Griffith v. Louisiana State et al

Plaintiff: Tammy Griffith
Defendant: Candice Bates Anderson, Pernell Denet, David Bell, Unidentified Parties, Tracy Flemings-Davillier, Louisiana State, New Orleans City, Orleans Parish Juvenile Court, Ernestine Gray, Lawrence Lagarde, Jr., Mark Doherty and Tammy Stewart
Case Number: 2:2011cv00245
Filed: February 7, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Orleans
Presiding Judge: Helen G. Berrigan
Presiding Judge: Sally Shushan
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 584 ORDER granting 560 Motion to Quash; denying 561 Motion to Expedite; granting 572 Motion to Quash; denying 573 Motion to Expedite. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 10/28/14. (Reference: 11-245, 11-535)(jrc)
October 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 545 ORDER denying 536 Motion ; granting 539 Motion for Leave to File; granting 540 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 10/14/14. (Reference: 11-245, 11-535)(jrc)
October 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 544 ORDER denying 464 Motion to Dismiss Case; granting in part and denying in part 467 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 10/14/14. (Reference: 11-245, 11-535)(jrc)
September 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 496 ORDER denying 460 Motion in Limine; denying 461 Motion in Limine; denying 488 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 9/12/14. (Reference: 11-245, 11-535)(jrc)
May 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 426 ORDER denying 413 MOTION for APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey. (Reference: 11-245, 11-535)(jrc)
February 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 412 ORDERED that plaintiffs' 399 Motion to Compel is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan. (Reference: ALL CASES)(gec, )
October 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 384 ORDER granting 358 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 359 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 360 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying 361 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 10/9/13. (Reference: 11-245, 11-535)(jrc, )
June 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 353 ORDER granting 306 Motion to Amend Complaint; granting in part and denying in part 307 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying 308 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 6/4/13. (Reference: 11-245, 11-535)(jrc, )
January 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER granting 269 Motion for Reconsideration of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiffs' complaints are dismissed with prejudice as to the City of New Orleans. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey. (Reference: 11-245, 11,535)(jrc, )
August 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER & REASONS granting in part and denying in part 97 Motion to Dismiss Party; granting in part and denying in part 98 Motion to Dismiss Party; granting in part and denying in part 99 Motion to Dismiss Party; granting in part and denying in part 101 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 105 Motion to Dismiss. FURTHER ORDERED that Griffith is not permitted any further amendments to her complaint.. Signed by Judge Helen G. Berrigan on 8/10/11. (mm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griffith v. Louisiana State et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Candice Bates Anderson
Represented By: Maria Nan Alessandra
Represented By: Kim M. Boyle
Represented By: William Peter Connick
Represented By: Brian J. Eiselen
Represented By: Michael F. Nolan
Represented By: MaryJo L. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pernell Denet
Represented By: Victor L Papai, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Bell
Represented By: Glenn B. Adams
Represented By: Ralph R. Alexis, III
Represented By: Michael J. Madere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unidentified Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Flemings-Davillier
Represented By: Maria Nan Alessandra
Represented By: Kim M. Boyle
Represented By: William Peter Connick
Represented By: Brian J. Eiselen
Represented By: Michael F. Nolan
Represented By: MaryJo L. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana State
Represented By: Michael F. Nolan
Represented By: William Peter Connick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Orleans City
Represented By: Victor L Papai, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orleans Parish Juvenile Court
Represented By: Michael F. Nolan
Represented By: Brian J. Eiselen
Represented By: William Peter Connick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernestine Gray
Represented By: MaryJo L. Roberts
Represented By: Terrel J. Broussard
Represented By: Kim M. Boyle
Represented By: Maria Nan Alessandra
Represented By: Jeremy David Rush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Lagarde, Jr.
Represented By: Maria Nan Alessandra
Represented By: Kim M. Boyle
Represented By: William Peter Connick
Represented By: Brian J. Eiselen
Represented By: Michael F. Nolan
Represented By: MaryJo L. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Doherty
Represented By: William Peter Connick
Represented By: Brian J. Eiselen
Represented By: Galen M. Hair
Represented By: Michael F. Nolan
Represented By: Richard C. Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammy Stewart
Represented By: Maria Nan Alessandra
Represented By: Kim M. Boyle
Represented By: William Peter Connick
Represented By: Brian J. Eiselen
Represented By: Michael F. Nolan
Represented By: MaryJo L. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Griffith
Represented By: Nghana Lewis Gauff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?