin A. Robinson
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Robert Richardson
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: John A. Jefferson
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Warren Roberts
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Gary McKenzie
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Rao Mukund
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Peola O. Desdunes
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Hugh J. Latulas
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Edmond Jose Joseph
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Travis A. Crawford
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Emmet Pembrook
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Anthony Marrero
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Dieubon St. Juste
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Deborah Bruce
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Alfred Wilson
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Jackson N. Shenica
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Warren Dupar
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Shawn M. Randolph
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Nathan H. Scott
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Carlton Young
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Donald Roberts
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Oles Chery
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Eldridge E. Payton
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Jean Pierre Louis
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Sujit Roy
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Darryl W. Prater
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Odell Causey
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Wendell B. Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Lawrence Garrett
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Leonard S. Kenner
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Eugene Collins
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Demetrius Wilby
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Johnny W Barrett
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Frederick Johnson
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Gail L. Moore
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Bruce Goodrich
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Adrine M. Briggs
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Anthony Bell
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Jahda Muhammad
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Edwina Gibson
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Annette M. Sorapuru
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Frederico P. Cardiche
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Gregory Carter
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Corey Howard
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Deborah Wooding
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Lazaro Miranda
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Valerie R. Moore
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Luxeen Fremont
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Michael LaGarde
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Dayshawn M. Matthews
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Jaquelin Ornelus
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Weeks Marine, Inc.
Represented By: Wilton Ellwood Bland, III
Represented By: Jacques P. DeGruy
Represented By: Clarence William Emory
Represented By: Patrick E. Costello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Wilmuin LePree
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Dominic H. Green
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Michael Vial
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Rudolph Price, III
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Melvin C. Ainey
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Eddie Simmons
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Raham Williams
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Edmond K. Bailey
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Vernon J. Pratt, Jr.
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Dralanjala Overshown
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Jerome Williams, Jr.
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Manel Charles
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Sherman J. Briggs, Sr.
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Jeffrey M. Kelly
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Gwendolyn F. Green
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Charles Chapman, Sr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Travis Alford
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Melvin Smith
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Ralph D. Taylor
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Fred Alfred
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Renaldo Smith
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Marshall Jackson, Jr.
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Shannon R. Briggs
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Wesley E. Boradbridge
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Byron D. Alexander
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Adrien Sterling
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Ronald Taylor
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Davie Hooker
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Josue Isbeck
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Marvin D. Mitchell
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Melvin Hollins
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Gayle Williams
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Jefferson Magee
Represented By: Val Patrick Exnicios
Represented By: Carlos Alberto Ramirez
Represented By: Amy Collins Fontenot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Justin L. Overton
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Lewis Rothell
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Michael Hammond
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Ronald C. Hill
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Milton Smith
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Odlia Camille
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Carmen Dorange
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Meria Fremont
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Wilbert Smith
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Manas Mandal
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Terry Thompson
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Gour Gopal Das
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Shelete Ramsey
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Sherman Calice
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: New Orleans City
Represented By: Eraka W. DeLarge
Represented By: Robert J. Ellis, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Harvey Jack
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Marie Sterling
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Steven M. Micoulin
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Dedrick Lebeau, T
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Sidney M. Givens
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Thomas L. Atkinson
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Alton C. Pitts
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: James R. Lee
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Anita Richard
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Anata Shas-Das
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Norman S. Brasly
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Steven Jude Dinet, Sr.
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Gland E. Alfred
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Dieumafaite Nicolas
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Connieyne Jackson
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Hillery Jackson
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Walter Leon Jenkins, Jr.
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Isaac Henderson
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Norwood Allen
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Cheryl S. Miller
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Prosanta Guha
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Edmond Joseph
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Henry Glover
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Doris Dequir
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Laurin Maritime AB
Represented By: David B. Lawton
Represented By: Hugh Ramsay Straub
Represented By: Michael M. Butterworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Anglo-Atlantic Steamship Limited
Represented By: David B. Lawton
Represented By: Hugh Ramsay Straub
Represented By: Michael M. Butterworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: American Commercial Lines LLC
Represented By: William P. Wynne
Represented By: Robert Taylor Lemon, II
Represented By: Richard D. Bertram
Represented By: Lance Michael Sannino
Represented By: Glenn Gill Goodier
Represented By: Jean-Paul Abadie Escudier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Whitefin Shipping Co. Limited
Represented By: David B. Lawton
Represented By: Hugh Ramsay Straub
Represented By: Michael M. Butterworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Laurin Maritime (America) Inc.
Represented By: David B. Lawton
Represented By: Hugh Ramsay Straub
Represented By: Michael M. Butterworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: John Bavaret
Represented By: Elizabeth M. Gaudin
Represented By: Hilary Gerard Gaudin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Joseph, III
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Csilla Fekete
Represented By: Darryl James Becnel
Represented By: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Represented By: Camilo Kossy Salas, III
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Klibert
Represented By: Matthew B. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?