Loyola University New Orleans v. Mapp Construction, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Loyola University, New Orleans
Defendant: Mapp Construction, Inc., Travelers Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Einhorn Yaffee Prescott, Architecture & Engineering, P.C., Eskew A Professional Corporation, Security Insurance Company of Hartford, Zurich American Insurance Company, St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company, King & Co Inc, DeGeorge Glass Company, Inc., Ellis Company Inc, Western Waterproofing Company, Inc., Mechanical Construction Company LLC, Verges Consultants, Inc., Coastal Air Balance, Inc., McKissack & McKissack of Washington, D.C., Inc., CNA Insurance Company and Fidelity Excess and Surplus Insurance Company
3Rd Party Defendant: James River Insurance Company, Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, Transportation Insurance Company, Rabalais Masonry, Inc., Burch, Marcus, Poole, Crupp, Daniel & Babineaux, Inc., Transcontinental Insurance Company, Rush Masonry, Inc., Hanover Insurance Company, Liberty Insurance Company, D. H. Griffin Construction Co., LLC, Southern Steel Erectors, Fairley Brothers Construction, Pittsburgh Millwright Corporation, Colony Insurance Company, Bituminous Insurance Company, Union America Insurance Company, American Equity Insurance Company, American Casualty of Reading PA, Bituminous Casualty Corporation, Fireman's Fund Insurance Company, American International Specialty Lines Insurance Company, Reliance National Indemnity, Gray Insurance Company, Federal Insurance Company, Tig Insurance Company, Fireman's Fund, Alea London Ltd, Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company, Evanston Insurance Co, National Union Insurance Company, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Travelers Insurance Company and Travelers Indemnity Company of Illinois
3Rd Party Plaintiff: St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2010cv00934
Filed: March 19, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
Presiding Judge: Martin LC Feldman
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER AND REASONS granting #7 Motion to Remand. FURTHER ORDER denying request for costs and attorney's fees. FURTHER ORDER denying #13 Motion to Continue hearing. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 5/6/2010. (Attachments: #1 Remand Letter) (caa, )
April 29, 2010 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Mapp Construction, Inc. and St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company re #7 MOTION to Remand. (caa, )
April 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 4/29/2010. (caa, )
April 29, 2010 Filing 16 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum by Mapp Construction, Inc., St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading)(Loehn, Thomas)
April 28, 2010 Filing 15 **DEFICIENT** RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Support filed by Mapp Construction, Inc., St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company re #7 MOTION to Remand. (Loehn, Thomas) Modified on 4/29/2010 (caa, ).
April 27, 2010 Filing 14 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Indian Harbor Insurance Company re #7 MOTION to Remand. (Scheib, Julie)
April 26, 2010 Filing 13 MOTION to Continue Hearing Date by Indian Harbor Insurance Company. Motion Hearing set for 5/26/2010 10:00 AM before Judge Martin L.C. Feldman. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Notice of Hearing)(Scheib, Julie)
April 26, 2010 Filing 12 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #11 Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion. Name of attorney who electronically filed this document does not match name of signatory attorney on pleading. The user log-in and password serve as the required signature for purposes of Rule 11 of the FRCP. No further action is necessary at this time.(caa, )
April 23, 2010 Filing 11 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Mapp Construction, Inc., St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company re #10 MOTION to Continue Hearing Date on Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand. (Chauvin, Charles)
April 22, 2010 Filing 10 DEFICIENT: MOTION to Continue Hearing Date on Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand by Indian Harbor Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Scheib, Julie) Modified on 4/23/2010 (rll, ).
April 21, 2010 Filing 9 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #8 Answer to Complaint. Document should have been linked to another document by checking the box appropriate screen. Clerk took corrective action by linking document to document #1 .(caa, )
April 20, 2010 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, (Seventh Amended Third Party Demand) by Indian Harbor Insurance Company.(Scheib, Julie) Modified on 4/21/2010 (caa, ).
April 13, 2010 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand by Mapp Construction, Inc., St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company. Motion Hearing set for 5/5/2010 10:00 AM before Judge Martin L.C. Feldman. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Notice of Hearing)(Chauvin, Charles) Modified text on 4/14/2010 (gec, ).
March 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, as to Indian Harbor Insurance Company answer due 4/20/2010. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 3/30/2010. (caa, )
March 30, 2010 Filing 5 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer. Document contains incorrect Magistrate Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Magistrate Judge 4.(caa, )
March 29, 2010 Filing 4 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by Indian Harbor Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Scheib, Julie) Modified on 3/30/2010 (caa, ).
March 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr no longer assigned to case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 3/23/2010.(caa, )
March 19, 2010 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Martin L.C. Feldman and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (mmf, )
March 19, 2010 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from Civil District Court, Orleans Parish, case number 04-1314 "L" (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 053L-2361564) filed by Indian Harbor Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Counsel List, #2 Certificate of Verification, #3 Certificate of Removing Defendant/List of State Court Record, #4 Motion to File 7th Amended 3rd Party Demand, #5 Correspondence from Secretary of State, #6 7th Amended 3rd Party Demand, #7 Plaintiff's Petition, #8 Plaintiffs 1st Supplemental Petition, #9 2nd Supplemental Petition, #10 3rd Supplemental Petition, #11 Mapp's Answer and Cross Claim, #12 Mapp's Amended Answer and Cross Claim, #13 Mapp's Answer to 1st Supplemental Petition, #14 Mapp's 2nd Amended 3rd Party Demand, #15 Mapp's 3rd Amended 3rd Party Demand, #16 Mapp's 4th Amended 3rd Party Demand, #17 Mapp's 5th Amended 3rd Party Demand, #18 Mapp's 6th Amended 3rd Party Demand, #19 Indian Harbor's Motion for Extension, #20 Order Granting Motion for Extension, #21 Indian Harbor's Request for Notice, #22 Notice of Removal, #23 Civil Cover Sheet)(Scheib, Julie) Modified on 3/22/2010 (caa, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Loyola University New Orleans v. Mapp Construction, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: James River Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Transportation Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Rabalais Masonry, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Burch, Marcus, Poole, Crupp, Daniel & Babineaux, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Transcontinental Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Rush Masonry, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Hanover Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Liberty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: D. H. Griffin Construction Co., LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Southern Steel Erectors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Fairley Brothers Construction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Pittsburgh Millwright Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Colony Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Bituminous Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Union America Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: American Equity Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: American Casualty of Reading PA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Bituminous Casualty Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Fireman's Fund Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: American International Specialty Lines Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Reliance National Indemnity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Gray Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Tig Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Fireman's Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Alea London Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Evanston Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: National Union Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Indian Harbor Insurance Company
Represented By: Julie Anne Scheib
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Travelers Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Travelers Indemnity Company of Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loyola University, New Orleans
Represented By: J. Ashley Inabnet
Represented By: Russ M. Herman
Represented By: Brian David Katz
Represented By: Morton Howard Katz
Represented By: Richard J. Garvey, Jr.
Represented By: Stephen J. Herman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mapp Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Edward Loehn
Represented By: Charles K. Chauvin
Represented By: Robert Franklin Lakey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Einhorn Yaffee Prescott, Architecture & Engineering, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eskew A Professional Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Security Insurance Company of Hartford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King & Co Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DeGeorge Glass Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellis Company Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Waterproofing Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mechanical Construction Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verges Consultants, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coastal Air Balance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKissack & McKissack of Washington, D.C., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNA Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity Excess and Surplus Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher H. Hebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?