Southern United States Trade Association v. John Doe 1 et al
Plaintiff: Southern United States Trade Association
Defendant: John Doe 1, John Doe 2, John Doe 3, John Doe 4, John Doe 5, John Doe 6, John Doe 7, John Doe 8, John Doe 9, John Doe 10, John Doe 11 and John Doe 12
Case Number: 2:2010cv01669
Filed: June 7, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Orleans
Presiding Judge: Eldon E. Fallon
Nature of Suit: Assault, Libel, and Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER & REASONS that Defendants shall be liable to SUSTA in solido for the sum of $158,942 in damages for costs directly incurred as a result of the Statements. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall be liable in solido to each Plaintiff for the sum of $50,000 in damages for harm to Plaintiffs' reputation and for emotional distress. 212 IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants are hereby ENJOINED from republishing, in any way, any of the Statements, including by repostin g the Statements to other Internet websites. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Guddh's Motion for Reconsideration 240 is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Guddh's Motion for Relief Pursuant to Rule 60(b) is DENIED. 243 I T IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Guddh's Motions for Leave to File Replies and Sur-Replies 246 , 251 , 252 , 256 , 266 are DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Guddh's Objection to the Report and Recommendations is DENIED . 253 IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Guddh's Motion for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 11 is DENIED. 260 IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Guddh's Motion for Leave to File Motion to Stay Sanctions 264 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 9/30/13. (dno, )
July 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER & REASONS that Guddh's Motion seeking leave to file a reply 259 be and is hereby GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion seeking fees 220 be and is hereby GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Guddh and Mata shall immediately pay Plaintiffs reasonable attorney fees in the amount of $8,502.50, for which defendants Guddh and Mata shall be jointly and severally liable. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Guddh's Motion seeking leave to file a reply 258 be a nd is hereby GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Guddh's Motion seeking review of Magistrate Judge Roby's Order 247 be and is hereby DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants must seek leave of Court before filing any Motion in this matter. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Guddh's Motion seeking sanctions under Rule 11 shall be submitted for decision by the Court on September 19, 2013. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 7/26/13.(dno, )
April 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDERED that 203 Motion for Attorney Fees is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs are awarded reasonable attorneys fees in the amount of $3,939.25 against Defendant, Sumit Guddh. Guddh shall satisfy his obligation to Plaintiffs no later than fourteen (14) days from this issuance of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (clm, )
November 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDERED that defendant Summit Guddh's Motion for Leave to File Motion to AllowElectronic Filing by a Party Appearing without an Attorney and Supporting Information 181 be and is hereby GRANTED and that said Motion be entered into the record in this matter. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Guddh's Motion for Expedited Hearing 182 on the above Motion be and is hereby GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Guddh's Motion for Reconsideration of Magistrate Judge's Ruling and Motion to Assign New Magistrate Judge 183 be and is hereby DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Guddh's Motion for Expedited Hearing 184 on the above Motion be and is hereby GRANTED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/14/12. (dno, )
November 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDERED that 164 Motion to Compel Depositions is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as stated herein. FURTHER ORDERED that 173 Motion to Compel Deposition and for Discovery Sanctions is GRANTED. Guddh shall appear IN PERSON on Thursday, 11/15/2012, at 2:00 p.m. in the undersigned U.S. Magistrate Judges Courtroom to be deposed.Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (clm, )
October 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER denying 155 Motion for Leave to File Second Motion to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum and 156 Motion for Leave to File Third Motion to QuashSubpoenas Duces Tecum. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (clm, )
May 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER denying 103 Motion for Reconsideration of Court's Orders #91 and #92. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 5/25/2012. (rll, )
February 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER & REASONS denying 77 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 2/22/12. (ala, )
January 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDERED that 80 Motion to Compel; Motion for Sanctions is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as stated within document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 1/30/2012. (clm, )
January 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDERED that 65 Motion to Compel and to Impose Discovery Sanctions is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as set forth in document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 1/11/2012. (clm, )
July 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER & Reasons denying 56 Motion for Leave to Appeal. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 7/14/11. (ala, )
June 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER denying 31 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying 34 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 6/15/11. (ala, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Southern United States Trade Association v. John Doe 1 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southern United States Trade Association
Represented By: Stephen H. Kupperman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 6
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 7
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 8
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 9
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 11
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 12
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?