Lang et al v. Directv, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Dwayne Humphrey, Larry Tucker, Gary Smith and Christian Lang
Defendant: Directv, Inc., JP&D Digital Satellite Systems, Inc. and Modern Day Satellite
Case Number: 2:2010cv01085
Filed: April 9, 2010
Court: Louisiana Eastern District Court
Office: New Orleans Office
County: St Tammany
Presiding Judge: Sarah S. Vance
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:0216(b) Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 9, 2012 305 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER & REASONS: for the reasons stated, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plas' 288 Motion To Enforce Court's Prior Orders is DENIED and that DirecTV will not be required to provide information as to all missing data fields from DirecTV's initial production of information regarding potential class members; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that DirecTV must work with its HSPs to ensure the accuracy of data and that DirecTV must certify to this Court, within thirty (30) days of this order, what Di recTV has done to comply with this and the Court's May 31, 2012 orders; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plas must certify to this Court, within thirty (30) days of this order, what Plas have done to meet their obligations under the Court's May 3 1,2012 order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that DirecTV must inform this Court, within thirty (30) days of this order, what responses were received from DirecTV contractors as a result of the letter sent to contractors by DirecTVs Associate General Counsel. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 8/9/2012. (rll, ) Modified on 8/9/2012 to edit doc type (rll, ).
May 22, 2012 276 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS granting 268 Motion to Dismiss Louisiana Wage Payment Act Claims Without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 5/22/2012. (cms, )
March 6, 2012 262 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS that Plaintiff Drosos Galouzis Motion to Withdraw Without Prejudice is GRANTED and that Plaintiff Galouzis is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, with the condition that should Plaintiff Galouzis elect to refile these claims, he must provide to Defendants all previously ordered discovery material within ten (10) days of filing any subsequent complaint. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 3/6/2012.(cms, )
December 30, 2011 245 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS granting 126 Motion for Conditional Class Certification pursuant to Section 216(b) of the the Fair Labor Standards Act. Parties shall meet and discuss the proposed notice and consent to sue forms within ten days of the date this order is signed. Parties shall submit the proposed notice and consent to sue forms, with any objections, to the Court within fifteen days of the date this order is signed. Further ORDER denying 207 Motion to Strike Declarations. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 12/30/11. (jtd)
December 29, 2011 244 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 225 , 222 . Motion to Dismiss the Claims of Galouzis and Francis with Prejudice is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. IT IS ORDERED that the claims of Andrew Francis are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 12/29/2011.(cms, )
July 12, 2011 147 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER & REASONS denying dfts DirecTv, Inc. and JP&D Digital Satellite Systems, Inc.'s 101 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance on 7/12/2011. (rll, )
July 5, 2011 146 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 144 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan. (ecm, )
February 3, 2011 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 68 Motion to Compel Discovery; denying 71 Motion for Sanctions and Enforcement of Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan. (ecm, )
August 13, 2010 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying plas' 17 Motion to Remand to State Court; granting plas' 38 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint; granting in part and denying in part dfts' 19 Motion to Dismiss certain claims and denying dfts' 20 Motion to Strike class action claims. Signed by Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance on 8/13/10. (bbc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lang et al v. Directv, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwayne Humphrey
Represented By: Jesse B. Hearin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Tucker
Represented By: Jesse B. Hearin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Smith
Represented By: Jesse B. Hearin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Lang
Represented By: Jesse B. Hearin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Directv, Inc.
Represented By: Katie L. Dysart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP&D Digital Satellite Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Katie L. Dysart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Modern Day Satellite
Represented By: Katie L. Dysart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?