New Orleans City v. BellSouth Telecommunications, Inc.

Plaintiff: New Orleans City
Defendant: BellSouth Telecommunications, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2009cv00151
Filed: January 20, 2009
Court: Louisiana Eastern District Court
Office: Contract: Franchise Office
County: Orleans
Referring Judge: Alma L. Chasez
Presiding Judge: Eldon E. Fallon
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 27, 2011 242 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS denying 231 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by BellSouth Telecommunications, LLC, & staying Case No. 11-2116 until resolution of the issues appealed & cross-appealed to the 5th Circuit in Case No. 09-151. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 10/26/2011.(Reference: 11-2116)(caa, )
June 7, 2011 198 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER & REASONS - IT IS ORDERED that BellSouth owes unjust enrichment damages to the City in the amount of $5,119,101.73, based upon the amounts that would have been due had the City adopted the LMA Agreement, with a credit to BellSouth for the amount of discount in services it has provided to the City since the cessation of the 2001 Settlement Agreement forward. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that documentation and calculation of this discount are to be filed by BellSouth within 10 days of this Ord er & Reasons. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that similar payments should be paid for subsequent years, unless the rights and obligations of the parties change so as to no longer require such payments. There being no further claims to resolve, IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 6/6/11. (dno, )
November 15, 2010 192 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/12/10.(ala, )
July 26, 2010 143 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 47 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Claims in the Original Complaint; denying 48 Motion to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiff's Expert Dr. Bryce Ward; granting 49 Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff City of New Orleans' First Amended Complaint; granting in part and denying in part 50 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 7/24/10. (ala, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: New Orleans City v. BellSouth Telecommunications, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New Orleans City
Represented By: DeWayne Larry Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BellSouth Telecommunications, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?