Servicios Azucareros de Venezuela, C.A. et al v. John Deere Thibodeaux, Inc.

Plaintiff: Servicios Azucareros de Venezuela, C.A.
Defendant: John Deere Thibodeaux
Case Number: 2:2010cv04443
Filed: December 1, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Orleans
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER & REASONS granting 73 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 4/11/2013. (caa, )
March 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER & REASONS denying 65 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 3/27/2013. (caa, )
February 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER & REASONS granting in part and denying in part 50 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 2/6/2013. (caa, )
September 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER AND REASONS denying 35 Motion to Reopen Case. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 9/1/2011. (tsf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Servicios Azucareros de Venezuela, C.A. et al v. John Deere Thibodeaux, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Servicios Azucareros de Venezuela, C.A.
Represented By: Jonathan Marks Shushan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Deere Thibodeaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?