United States of America v. Bright
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Ray A. Bright
Case Number: 2:2011cv01518
Filed: June 27, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Orleans
Presiding Judge: Martin L.C. Feldman
Presiding Judge: Daniel E. Knowles
Nature of Suit: Recovery of Defaulted Student Loans (Excl. Veterans)
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER AND REASONS GRANTING 61 Motion for Relief from Judgment as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 2/8/2017. (mmv)
February 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER AND REASONS denying 30 Motion for New Trial. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 2/22/2012. (tsf, )
December 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER AND REASONS granting 12 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 12/21/2011. (caa, )
October 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER AND REASONS denying 7 Motion to Dismiss Case for failure to join indispensable parties. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 10/4/2011. (caa, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Bright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Peter M. Mansfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray A. Bright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?