Waste Management of Louisiana, L.L.C. v. River Birch, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Waste Management of Louisiana, L.L.C.
Defendant: River Birch, Inc., Albert J Ward, Jr, Frederick R. Heebe and Highway 90, LLC
Case Number: 2:2011cv02405
Filed: September 23, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Orleans
Presiding Judge: Ivan L.R. Lemelle
Presiding Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 529 ORDER & REASONS: It is ORDERED that Waste Management's Motion for Review (Rec. Doc. 480 ) is GRANTED, and the Magistrate Judge's Order of August 2, 2017 (Rec. Doc. 328 ) is REVERSED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Waste Management may depo se Peter Butler, Sr., and seek document production from him as to Topics 1, 2, 3, and 5 listed in Waste Managements original subpoena. (See Rec. Doc. 480-3 at 10). The deposition shall be concluded by no later than June 30, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier. (gec)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 523 ORDER AND REASONS granting in part and denying in part 469 Motion for Summary Judgment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Waste Management's claim for damages allegedly incurred on or after December 3, 2006 is DISMISSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that River Birch's Motion is otherwise DENIED. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 5/19/20. (cg)
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 435 ORDER and REASONS finding as moot 347 MOTION for Review of Magistrate Judge's Order Regarding Defendants' Motion to Quash, as stated within document. Signed by Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt on 11/29/2017. (cc: Chief Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby) (cbs)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 411 ORDER and REASONS denying 315 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and granting in part and denying in part 341 Motion to Strike Exhibits, as stated within document. Signed by Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt on 11/20/2017. (cc: Chief Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby) (cbs)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 406 ORDER and REASONS denying 262 Motion to Strike Untimely Expert Report of Ronald L. Gagnet to the extent that Defendants seek to have the entirety of the information set forth in the supplemental report excluded. Defendants may cross examine Mr. Gagnet at trial regarding the information set forth in the supplemental report and the revision of his original calculations, as stated within document. Signed by Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt on 11/16/2017. (cbs)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 397 ORDER and REASONS - Given the Court's recent summary judgment ruling in Defendants' favor relative to the "causation" element of Plaintiff's Chef Menteur RICO claims (Rec. Doc. 372), the Court finds it unnecessary to address Defendants' additional motion (Rec. Doc. 317) directed to the same claims i.e., Defendants' motion for partial summary judgment contesting former Mayor Nagin's authority to suspend zoning laws. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that the latter motion for partial summary judgment 317 is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt on 11/15/2017. (cc: Chief Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby) (cbs)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 394 ORDER and REASONS denying 382 Motion to Designate Judgments as Final Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b) and to Stay Proceedings Pending Appeal. Signed by Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt on 11/13/2017. (cc: Chief Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby) (cbs)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 328 ORDER: ORDERED that 283 Motion to Quash Subpoena to Attorney Peter J. Butler, Sr., or Alternatively for a Protective Order is GRANTED as to Topic No.2. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (cml)
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 309 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the 283 Motion to Quash Subpoena to Attorney Peter J. Bulter, Sr., or Alternatively for a Protective Order is DENIED IN PART AND TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION IN PART as stated herein. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Plaintiff ma y submit a further memorandum in opposition no later than Friday July 21, 2017. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Defendant may submit a further memorandum in support no later than Monday January 24, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 7/19/2017. (tm)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 281 ORDER: ORDERED that 267 Motion for Protective Order Order Concerning Certain Proposed Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition Topics is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. FURTHER ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED as to Topics 6 and 7.FURTHER ORDERED that the Defendants may amend its proposed Rule 30(b)(6) deposition topics for the limited purpose of including a topic related to the alleged bribery in relation to Ray Nagin or Orleans Parish.FURTHER ORDERED that the motion is DENIED AS MOOT as to Topic 27. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (cml)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER AND REASONS: ORDERED that 236 Motion for Protective Order Regarding Discovery Requests is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that the Defendants do not need to respond to Requests for Production Nos. 15-18. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (cml)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER AND REASONS: ORDERED that 240 Motion for Leave to Extend the Deposition of Henry Mouton is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED to the extent that the Plaintiff may depose Mouton for seven (7) hours and the Defendants may depose Mouton for two (2) hours. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (cml)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER AND REASONS: ORDERED that 219 Motion for Leave to Conduct Additional Depositions is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. FURTHER ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED to the extent that each party may conduct fifteen (15) depositions. FURTHER ORDERED that the motion is DENIED as to the depositions of Rick Buller, Gwen Bolotte, Margaret Mary Winter, and Anne Vandenweghe at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (cml)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER and REASONS: ORDERED that 221 Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is instructed to issue a Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum to the Warden of Federal Correctional Institution Texarkana to produce the body of C. RAY NAGIN before this Court on the 11th day of May, 2017 at 10:00 for Oral Deposition in the above entitled case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 4/13/2017. (cml)
March 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER AND REASONS denying 145 Motion to Dismiss; denying 146 Motion to Strike and to Dismiss Counts I and II. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants are to answer Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint no later than twenty (20) days from the entry date of this Order and Reason. A scheduling conference with counsel shall promptly thereafter be held by the Section "N" case manager. Signed by Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt on 3/22/2016. (kac)
March 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER and REASONS denying 109 Defendant Frederick R. Heebe's Motion to Disqualify Counsel. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, however, that on or before Monday, April 13, 2015, Plaintiff, through counsel, shall submit the following additional information as stated within document, for the Court's consideration. Signed by Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt on 3/27/2015. (cbs)
March 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER re: 71 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim: Defendant's motion to dismiss is GRANTED WITH PREJUDICE as to Plaintiff's claims regarding C&D landfills, but GRANTED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to Plaintiff's claims regardin g MSW landfills. FURTHER ORDERED: If Plaintiff desires to proceed further with its antitrust claims regarding MSW landfills, it must seek leave, no later than thirty (30) days from the entry of this Order and Reasons, to file a second amended and su perseding complaint remedying the pleading deficiencies identified herein relative to those claims. If Plaintiff cannot, or does not, cure these deficiencies by timely amendment, the Court shall, upon appropriate motion by Defendants, order its dismi ssal of these claims to be with prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED: Any additional memoranda directed to the applicability of the Noerr-Pennington doctrine to Plaintiff's antitrust claims regarding MSW landfills are to comply with the Court's instructions as stated herein. Signed by Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt on 3/31/2014. (mmm)
September 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER denying 75 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (clm, )
March 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER AND REASONS: ORDERED that 49 Motion for Partial Reconsideration of the Stay Order is DENIED. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 3/14/2012. (clm, )
February 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER AND REASONS granting 24 25 26 Motions to Stay. FURTHER ORDERED that the parties are required to regularly update the Court regarding the status of the criminal investigation as stated herein. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE the above captioned civil case for administrative and statistical purposes, pending further order of this Court. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 2/15/2012. (cms, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Waste Management of Louisiana, L.L.C. v. River Birch, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Waste Management of Louisiana, L.L.C.
Represented By: Benjamin Melvin Castoriano
Represented By: Miles Paul Clements
Represented By: Heather A. McArthur
Represented By: Patrick A. Talley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: River Birch, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert J Ward, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick R. Heebe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Highway 90, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?