G & C Construction, LLC v. Kiewit Louisiana Co.
Plaintiff: G & C Construction, LLC
3Rd Party Defendant: H&H Trucking, LLC, Puckett Machinery Company, Purchasing Incentives, LLC, Cycle Construction Company, LLC, B&S Equipment Co., Inc., Gulf Coast Material Management, Inc., Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America, Louisiana Delta Marine L.L.C., CJ's Dump Trucks, Inc. and Specialty Marine Services, Inc.
3Rd Party Plaintiff: U.S. Specialty Insurance Company and Kiewit Louisiana Co.
Consolidated Plaintiff: Gulf Coast Bulk Handling, LLC
Consolidated 3Rd Party Defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Consolidated Defendant: G&C Construction, LLC
Case Number: 2:2011cv02566
Filed: October 12, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Stanwood R Duval
Referring Judge: Daniel E Knowles
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDERED that the #230 Motion to Certify Judgment Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54(b) is GRANTED; FURTHER ORDERED that this Courts Judgment #227 is hereby certified as a final judgment pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure Rule 54(b), there being no just reason for delay.Signed by Judge Stanwood R. Duval, Jr on 2/19/2014. (Reference: 11-2566)(my, )
January 31, 2014 Filing 231 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #230 OBJECTION TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #227 Judgment, MOTION to Appoint/Substitute Custodian MOTION to Compel MOTION to Amend/Correct Certify MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) . **Not necessary to select relief OBJECTION TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #227 Judgment, MOTION to Appoint/Substitute Custodian MOTION to Compel MOTION to Amend/Correct Certify for this document. Only the relief MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) is necessary. Clerk modified docket text. No further action is necessary.** (Reference: 11-2566)(my, )
January 30, 2014 Filing 230 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) by U.S. Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Reference: 11-2566)(Wynne, Douglass) Modified on 1/31/2014 (my, ).
October 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER granting #228 Motion to Dismiss Claims by Kiewit Louisiana Co., against U.S. Specialty Insurance Co. With Prejudice. ORDERED that claims by U.S. Specialty Insurance Co. against Kiewit Louisiana Co., Cycle Construction Co., LLC, and Travelers Casualty and Surety Co. of America be dismissed. ORDERED that Cycle Construction Co. is dismissed from Interpleader Action, record doc #34 ; FURTHER ORDERED that each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Stanwood R. Duval, Jr on 10/4/2013. (Reference: 11-2566)(swd, )
October 3, 2013 Filing 228 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Claims With Prejudice by Cycle Construction Company, LLC, Kiewit Louisiana Co., Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America, U.S. Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 11-2566)Attorney Douglass F. Wynne, Jr added to party Cycle Construction Company, LLC(pty:3pd), Attorney Douglass F. Wynne, Jr added to party Kiewit Louisiana Co.(pty:cd), Attorney Douglass F. Wynne, Jr added to party Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America(pty:con3df).(Wynne, Douglass) Modified on 10/4/2013 (my, ).
August 21, 2013 Filing 227 JUDGMENT entered in favor of Kiewit Louisiana Co. against G & C Construction, LLC dismissing all claims asserted by G & C Construction, LLC with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs. Signed by Judge Stanwood R. Duval, Jr on 8/21/2013.(Reference: 11-2566)(my, )
August 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER granting #225 Motion for Leave to File Proposed Judgment. Signed by Judge Stanwood R. Duval, Jr on 8/21/2013. (Reference: 11-2566)(my, )
August 20, 2013 Filing 225 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Proposed Judgment by U.S. Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading Judgment)(Reference: 12-2566)(Wynne, Douglass)
August 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER AND OPINION granting #182 Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice the Claims of G & C Construction, LLC Against Kiewit Louisiana Co. U.S. Specialty is ordered to file a proposed Judgment not later than 8/20/2013.Signed by Judge Stanwood R. Duval, Jr on 8/12/2013. (Reference: 11-2566)(my, )
March 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER granting #222 Motion to Reopen Case. FURTHER ORDERED that the #182 Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice the Claims of G&C Construction, LLC against Kiewit Louisiana Co. filed on behalf of U.S. Specialty Insurance Company be adjudicated and be considered submitted for adjudication as of 4/3/2013. Signed by Judge Stanwood R. Duval, Jr on 3/28/2013. (Reference: 11-2566)(my, )
March 5, 2013 Filing 222 MOTION to Reopen Case by U.S. Specialty Insurance Company. Motion set for 4/3/2013 09:30 AM before Judge Stanwood R. Duval Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Memorandum in Support, #4 Notice of Submission, #5 Proposed Order)(Reference: 11-CV-02566)(Kern, Jay)
March 1, 2013 Filing 221 **DEFICIENT** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Reopen Case and to Adjudicate U.S. Specialty's Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice the Claims of G&C Construction, LLC against Kiewit Louisiana Co. by U.S. Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Memorandum in Support, #4 Proposed Order)(Reference: 12-0893)(Kern, Jay) Modified on 3/4/2013 (caa, ).
February 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER granting #219 Joint Motion to Dismiss with prejudice Purchasing Incentives claims against U.S. Specialty Insurance Company. FURTHER ORDERED that each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Stanwood R. Duval, Jr on 2/21/2013. (Reference: 11-2566)(swd)
February 19, 2013 Filing 219 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Purchasing Incentives, LLC's Claims against U.S. Specialty Insurance Company by U.S. Specialty Insurance Company, Purchasing Incentives, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 11-2566)(Wynne, Douglass) Modified text on 2/20/2013 (my, ).
December 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER STAYING CASE. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall administratively close this matter until such time as either party moves to reopen the case. Signed by Judge Stanwood R. Duval, Jr on 12/12/2012.(Reference: ALL CASES)(gec, )
December 11, 2012 Filing 217 NOTICE OF FILING BANKRUPTCY by G & C Construction, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Reference: 11-2566)(Harrison, Paul) Modified on 12/12/2012 (my, ).
December 11, 2012 Filing 215 REPLY Memorandum of U.S. Specialty to the opposition of G&C Construction, LLC to Motion filed by U.S. Specialty Insurance Company re #182 MOTION to Dismiss Claims of G&C Construction, LLC against Kieweit Louisiana Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Reference: 11-2566)(swd)
December 10, 2012 Filing 216 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stanwood R. Duval, Jr: Telephone Status Conference held on 12/10/2012 in re: #203 . The Court will defer ruling on the motion to continue until it receives the updated status report.(Reference: 11-2566)(swd)
December 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER granting #213 Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum of U.S. Specialty to opposition to #182 MOTION to Dismiss Party Claims of G&C Construction, LLC against Kiewit Louisiana Co. Signed by Judge Stanwood R. Duval, Jr on 12/10/2012. (Reference: 11-2566)(swd)
December 10, 2012 Filing 213 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum by U.S. Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(Reference: 11-2566)(Wynne, Douglass) Modified on 12/10/2012 (my, ).
December 10, 2012 Filing 212 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by U.S. Specialty Insurance Company re #203 MOTION to Continue Hearing on Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice the Claims of G&C Construction agasint Kiewit. (Reference: 11-2566)(Wynne, Douglass)
December 7, 2012 Filing 211 TRIAL BRIEF in Opposition to #200 Louisiana Delta Marine, LLC's Trial Memorandum by G & C Construction, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Reference: 11-02566)(Harrison, Paul) Modified on 12/10/2012 (my, ).
December 7, 2012 Filing 210 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #207 MOTION to Expedite , #206 MOTION to Continue . **Documents are duplicates. For correct entries see rec docs203 and 204. No further action necessary.** (Reference: 11-2566)(my, )
December 7, 2012 Filing 209 Memorandum in Opposition by G & C Construction, LLC re #199 Memorandum, of B&S Equipment Co., Inc. re #180 Minute Entry (Reference: 11-02566)(Harrison, Paul) Modified on 12/7/2012 (my, ).
December 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER re #203 MOTION to Continue #182 filed by G & C Construction, LLC. Telephone Status Conference set for 12/10/2012 03:00 PM before Judge Stanwood R. Duval Jr.. Signed by Judge Stanwood R. Duval, Jr on 12/7/2012.(Reference: 11-2566)(swd)
December 7, 2012 Filing 207 **DUPLICATE OF REC DOC 204**EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite by G & C Construction, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Reference: 11-02566)(Harrison, Paul) Modified on 12/7/2012 (my, ).
December 7, 2012 Filing 206 **DUPLICATE OF REC DOC 203**MOTION to Continue by G & C Construction, LLC. Motion set for 12/26/2012 09:30 AM before Judge Stanwood R. Duval Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Notice of Submission)(Reference: 11-02566)(Harrison, Paul) Modified on 12/7/2012 (my, ).
December 7, 2012 Filing 205 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #203 MOTION to Continue . **Document no longer deemed deficient.** (Reference: 11-2566)(my, )
December 6, 2012 Filing 204 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Motion to Continue Hearing by G & C Construction, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 11-02566)(Harrison, Paul)
December 6, 2012 Filing 203 MOTION to Continue by G & C Construction, LLC. Motion set for 12/26/2012 09:30 AM before Judge Stanwood R. Duval Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Notice of Submission)(Reference: 11-02566)(Harrison, Paul) Modified on 12/7/2012 (my, ).
December 4, 2012 Filing 202 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by G & C Construction, LLC re #182 Proposed MOTION to Dismiss Claims of G&C Construction, LLC . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts)(Reference: 11-02566)(Harrison, Paul) Modified on 12/4/2012 (my, ).
December 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER denying as moot #147 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Judge Stanwood R. Duval, Jr on 12/4/2012. (Reference: 11-2566)(swd)
December 3, 2012 Filing 200 Trial Memorandum (Louisiana Delta Marine LLC's Trial Memorandum) re #180 Minute Entry by Louisiana Delta Marine L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (USSIC Bond), #2 Exhibit B (FRE 1006 Summary - Outstanding G&C Invoices, #3 Exhibit C - G&C Check, #4 Exhibit D - Demand Letters, #5 Exhibit E - FRE 1006 Summary - Peoples Bank, #6 Exhibit F - Engagement Letter, #7 Exhibit G - Modified Engagement Letter, #8 Exhibit H - 2nd Modified Engagement Letter, #9 Exhibit I - FRE 1006 Summary - A&R Invoices)(Reference: 11-2566)(Courcelle, JoAnn) Modified on 12/4/2012 (my, ).
December 3, 2012 Filing 199 Memorandum by B&S Equipment Co., Inc. re #180 Minute Entry in Support of Claim for Invoice Balance, Interest, Attorney's Fees and Costs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2, #2 Exhibit 3 (Part 1), #3 Exhibit 3 (Part 2))(Reference: 11-2566)(Magness, Keith)
December 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: that the claims of Purchasing Incentives, LLC in the Interpleader Action instituted by U.S. Specialty Insurance Company in its Answer and Affirmative Defenses,First Counterclaim and Third Party Demand for Bill in the Nature of an Interpleader and for Injunctive Relief Doc. #34 are hereby dismissed without costs and without prejudice. Signed by Judge Stanwood R. Duval, Jr on 12/3/2012.(Reference: 11-2566 & 12-893)(swd)
December 3, 2012 Filing 197 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stanwood R. Duval, Jr: NON JURY TRIAL was scheduled on 12/3/2012. Parties have reached a settlement. Parties state the settlement on the record. Court shall prepare and issue a 60 day order of dismissal. (Court Reporter Cindy Usner.) (Reference: 11-2566)(swd)
December 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER granting #193 MOTION to Dismiss Party B&S by B&S Equipment Co., Inc., Cycle Construction Company, LLC, Kiewit Louisiana Co., Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America, U.S. Specialty Insurance Company with prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that B&S Equipment be dismissed from interpleader action by U.S. Specialty per doc #34 , each party to bear its own costs and attorneys fees Signed by Judge Stanwood R. Duval, Jr on 12/3/2012. (Reference: 11-2566)(swd)
December 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER denying as moot #84 Motion for Extension of Deadlines for Expert Reports. Signed by Judge Stanwood R. Duval, Jr on 12/3/2012.(Reference: 11-2566) (swd)
December 3, 2012 Filing 194 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III: Settlement Conference held on 12/3/2012. The case has settled. (Reference: 11-2566, 12-893)(my, )
November 30, 2012 Filing 193 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party B&S by B&S Equipment Co., Inc., Cycle Construction Company, LLC, Kiewit Louisiana Co., Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America, U.S. Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 11-2566)(Wynne, Douglass)
November 27, 2012 Filing 192 Reply to Purchasing Incentives, LLC's Trial Memorandum by U.S. Specialty Insurance Company (Reference: 11-2566)(my, )
November 27, 2012 Filing 191 Proposed Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law by U.S. Specialty Insurance Company. (Reference: 11-2566)(my, )
November 27, 2012 Filing 190 Trial Memorandum by U.S. Specialty Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Reference: 11-2566)(my, )
November 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER denying as moot #100 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Stanwood R. Duval, Jr on 11/19/2012. (Reference: 12-893)(my, )
November 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER granting #178 Motion to Dismiss Party. ORDERED that all claims of Gulf Coast Bulk Handling, LLC in these consolidated lawsuits, which lawsuits include case no. 2:11-cv-02566 and 2:12-cv-00893 against G&C Construction, LLC be and hereby are DISMISSED without prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys fees. Signed by Judge Stanwood R. Duval, Jr on 11/19/2012. (Reference: 11-2566, 12-893)(my, )
November 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER granting #177 Motion to Dismiss Party. ORDERED that all claims asserted in these consolidated lawsuits, which lawsuits include case no. 2:11-CV-02566 and 2:12-CV-00893, by Gulf Coast Bulk Handling, LLC against U.S. Specialty Insurance Company be and hereby are dismissed with prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that Gulf Coast Bulk Handling, LLC, be and is hereby dismissed from the Interpleader Action. FURTHER ORDERED that each party bear its own costs and attorneys fees.Signed by Judge Stanwood R. Duval, Jr on 11/19/2012. (Reference: 11-2566, 12-893)(my, )
November 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER granting #176 Motion to Dismiss Party. ORDERED that all claims of Gulf Coast Bulk Handling, LLC in these consolidated lawsuits, which lawsuit includes case no. 2:11-CV-02566 and 2:12-CV-00893, against Kiewit Louisiana Co. and Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America be and hereby are dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys fees.Signed by Judge Stanwood R. Duval, Jr on 11/19/2012. (Reference: 11-2566, 12-893)(my, )
November 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER granting #175 Motion to Dismiss Party. ORDERED that all claims asserted in this lawsuit by Louisiana Delta Marine, LLC against U.S. Specialty Insurance Company be and hereby are dismissed with prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that Louisiana Delta Marine, LLC, be and is hereby dismissed from the Interpleader Action. FURTHER ORDERED that each party bear its own costs and attorneys fees.Signed by Judge Stanwood R. Duval, Jr. (Reference: 11-2566)(my, )
November 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER granting #174 Motion to Dismiss Party. ORDERED that all claims of Louisiana Delta Marine, LLC in this lawsuit against Kiewit Louisiana Co. be and hereby are dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys fees.Signed by Judge Stanwood R. Duval, Jr on 11/19/2012. (Reference: 11-2566)(my, )
November 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER granting #173 Motion to Dismiss Party. ORDERED that all claims asserted in this lawsuit by Puckett Machinery Company against U.S. Specialty Insurance Company be and hereby are dismissed with prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that Puckett Machinery Company be and is hereby dismissed from the Interpleader Action. FURTHER ORDERED that each party bear its own costs and attorneys fees. Signed by Judge Stanwood R. Duval, Jr on 11/19/2012. (Reference: 11-2566)(my, )
November 19, 2012 Filing 182 MOTION to Dismiss Party Claims of G&C Construction, LLC against Kiewit Louisiana Co. by U.S. Specialty Insurance Company. Motion set for 12/12/2012 09:30 AM before Judge Stanwood R. Duval Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Notice of Submission)(Reference: 11-2566)(Kern, Jay) Modified on 11/20/2012 (my, ).
November 19, 2012 Filing 181 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #177 MOTION to Dismiss, #178 MOTION to Dismiss, #176 MOTION to Dismiss. **Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is Motion to Dismiss Party. Clerk took corrective action by changing the event. ALSO Filing attorney should have selected 'Yes' at the question 'Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion Y/N?'. Exparte/Consent motions are NOT set for submission. Clerk has removed submission date. ALSO Docs #176 and #177 -the caption must include a separate reference to list the case(s) to which the pleading pertains and the same case number(s) must be referenced in the docket entry. Please follow this requirement for all future filings.** (Reference: 11-2566, 12-893)(my, )
November 16, 2012 Filing 179 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #172 Objections. **In Consolidated Matters, the caption must list all case(s) that are consolidated together and include a separate reference to list the case(s) to which the pleading pertains and that same case number(s) must be referenced in the docket entry. If the caption does not specifically state the case(s) to which the pleading pertains, then all cases will be listed. Please follow this requirement for all future filings.** (Reference: 11-2566)(my, )
November 16, 2012 Filing 178 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss Party G&C Construction, LLC by Gulf Coast Bulk Handling, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: ALL CASES)(Hill, Mark) Modified on 11/19/2012 (my, ).
November 16, 2012 Filing 177 EXPARTE/CONSENT JOINT MOTION to Dismiss Party US Specialty Insurance Co. by Gulf Coast Bulk Handling, LLC, US Specialty Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: ALL CASES)(Hill, Mark) Modified on 11/19/2012 (my, ).
November 16, 2012 Filing 176 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss Party Kiewit and Travelers by Gulf Coast Bulk Handling, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: ALL CASES)(Hill, Mark) Modified on 11/19/2012 (my, ).
November 15, 2012 Filing 175 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Louisiana Delta Marine L.L.C. by Louisiana Delta Marine L.L.C., U.S. Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 11-2566)(Wynne, Douglass) Modified on 11/16/2012 (my, ).
November 15, 2012 Filing 174 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss Party Kiewit Louisiana Co. by Louisiana Delta Marine L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 11-2566)(Courcelle, JoAnn)
November 15, 2012 Filing 173 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Puckett Machinery Company by Puckett Machinery Company, U.S. Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 11-2566)(Wynne, Douglass) Modified on 11/16/2012 (my, ).
November 15, 2012 Filing 172 OBJECTIONS by Purchasing Incentives, LLC to Documents by U.S. Specialty Insurance Company (Reference: 2:11cv02566)(Pastuszek, Harry)
November 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER GRANTING re #166 MOTION to Withdraw Document re #146 MOTION to Continue Trial filed by G & C Construction, LLC. Signed by Judge Stanwood R. Duval, Jr on 11/15/2012. (Reference: 11-2566) (swd)
November 14, 2012 Filing 166 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Document re #146 MOTION to Continue Trial by G & C Construction, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 11-02566)(Harrison, Paul)
November 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER re: #142 Motion to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum; #143 Motion to Quash Depositions of G&C Construction, L.L.C.'s Representatives and for ProtectiveOrder; #148 Motion to Compel G&C Construction, L.L.C. to Respond to Request for Production of Documents, Produce G&C Construction, L.L.C.'s Representatives for a Deposition and for Sanctions under Rule 37(d). ORDERED that the Motions are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III on 11/14/12. (Reference: 11-2566)(plh, )
November 13, 2012 Filing 180 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stanwood R. Duval, Jr: Final Pretrial Conference held on 11/13/2012. The only matter proceeding to trial on 12/3/2012 is the claim of Purchasing Incentives, LLC against U.S. Specialty Insurance Co. and G&C Construction. LLC. Trial is estimated to last 1 - 2 days. This minute entry shall serve as the Pretrial Order for the trial. (Reference: 11-2566)(swd)
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER granting #156 Motion to Dismiss all claims asserted in this lawsuit by H&H Trucking, LLC against U.S. Specialty Insurance Company be and hereby are dismissed with prejudice;FURTHER ORDERED that each party bear its own costs and attorneys fees. Signed by Judge Stanwood R. Duval, Jr on 11/13/2012. (Reference: 11-2566)(swd)
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER granting #155 Motion to Dismiss all claims asserted in this lawsuit by Gulf Coast Material Management, Inc. against U.S. Specialty Insurance Company be and hereby are dismissed with prejudice; FURTHER ORDERED that each party bear its own costs and attorneys fees. Signed by Judge Stanwood R. Duval, Jr on 11/13/2012. (Reference: 11-2566)(swd)
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER granting #154 Motion to Dismiss all claims asserted in this lawsuit by Specialty Marine Services, Inc. against U.S. Specialty Insurance Company be and hereby are dismissed with prejudice; FURTHER ORDERED that each party bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Stanwood R. Duval, Jr on 11/13/2012. (Reference: 11-2566)(swd)
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER granting #153 Motion to Dismiss all claims asserted in this lawsuit by CJs Dump Trucks, Inc. against U.S. Specialty Insurance Company be and hereby are dismissed with prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that each party bear its own costs and attorneys fees. Signed by Judge Stanwood R. Duval, Jr on 11/13/2012. (Reference: 11-2566)(swd) (Main Document 167 replaced on 11/14/2012) (my, ).
November 13, 2012 Filing 164 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by G & C Construction, LLC re #148 MOTION to Compel MOTION to Produce MOTION for Sanctions (Motion to Compel G&C Construction, LLC to Respond to Request for Production of Documents, Produce G&C Construction, LLC's Representatives for a Deposition and for Sanctions Under Rule 37(d). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Reference: 11-2566)(plh, )
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER granting #157 Motion for Leave to File Memorandum in Opposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III on 11/13/12. (Reference: 11-2566)(plh, )
November 13, 2012 Filing 162 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #157 MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Compel. **Filing attorney did not include a proposed order. Proposed Order subsequently provided to Clerk and has now been attached to the motion. ALSO Motion will be before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III.** (Reference: 11-2566)(my, )
November 13, 2012 Filing 161 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #156 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party H&H Trucking, LLC . **Filing attorney did not select H&H Trucking, LLC as a filer. Clerk added filer.** (Reference: 11-2566)(my, )
November 13, 2012 Filing 160 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #155 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Gulf Coast Material Management, Inc. . **Filing attorney did not select Gulf Coast Material Management, Inc. as a filer. Clerk added filer.** (Reference: 11-2566)(my, )
November 13, 2012 Filing 159 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #154 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Specialty Marine Services, Inc. . **Filing attorney did not select Specialty Marine Services, Inc. as a filer. Clerk added filer.** (Reference: 11-2566)(my, )
November 13, 2012 Filing 158 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #153 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party CJ's Dump Trucks, Inc. . **Filing attorney did not select CJ's Dump Trucks, Inc. as a filer. Clerk added filer.** (Reference: 11-2566)(my, )
November 12, 2012 Filing 157 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Compel by G & C Construction, LLC. Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Notice of Submission)(Reference: 11-02566)(Harrison, Paul) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/13/2012: #6 Proposed Order) (my, ).
November 12, 2012 Filing 156 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party H&H Trucking, LLC by U.S. Specialty Insurance Company, H&H Trucking, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 11-2566)(Wynne, Douglass) Modified filers on 11/13/2012 (my, ).
November 12, 2012 Filing 155 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Gulf Coast Material Management, Inc. by U.S. Specialty Insurance Company, Gulf Coast Material Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 11-2566)(Wynne, Douglass) Modified filers on 11/13/2012 (my, ).
November 12, 2012 Filing 154 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Specialty Marine Services, Inc. by U.S. Specialty Insurance Company, Specialty Marine Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 11-2566)(Wynne, Douglass) Modified filers on 11/13/2012 (my, ).
November 12, 2012 Filing 153 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party CJ's Dump Trucks, Inc. by U.S. Specialty Insurance Company, CJ's Dump Trucks, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 11-2566)(Wynne, Douglass) Modified filers on 11/13/2012 (my, ).
November 8, 2012 Filing 152 Proposed Pretrial Order (Joint Pretrial Order) by B&S Equipment Co., Inc., G & C Construction, LLC, Louisiana Delta Marine L.L.C., Purchasing Incentives, LLC, U.S. Specialty Insurance Company (Reference: 11-2566)(Courcelle, JoAnn)
November 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER Setting ORAL Hearing on #148 MOTION to Compel. The #149 MOTION to Expedite is granted. ORDERED that the #148 MOTION to Compel SET FOR ORAL HEARING 11/14/2012 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles III. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III on 11/7/12.(Reference: 11-2566)(plh, )
November 6, 2012 Filing 150 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Louisiana Delta Marine L.L.C. re #142 MOTION to Quash Susbpoena Duces Tecum, #143 MOTION to Quash Depositions . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Kiewit Checks, #2 Exhibit B - ACH Transfer)(Reference: 11-2566)(Courcelle, JoAnn) Modified text on 11/7/2012 (clm, ).
November 6, 2012 Filing 149 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Motion to Compel by Louisiana Delta Marine L.L.C.. Motion(s) referred to Daniel E. Knowles, III. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Reference: 11-2566)(Courcelle, JoAnn) Modified text on 11/7/2012 (clm, ).
November 6, 2012 Filing 148 MOTION to Compel to Respond to Request for Production of Documents, MOTION to Produce Representatives for a Deposition , MOTION for Sanctions by Louisiana Delta Marine L.L.C.. Motion(s) referred to Daniel E. Knowles, III. Motion set for 11/28/2012 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles III. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - October 2, 2012 Email, #3 Exhibit B - October 2, 2012 Correspondence, #4 Exhibit C - October 3, 2012 Email, #5 Exhibit D - October 10, 2012 Email, #6 Exhibit E - October 12, 2012 Correspondence, #7 Exhibit F - Certificate, #8 Exhibit G - October 18, 2012 Correspondence, #9 Exhibit H - Kiewit Checks, #10 Exhibit I - ACH Transfer, #11 Notice of Submission)(Reference: 11-2566)(Courcelle, JoAnn) Modified on 11/7/2012 (clm, ).
November 6, 2012 Filing 147 EXPARTE/CONSENT Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Louisiana Delta Marine L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Reference: 11-2566)(Courcelle, JoAnn) Modified text on 11/7/2012 (clm, ).
November 2, 2012 Filing 146 MOTION to Continue Trial by G & C Construction, LLC. Motion set for 11/28/2012 09:30 AM before Judge Stanwood R. Duval Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Notice of Submission)(Reference: 11-02566)(Harrison, Paul)
October 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER Setting ORAL Hearing on #142 MOTION to Quash Susbpoena Duces Tecum, #143 MOTION to Quash Depositions : Motions set for ORAL HEARING 11/14/2012 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles III. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III on 10/29/12.(Reference: 11-2566)(plh, )
October 29, 2012 Filing 144 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #141 Return of Service (Non Summons & Complaint). **Document has been stricken pursuant to Rule 5(d) of the FRCP.** (Reference: 11-2566)(my, )
October 26, 2012 Filing 143 MOTION to Quash Depositions by G & C Construction, LLC. Motion(s) referred to Daniel E. Knowles, III. Motion set for 11/14/2012 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles III. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit, #3 Notice of Submission)(Reference: 11-2566)(Harrison, Paul)
October 26, 2012 Filing 142 MOTION to Quash Susbpoena Duces Tecum by G & C Construction, LLC. Motion(s) referred to Daniel E. Knowles, III. Motion set for 11/14/2012 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles III. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit, #3 Notice of Submission)(Reference: 11-2566)(Harrison, Paul)
October 26, 2012 Filing 141 **STRICKEN PURSUANT TO RULE 5(D) OF THE FRCP**Return of Service of Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information, or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action served on G&C Construction, LLC on 10/26/2012 by Louisiana Delta Marine L.L.C..(Reference: 11-2566)(Courcelle, JoAnn) Modified on 10/29/2012 (my, ).
October 25, 2012 Filing 140 Return of Service of Subpoena to Appear and Testify at a Hearing or Trial in a Civil Action (6/3/2013 Trial) served on Michael Thibodaux on October 22, 2012 by Louisiana Delta Marine L.L.C..(Reference: 11-2566)(Courcelle, JoAnn)
October 25, 2012 Filing 139 Return of Service of Subpoena to Appear and Testify at a Hearing or Trial in a Civil Action (12/3/2012 Trial) served on Michael Thibodaux on October 22, 2012 by Louisiana Delta Marine L.L.C..(Reference: 11-2566)(Courcelle, JoAnn)
October 23, 2012 Filing 138 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #137 Answer to Counterclaim. ****In Consolidated Matters, the caption must list all case(s) that are consolidated together and include a separate reference to list the case(s) to which the pleading pertains and that same case number(s) must be referenced in the docket entry. If the caption does not specifically state the case(s) to which the pleading pertains, then all cases will be listed. Please follow this requirement for all future filings. ALSO Filing attorney should have selected Yes at the prompt "Does this filing include a counterclaim ? (If yes, click on the box)". No further action necessary.** (Reference: 11-2566)(my, )
October 23, 2012 Filing 137 ANSWER to #34 Third Party Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against US Specialty Insurance Company by CJ's Dump Trucks, Inc..(Reference: 11;02566)(Vourvoulias, George) Modified on 10/23/2012 (my, ).
October 18, 2012 Filing 136 ANSWER to #76 Counterclaim , CROSSCLAIM against Kiewit Louisiana Co., Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America by U.S. Specialty Insurance Company.(Reference: 11-2566)(Caruso, Daniel) Modified on 10/18/2012 (my, ).
October 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER Settlement Conference set for 10/23/2012 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles III. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III.(Reference: 11-2566)(plh, )
October 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER granting #133 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery until 11/15/2012. Signed by Judge Stanwood R. Duval, Jr on 10/16/2012. (Reference: 11-2566) (swd)
October 15, 2012 Filing 133 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Motion to Extend Discovery Deadline) by Louisiana Delta Marine L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Reference: 11-2566)(Courcelle, JoAnn)
October 11, 2012 Filing 132 ANSWER to #112 Counterclaim, CROSSCLAIM against Kiewit Louisiana Co., Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America by U.S. Specialty Insurance Company.(Reference: 11-2566)(Caruso, Daniel) Modified on 10/12/2012 (my, ).
October 11, 2012 Filing 131 ANSWER to #107 Counterclaim by G & C Construction, LLC.(Reference: 11-02566)(Harrison, Paul) Modified on 10/11/2012 (my, ).
October 11, 2012 Filing 130 ANSWER to #76 Crossclaim by G & C Construction, LLC.(Reference: 11-02566)(Harrison, Paul) Modified on 10/11/2012 (my, ).
October 11, 2012 Filing 129 ANSWER to #80 Crossclaim by G & C Construction, LLC.(Reference: 11-02566)(Harrison, Paul) Modified on 10/11/2012 (my, ).
October 9, 2012 Filing 128 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #127 Statement of Corporate Disclosure. **Document has been stricken pursuant to Rule 5(d) of the FRCP.** (Reference: 11-2566)(my, )
October 8, 2012 Filing 127 **STRICKEN PURSUANT TO RULE 5(D) OF THE FRCP** Initial Disclosure Pursuant to Rule 26 by Specialty Marine Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Reference: 11-2566)(Fenton, Rebecca) Modified on 10/9/2012 (my, ).
October 8, 2012 Filing 126 ANSWER to #34 Third Party Complaint,Counterclaim , COUNTERCLAIM against U.S. Specialty Insurance Company by Specialty Marine Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Reference: 11-2566)(Fenton, Rebecca) Modified on 10/9/2012 (my, ).
October 5, 2012 Filing 125 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #124 Waiver of Service Executed. **Filing attorney entered incorrect service date for party. Specialty Marine Services, Inc waived service on 9/27/12, answer due 11/26/12. No further action is necessary.** (Reference: 11-2566)(my, )
October 5, 2012 Filing 124 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Specialty Marine Services, Inc. on 9/27/2012, answer due 11/26/2012. (Reference: 11-2566)(Caruso, Daniel) Modified svc info on 10/5/2012 (my, ).
October 2, 2012 Filing 123 ANSWER to #97 Counterclaim of Purchasing Incentives, LLC's , CROSSCLAIM against Kiewit Louisiana Co., Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America by U.S. Specialty Insurance Company.(Reference: 11-2566)(Caruso, Daniel) Modified on 10/3/2012 (my, ).
October 2, 2012 Filing 122 Amended and Supplemental ANSWER to #78 Cross-Claim/Counterclaim, CROSSCLAIM against Kiewit Louisiana Co., Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America by U.S. Specialty Insurance Company.(Reference: 11-2566)(Caruso, Daniel) Modified on 10/3/2012 (my, ).
September 28, 2012 Filing 121 ANSWER to #78 Crossclaim Gulf Coast Bulk Handling's Crossclaim and Bond Proceeds of Travelers by Kiewit Louisiana Co., Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America.(Reference: 11-2566)(LeBlanc, Beau)
September 28, 2012 Filing 120 ANSWER to #117 Crossclaim US Specialty's Crossclaim by Kiewit Louisiana Co., Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America.(Reference: 11-2566)(LeBlanc, Beau)
September 27, 2012 Filing 119 ANSWER to #80 Crossclaim B&S Crossclaim by Cycle Construction Company, LLC, Kiewit Louisiana Co., Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America.(Reference: 11-2566)(LeBlanc, Beau) Modified on 9/28/2012 (my, ).
September 26, 2012 Filing 118 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #117 Answer to Counterclaim, Crossclaim,**In Consolidated Matters, the caption must list all case(s) that are consolidated together and include a separate reference to list the case(s) to which the pleading pertains and that same case number(s) must be referenced in the docket entry. If the caption does not specifically state the case(s) to which the pleading pertains, then all cases will be listed. Please follow this requirement for all future filings.** (Reference: 11-2566)(my, )
September 26, 2012 Filing 117 ANSWER to #80 Counterclaim, of B&S Equipment, CROSSCLAIM against Kiewit Louisiana Co., Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America by U.S. Specialty Insurance Company.(Reference: 2:11-02566)(Caruso, Daniel) Modified on 9/26/2012 (my, ).
September 26, 2012 Filing 116 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #114 Answer to Counterclaim, Crossclaim, #115 Witness and Exhibit List. ****In Consolidated Matters, the caption must list all case(s) that are consolidated together and include a separate reference to list the case(s) to which the pleading pertains and that same case number(s) must be referenced in the docket entry. If the caption does not specifically state the case(s) to which the pleading pertains, then all cases will be listed. Please follow this requirement for all future filings.** (Reference: 11-2566)(my, )
September 25, 2012 Filing 115 Witness and Exhibit List by H&H Trucking, LLC. (Reference: 11-2566)(Giepert, Gary) (Main Document 115 replaced on 9/27/2012) (my, ).
September 25, 2012 Filing 114 ANSWER to #79 Counterclaim , CROSSCLAIM against Kiewit Louisiana Co., Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America by U.S. Specialty Insurance Company.(Reference: 11-2566)(Caruso, Daniel) Modified on 9/26/2012 (my, ).
September 25, 2012 Filing 113 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #112 Answer to Third Party Complaint. **In Consolidated Matters, the caption must list all case(s) that are consolidated together and include a separate reference to list the case(s) to which the pleading pertains and that same case number(s) must be referenced in the docket entry. If the caption does not specifically state the case(s) to which the pleading pertains, then all cases will be listed. Please follow this requirement for all future filings. ALSO Filing attorney should have answered yes at the prompt "does this filing include a crossclaim". Clerk has corrected party roles. No further action necessary.** (Reference: 11-2566)(my, )
September 24, 2012 Filing 112 ANSWER to #34 Third Party Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against U.S. Specialty Insurance Company by H&H Trucking, LLC.(Reference: 11-2566)(Giepert, Gary) (Main Document 112 replaced on 9/25/2012) (my, ). Modified text on 9/25/2012 (my, ).
September 21, 2012 Filing 111 Return of Service of Docs 34, 39, 46, 50, 51, 21 on Specialty Marine Services, Inc. Unable to locate.(Reference: 11-2566)(my, )
September 17, 2012 Filing 110 ANSWER to #78 Counterclaim, Crossclaim by U.S. Specialty Insurance Company.(Reference: 11-2566)(Caruso, Daniel) Modified text on 9/18/2012 (cms, ).
September 14, 2012 Filing 109 ANSWER to #34 US Specialty's Counterclaim and/or Third Party Demand, by Kiewit Louisiana Co., Cycle Construction Company, LLC. COUNTERCLAIM in Interpleader against U.S. Specialty Insurance Company, by Kiewit Louisiana Co., Cycle Construction Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Reference: 11-2566)(LeBlanc, Beau) Modified duplicate text on 9/17/2012 (mmm).
September 14, 2012 Filing 108 Kiewit's ANSWER to #76 CrossclaimLA Delta Marine's Crossclaim by Kiewit Louisiana Co.(Reference: 11-2566)(LeBlanc, Beau)
September 13, 2012 Filing 107 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint & AMENDED Counterclaim #5 against G & C Construction, LLC by Kiewit Louisiana Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Reference: 11-2566)(sek, )
September 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER granting #103 Kiewit Louisiana Co.'s Motion for Leave to File Amended and Supplemental Affirmative Defenses, Answer and Counterclaim. Signed by Judge Stanwood R. Duval, Jr on 9/13/12. (Reference: 11-2566)(sek, )
September 12, 2012 Filing 105 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #103 MOTION for Leave to File Amended & Supplemental Affirmative Defense, Answer & Counterclaim. **Filing attorney incorrectly changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the District Judge. Clerk took corrective action. ALSO In Consolidated Matters, the caption must list all case(s) that are consolidated together and include a separate reference to list the case(s) to which the pleading pertains and that same case number(s) must be referenced in the docket entry. If the caption does not specifically state the case(s) to which the pleading pertains, then all cases will be listed. Please follow this requirement for all future filings.** (Reference: 11-2566)(my, )
September 12, 2012 Filing 103 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Amended & Supplemental Affirmative Defense, Answer & Counterclaim by Kiewit Louisiana Co. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading, #3 Exhibit A to Proposed Pleading)(Reference: 11-2566)(LeBlanc, Beau) Modified on 9/12/2012 (my, ).
September 11, 2012 Filing 102 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Gulf Coast Bulk Handling, LLC re #100 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Reference: 12-893 document #30)(rll)
September 11, 2012 Filing 101 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by G & C Construction, LLC re #100 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts)(Reference: 12-893 document #26)(rll)
September 11, 2012 Filing 100 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Gulf Coast Bulk Handling, LLC. Motion set for 8/29/2012 09:30 AM before Judge Stanwood R. Duval Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Notice of Submission)(Reference: 12-893 document #24)(rll)
September 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER consolidating 11-2566 and 12-893. Signed by Judge Stanwood R. Duval, Jr on 9/11/2012.(swd)
September 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting #94 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #76 Counterclaim as to U.S. Specialty Insurance Company; answer due 10/1/2012. Signed by Judge Stanwood R. Duval, Jr on 9/11/12. (sek, )
September 11, 2012 Filing 97 ANSWER to #34 Third Party Complaint ,COUNTERCLAIM against U.S. Specialty Insurance Company by Purchasing Incentives, LLC.(Pittman, David) Modified on 9/12/2012 (my, ).
September 10, 2012 Filing 96 **DEFICIENT** AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint, #5 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, , COUNTERCLAIM against G & C Construction, LLC by Kiewit Louisiana Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(LeBlanc, Beau) Modified on 9/11/2012 (my, ).
September 10, 2012 Filing 95 Minute Entry: REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #84 MOTION for Extension of Deadlines For Expert Reports filed by U.S. Specialty Insurance Company. Objections to R&R due by 9/24/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III on 9/10/2012.(my, )
September 10, 2012 Filing 94 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #76 Counterclaim, by U.S. Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Durio, M.) Modified on 9/10/2012 (my, ).
September 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting #85 Motion to Enroll James D. Prescott, III as additional Counsel of Record for defendants, Kiewit Louisiana Co. and Travelers Casualty and Surety Co. of America. Signed by Judge Stanwood R. Duval, Jr. on 9/7/2012. (swd)
September 10, 2012 Filing 92 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by U.S. Specialty Insurance Company re #84 MOTION for Extension of Deadlines For Expert Reports. (sek, )
September 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting #90 Motion for Leave to File response to motion to extend deadlines of expert reports. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III on 9/10/12. (sek, )
September 7, 2012 Filing 104 ANSWER to #34 Third Party Complaint, by Gulf Coast Material Management, Inc.(Reference: 11-2566)(my, )
September 7, 2012 Filing 90 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File and Incorporated Memorandum in Support to file Reply Memorandum by U.S. Specialty Insurance Company. Motion(s) referred to Daniel E. Knowles, III. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading)(Caruso, Daniel)
September 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #84 MOTION for Extension of Deadlines For Expert Reports filed by U.S. Specialty Insurance Company Motion(s) referred to Daniel E. Knowles, III. Signed by Judge Stanwood R. Duval, Jr on 9/7/2012. NEF: Magistrate Judge Knowles. (swd)
September 7, 2012 Filing 88 **DEFICIENT**MEMORANDUM filed by U.S. Specialty Insurance Company re #84 MOTION for Extension of Deadlines For Expert Reports in Response to Opposition by Kiewit and Travelers. (Caruso, Daniel) Modified on 9/7/2012 (my, ).
September 6, 2012 Filing 87 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Kiewit Louisiana Co., Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America re #84 MOTION for Extension of Deadlines For Expert Reports . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(LeBlanc, Beau) Modified on 9/7/2012 (my, ).
September 6, 2012 Filing 86 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #84 MOTION for Extension of Deadlines For Expert Reports. **Name of attorney who electronically filed this document does not match name of signatory attorney on pleading. The user log-in and password serve as the required signature for purposes of Rule 11 of the FRCP. No further action is necessary.** (my, )
September 6, 2012 Filing 85 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record by Kiewit Louisiana Co., Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(LeBlanc, Beau)
September 6, 2012 Filing 84 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Deadlines For Expert Reports by U.S. Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Durio, M.)
September 6, 2012 Filing 83 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 81 Mail Returned. Document filed in wrong case. Document refiled in correct case. No further action required. (clm, )
September 5, 2012 Filing 82 ANSWER to #34 Third Party Complaint by Kiewit Louisiana Co., Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America.(LeBlanc, Beau) Modified on 9/6/2012 (my, ).
September 5, 2012 Filing 80 ANSWER to #34 Third Party Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America, Kiewit Louisiana Co., G & C Construction, LLC, Cycle Construction Company, LLC, COUNTERCLAIM against U.S. Specialty Insurance Company by B&S Equipment Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-5)(Magness, Keith) Modified on 9/6/2012 (my, ).
September 4, 2012 Filing 79 ANSWER to #34 Third Party Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against U.S. Specialty Insurance Company by Puckett Machinery Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Colomb, Paul) Modified on 9/5/2012 (my, ).
August 27, 2012 Filing 78 ANSWER to #34 U.S. Specialty Insurance Company's Answer and Third Party Complaint; CROSSCLAIM against Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America, Kiewit Louisiana Co., and COUNTERCLAIM against U.S. Specialty Insurance Company by Gulf Coast Bulk Handling, LLC.(Emmett, John) Modified on 8/31/2012 (blg).
August 22, 2012 Filing 77 Return of Service of Docs 34, 39, 46, 50, 51, 21 served on Puckett Machinery Company on 8/9/2012 by G & C Construction, LLC.(my, )
August 20, 2012 Filing 76 ANSWER to #34 Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim Affirmative Defenses and, CROSSCLAIM against G & C Construction, LLC, Kiewit Louisiana Co., COUNTERCLAIM against U.S. Specialty Insurance Company by Louisiana Delta Marine L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Supply Bond), #2 Exhibit B (Invoices & Billing Logs-Part 1), #3 Exhibit B (Invoices & Billing Logs-Part 2), #4 Exhibit C (Demands Upon G&C), #5 Exhibit D (Return Receipts), #6 Exhibit E (Initial Claim), #7 Exhibit F (Amended Claim), #8 Exhibit G (Second Amended Claim), #9 Exhibit H (Notices of Nonpayment (Part1), #10 Exhibit H (Notices of Nonpayment (Part 2), #11 Exhibit I (Affidavit), #12 Exhibit J (Amended Affidavit))(Duck, John) Modified on 8/21/2012 (my, ).
August 9, 2012 Filing 75 Return of Service of Docs 34, 39, 46, 50, 51, 21 served on Purchasing Incentives on 7/30/2012(my, )
August 9, 2012 Filing 74 Return of Service of Docs 34, 39, 46, 50, 51, 21 served on Cycle Construction, Co. on 7/24/2012.(my, )
August 9, 2012 Filing 73 Return of Service of Docs 34, 39, 46, 50, 51, 21 served on Gulf Coast Material Management, Inc. on 7/30/2012 (my, ).
August 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 71 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/16/2013 02:30 PM before Judge Stanwood R. Duval Jr. Bench Trial set for 6/3/2013 09:00 AM before Judge Stanwood R. Duval Jr. Signed by Clerk for Judge Stanwood R. Duval, Jr. on 8/9/2012. (Attachments: #1 PreTrial Notice Form) (swd)
August 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER GRANTED AND DENIED IN PART re #56 Joint MOTION to Continue Trial filed by Kiewit Louisiana Co., U.S. Specialty Insurance Company, G & C Construction, LLC. Bench Trial set for 6/3/2013 09:00 AM before Judge Stanwood R. Duval Jr.. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/16/2013 02:30 PM before Judge Stanwood R. Duval Jr. Case Manager for Section "K" shall issue a new Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Stanwood R. Duval, Jr on 8/8/2012. (swd)
August 7, 2012 Filing 72 Amended Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stanwood R. Duval, Jr: Status Conference held on 8/7/2012. (Court Reporter Karen Ibos.) (swd)
August 7, 2012 Filing 69 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stanwood R. Duval, Jr: Status Conference held in the Courtroom on 8/7/2012. (Court Reporter Karen Ibos) (swd)
August 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting #66 Motion to Enroll as Additional Counsel of Record for Attorney M. Claire Durio for U.S. Specialty Insurance Company as 3rd party plaintiff. Signed by Judge Stanwood R. Duval, Jr on 8/7/2012. (swd )
August 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting #65 Motion to Enroll as Additional Counsel of Record for Attorney Daniel J. Caruso for U.S. Specialty Insurance Company, 3rd party plaintiff. Signed by Judge Stanwood R. Duval, Jr on 8/7/2012. (swd)
August 6, 2012 Filing 66 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record by U.S. Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wynne, Douglass)
August 6, 2012 Filing 65 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record by U.S. Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wynne, Douglass)
August 6, 2012 Filing 64 Memorandum by B&S Equipment Co., Inc., Gulf Coast Bulk Handling, LLC, Gulf Coast Material Management, Inc., Louisiana Delta Marine L.L.C., Puckett Machinery Company, Purchasing Incentives, LLC, Specialty Marine Services, Inc. re #58 Status Conference, Set Hearings,, (Memorandum of Certain Claimants in Response to the Court's Minute Entry Dated August 1, 2012) (Duck, John)
August 3, 2012 Filing 63 Return of Service of Docs 34, 39, 46, 50, 51, 21 served on Louisiana Delta Marine, LLC on 7/30/2012 (my, ).
August 1, 2012 Filing 62 Return of Service of Docs 34, 39 served on H & H Trucking, L.L.C. on 7/23/2012 (my, ).
August 1, 2012 Filing 61 Return of Service of Docs 34, 39 served on Kiewit Louisiana Co. on 7/23/2012 (my, ).
August 1, 2012 Filing 60 Return of Service of Docs 34, 39 served on CJ's Dump Trucks, Inc. on 7/23/2012 by G & C Construction, LLC.(my, )
August 1, 2012 Filing 59 Return of Service of Docs 34, 39 served on B and S Equipment Co., Inc. on 7/23/2012 (my, ).
August 1, 2012 Filing 58 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stanwood R. Duval, Jr: Telephone Status Conference held on 8/1/2012. Status Conference (in person) set for 8/7/2012 03:00 PM before Judge Stanwood R. Duval Jr. Parties shall submit by 8/6/2012 by 12:00 p.m. to the Court in Chambers, brief memoranda addressing the issues to be discussed at the status conference. (swd)
July 30, 2012 Filing 57 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Louisiana Delta Marine L.L.C. re #56 Joint MOTION to Continue Trial (Opposition to the Joint Motion of G&C Construction, LLC, Kiewit Louisiana Co. and U.S. Specialty Insurance Company to Continue). (Duck, John)
July 27, 2012 Filing 56 Joint MOTION to Continue Trial by G & C Construction, LLC, Kiewit Louisiana Co., U.S. Specialty Insurance Company. Motion set for 8/22/2012 9:30 am before Judge Stanwood R. Duval Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Notice of Submission)(Wynne, Douglass) Modified sub date on 7/30/2012 (my, ).
July 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER re #52 Joint MOTION to Continue trial date, and extension of all deadlines set forth in Scheduling Order #21 filed by Kiewit Louisiana Co., U.S. Specialty Insurance Company, G & C Construction, LLC Telephone Status Conference set for 7/31/2012 01:30 PM before Judge Stanwood R. Duval Jr. Signed by Judge Stanwood R. Duval, Jr on 7/27/2012. (swd)
July 26, 2012 Filing 54 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Joint Motion to Continue by G & C Construction, LLC, Kiewit Louisiana Co., U.S. Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wynne, Douglass)
July 26, 2012 Filing 53 -DEFICIENT- NOTICE by G & C Construction, LLC, Kiewit Louisiana Co., U.S. Specialty Insurance Company re #52 Joint MOTION to Continue and Inc. Memorandum . (Wynne, Douglass) Modified on 7/27/2012 (ala, ).
July 25, 2012 Filing 52 -ERROR: DUPLICATE DOCUMENT- EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Continue and Inc. Memorandum by G & C Construction, LLC, Kiewit Louisiana Co., U.S. Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kern, Jay) Modified on 7/27/2012 (ala, ).
July 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting #46 Motion for Entry of Order Requiring United States Marshals to Serve Bill in the Nature of an Interpleader and Related Pleadings of U.S. Specialty Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Stanwood R. Duval, Jr on 7/10/2012. (swd) (attys to contact USM for service)
July 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #39 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. ORDER that $2,444.699.00 Interpleader Bond filed by U.S. Specialty be accepted and approved as set forth in doc. Signed by Judge Stanwood R. Duval, Jr on 7/10/2012. (swd)
July 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER - Court will treat re #39 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by U.S. Specialty Insurance Company as unopposed. Signed by Judge Stanwood R. Duval, Jr on 7/10/2012. (Attachments: #1 Letter 7/3/2012)(swd)
July 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #47 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to Louisiana Delta Marine L.L.C. answer due 7/26/2012. Signed by Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt for Judge Stanwood R. Duval, Jr. on 7/5/2012. (swd)
July 3, 2012 Filing 47 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #34 Counterclaim by Louisiana Delta Marine L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Duck, John) Modified text on 7/5/2012 (my, ).
July 3, 2012 Filing 46 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION Entry of Order Requiring United States Marshals to Serve Bill in the Nature of an Interpleader and Related Pleadings of U.S. Specialty Insurance Company by U.S. Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Clade, Susan)
June 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER finding as MOOT #37 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. See Order with respect to Doc. 44. Signed by Judge Stanwood R. Duval, Jr on 6/27/2012. (swd)
June 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #42 Motion to Substitute Attorney Paul E. Harrison for Plaintiff, G&C Construction, LLC. Attorney Carla T. Dillon and Mark D. Herbert terminated. Signed by Judge Stanwood R. Duval, Jr. on 6/27/2012 (swd)
June 27, 2012 Filing 43 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #42 MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Paul E. Harrison to be substituted in place of Mark D. Herbert and Carla T. Dillon . **Proposed Order included in Motion. For future filings, Proposed Order should only be an attachment to Motion. Clerk corrected filing by attaching Proposed Order to Main Document. No further action necessary.** (my, )
June 26, 2012 Filing 42 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Paul E. Harrison to be substituted in place of Mark D. Herbert and Carla T. Dillon by G & C Construction, LLC. (Harrison, Paul) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/27/2012: #1 Proposed Order) (my, ).
June 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #33 Motion to Compel. FURTHER ORDERED that the oral hearing set on June 27, 2012 is CANCELLED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III on 6/26/12. (plh, )
June 20, 2012 Filing 40 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #39 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . **Filing attorney should have selected 'No' at the question 'Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion Y/N? Motions that are set for hearing are not Exparte. Clerk has removed 'Exparte'. Motion set for 7/11/2012 9:30 am before Judge Stanwood R. Duval, Jr.** (my, )
June 19, 2012 Filing 39 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by U.S. Specialty Insurance Company. Motion set for 7/11/2012 9:30 am before Judge Stanwood R. Duval, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Interpleader Bond, #3 Proposed Order Restraining Order, #4 Notice of Submission)(Clade, Susan) Modified text on 6/20/2012 (my, ).
June 19, 2012 Filing 38 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #37 Ex Parte MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney . **Proposed Order included in Motion. For future filings, Proposed Order should only be an attachment to Motion.** (my, )
June 19, 2012 Filing 37 EXPARTE/CONSENT Ex Parte MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by G & C Construction, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dillon, Carla)
June 12, 2012 Filing 36 Summons Issued (Third Party) as to B&S Equipment Co., Inc., CJ's Dump Trucks, Inc., Cycle Construction Company, LLC, Gulf Coast Bulk Handling, LLC, Gulf Coast Material Management, Inc., H&H Trucking, LLC, Louisiana Delta Marine, LLC, Puckett Machinery Company, Purchasing Incentives, LLC, Specialty Marine Services, Inc., Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Summons B&S, #2 Summons CJ's, #3 Summons Cycle, #4 Summons Bulk, #5 Summons Gulf Coast, #6 Summons Delta, #7 Summons Puckett, #8 Summons Purchasing, #9 Summons Specialty, #10 Summons Travelers)(my, )
June 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Setting ORAL Hearing on #33 MOTION to Compel : Motion set for ORAL HEARING 6/27/2012 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles III. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III on 6/12/12.(plh, )
June 11, 2012 Filing 34 ANSWER to #26 Third Party Complaint First Counterclaim and, THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT and Second Counterclaim and Third Party Demand for Bill in the Nature of an Interpleader and for Injunctive Relief against Kiewit Louisiana Co., H&H Trucking, LLC, CJ's Dump Trucks, Inc., Louisiana Delta Marine, LLC, Gulf Coast Material Management, Inc., Puckett Machinery Company, Purchasing Incentives, LLC, Cycle Construction Company, LLC, B&S Equipment Co., Inc., Gulf Coast Bulk Handling, LLC, Specialty Marine Services, Inc.,Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America COUNTERCLAIM against Kiewit Louisiana Co. by U.S. Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Part 1, #2 Exhibit A - Part 2)(Kern, Jay) Modified text on 6/12/2012 (my, ).
June 11, 2012 Filing 33 MOTION to Compel by Kiewit Louisiana Co.. Motion(s) referred to Daniel E. Knowles, III. Motion set for 6/27/2012 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles III. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Notice of Submission)(LeBlanc, Beau)
May 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #31 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #26 Third Party Complaint as to U.S. Specialty Insurance Company answer due 6/11/2012. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk for Judge Stanwood R. Duval, Jr. on 5/16/2012. (blg)
May 15, 2012 Filing 31 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #26 Third Party Complaint by U.S. Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wynne, Douglass)
April 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #28 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #26 Third Party Complaint as to U.S. Specialty Insurance Company answer due 5/21/2012. Signed by Judge Stanwood R. Duval, Jr. (blg)
April 24, 2012 Filing 29 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #28 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer; Filing attorney should have selected 'Yes' at the question 'Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion Y/N?. Exparte/Consent motions are not set for hearing. Clerk has removed hearing date. (blg)
April 24, 2012 Filing 28 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer #26 Third Party Complaint by U.S. Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wynne, Douglass) Modified on 4/24/2012 (blg).
February 28, 2012 Filing 27 Summons Issued as to U.S. Specialty Insurance Company. (blg)
February 28, 2012 Filing 26 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against U.S. Specialty Insurance Company filed by Kiewit Louisiana Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(blg)
February 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Leave to File Third Party Complaint. Signed by Judge Stanwood R. Duval, Jr on 2/28/2012. (blg)
February 27, 2012 Filing 24 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Third Party Complaint by Kiewit Louisiana Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D)(Bland, David)
February 24, 2012 Filing 23 ***DEFICIENT - THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against U.S. Specialty Insurance Company filed by Kiewit Louisiana Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Bland, David) Modified on 2/27/2012 (blg).
February 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER AND OPINION granting #4 MOTION to Strike plaintiff G&C Construction, LLC's jury demand filed by Kiewit Louisiana Co. Signed by Judge Stanwood R. Duval, Jr on 2/23/2012.(blg)
January 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 8/30/2012 10:30 AM before Judge Stanwood R. Duval Jr. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/13/2012 01:30 PM before Judge Stanwood R. Duval Jr. Jury Trial set for 12/3/2012 08:30 AM before Judge Stanwood R. Duval Jr. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form)(blg)
January 10, 2012 Filing 20 NOTICE - Scheduling Conference set for 1/26/2012 10:00 AM before courtroom deputy by telephone, by Clerk. (blg)
December 29, 2011 Filing 19 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to #5 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, of Kiewit Louisiana by G & C Construction, LLC.(Dillon, Carla)
December 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Mark D. Herbert, and to designate Mark D. Herbert as Trial Attorney in place of Carla Tircuit Dillon. Signed by Judge Stanwood R. Duval, Jr on 12/21/2011. (blg)
December 20, 2011 Filing 17 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 053L-3321677), MOTION Change Designation of Trial Attorney by G & C Construction, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Affidavit)(Dillon, Carla)
December 14, 2011 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Kiewit Louisiana Co. re #4 MOTION to Strike Jury Demand. (blg)
December 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Stanwood R. Duval, Jr on 12/14/2011. (blg)
December 13, 2011 Filing 14 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiffs Response to Defendants Motion to Strike Jury Demand by Kiewit Louisiana Co.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Reply, #3 Proposed Order)(Bland, David)
December 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Douglas E. Walker. Signed by Judge Stanwood R. Duval, Jr on 12/7/2011. (blg)
December 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Carla T. Dillon for G & C Construction, LLC. Attorney Michael W. Mengis terminated. Signed by Judge Stanwood R. Duval, Jr on 12/7/2011. (blg)
December 6, 2011 Filing 11 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Carla Tircuit Dillon to be substituted in place of Michael W. Mengis by G & C Construction, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mengis, Michael)
December 6, 2011 Filing 10 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Douglas E. Walker (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 053L-3304705) by Kiewit Louisiana Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit of Douglas Walker, #3 Certificate of Good Standing from the Supreme Court of Florida)(Bland, David)
December 6, 2011 Filing 9 ***DEFICIENT - EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Carla Tircuit Dillon to be substituted in place of Michael W. Mengis by G & C Construction, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mengis, Michael) Modified on 12/6/2011 (blg).
December 6, 2011 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion filed by G & C Construction, LLC re #4 MOTION to Strike Jury Demand. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Tommy Cobb)(Mengis, Michael)
November 25, 2011 Filing 6 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #5 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim. Filing attorney attached a Statement of Corporate Disclosure to this filing instead of filing it as a separate entry. Clerk took corrective action by separating the statement and docketing it as a separate entry. All future statements of corporate disclosure must be filed separately. No further action is necessary. (rll, )
November 23, 2011 Filing 7 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Kiewit Louisiana Co. identifying Corporate Parent Kiewit Infrastructure South Co., Corporate Parent Kiewit Infrastructure Group Inc., Corporate Parent Kiewit Corporation for Kiewit Louisiana Co. (rll, )
November 23, 2011 Filing 5 AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against G & C Construction, LLC by Kiewit Louisiana Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Disclosure Statement)(Bland, David) Modified on 11/25/2011 to edit text (rll, ). STATEMENT OF CORPORATE DISCLOSURE DOCKETED SEPARATELY.
November 23, 2011 Filing 4 MOTION to Strike Jury Demand by Kiewit Louisiana Co.. Motion set for 12/14/2011 09:30 AM before Judge Stanwood R. Duval Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Proposed Order, #7 Notice of Submission)(LeBlanc, Beau)
November 22, 2011 Filing 3 **DEFICIENT** MOTION to Strike Jury Demand by Kiewit Louisiana Co.. Motion set for 12/14/2011 09:30 AM before Judge Stanwood R. Duval Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Notice of Submission)(LeBlanc, Beau) Modified on 11/22/2011 (plh, ).
October 12, 2011 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Stanwood R. Duval, Jr and Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III. (mmf, )
October 12, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Kiewit Louisiana Co. (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 053L-3229427) filed by G & C Construction, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mengis, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: G & C Construction, LLC v. Kiewit Louisiana Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: H&H Trucking, LLC
Represented By: Michael Steven Ricci
Represented By: Jack Anthony Ricci
Represented By: Gary John Giepert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Puckett Machinery Company
Represented By: Paul Kevin Colomb, Jr.
Represented By: Michael David Kurtz
Represented By: Douglass F. Wynne, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Purchasing Incentives, LLC
Represented By: Harry Platton Pastuszek, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Pittman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Cycle Construction Company, LLC
Represented By: David S. Bland
Represented By: James DeJean Prescott, III
Represented By: Beau E. LeBlanc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: B&S Equipment Co., Inc.
Represented By: Keith L. Magness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Gulf Coast Material Management, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph R. McMahon, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America
Represented By: David S. Bland
Represented By: James DeJean Prescott, III
Represented By: Beau E. LeBlanc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Louisiana Delta Marine L.L.C.
Represented By: JoAnn J. Courcelle
Represented By: John Michael Duck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: CJ's Dump Trucks, Inc.
Represented By: George P Vourvoulias, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Specialty Marine Services, Inc.
Represented By: Rebecca Fenton Henderson
Represented By: Tommy D. 985-Snyder, Jr.
Represented By: Stephen Kenneth Conroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: U.S. Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Daniel J. Caruso
Represented By: Howard Bruce Shreves
Represented By: M. Claire Durio
Represented By: Douglass F. Wynne, Jr.
Represented By: Jay Hirsch Kern
Represented By: Susan Faye Clade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Kiewit Louisiana Co.
Represented By: Douglas E. Walker
Represented By: David S. Bland
Represented By: James DeJean Prescott, III
Represented By: Beau E. LeBlanc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G & C Construction, LLC
Represented By: Michael W. Mengis
Represented By: Paul E. Harrison
Represented By: DeShea S. Richardson
Represented By: Mark D. Herbert
Represented By: Douglass F. Wynne, Jr.
Represented By: Jay Hirsch Kern
Represented By: Carla T. Dillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Gulf Coast Bulk Handling, LLC
Represented By: Mark Andrew Hill
Represented By: John F. Emmett
Represented By: Randolph J. Waits
Represented By: Matthew F Popp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated 3rd party defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Represented By: David S. Bland
Represented By: James DeJean Prescott, III
Represented By: Beau E. LeBlanc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: G&C Construction, LLC
Represented By: Natasha Z. Wilson
Represented By: Matthew Christopher Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?