Boice-Durant v. Kenner Police Dept, et al
Plaintiff: |
Timothy Boice-Durant |
Defendant: |
Thibodaux Police Department, Russel Brand, Kenner Police Dept, Unidentified Party and Orleans Parish Sheriff Department |
Case Number: |
2:2012cv00603 |
Filed: |
March 8, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana |
Office: |
New Orleans Office |
County: |
Out of State |
Presiding Judge: |
Alma L. Chasez |
Presiding Judge: |
Susie Morgan |
Nature of Suit: |
Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause of Action: |
18 U.S.C. § 1961 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 12, 2014 |
Filing
152
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 149 - IT IS ORDERED that plaintiff's suit be dismissed as frivolous, malicious and for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(I) and (ii) as outlined in the Report and Recommendation. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the pending motions in this case be dismissed as MOOT. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan.(bwn)
|
April 15, 2014 |
Filing
147
ORDER AND REASONS granting 122 and 135 Motions to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Party Steve Caraway and Marlin N. Gusman dismissed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the issue of frivolousness under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2) shall be referred to United States Magistrate Judge North for Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 4/15/2014. NEF to MJ5. (bwn)
|
February 18, 2014 |
Filing
128
ORDER denying 119 Motion to Stay and Motion for Sanctions by Timothy Boice-Durant. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Boice-Durant's request to inform the Court be and hereby is DENIED. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan. (bwn)
|
June 17, 2013 |
Filing
66
ORDER denying 50 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying 65 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. FURTHER ORDERED that no later that 8/1/13 pla shall file into the record a return of service demonstrating that service on dft Braud has been perfected under Rule 4(e). Failure to comply with this deadline will result in pla's claims against dft Braud being dismissed under Rule 4(m). Signed by Judge Susie Morgan. (cbn)
|
March 29, 2013 |
Filing
49
ORDER AND REASONS denying 42 Motion for Reconsideration. FURTHER ORDER granting in part 43 Motion for Reconsideration, as to plaintiff filing an amended complaint no later than 5/3/2013 at 5:00 pm, as stated herein. Failure to comply with this deadline will result in the dismissal of the plaintiff's claims against Mr. Brand. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 3/29/2013. (tsf)
|
March 28, 2013 |
Filing
47
ORDER & REASONS denying 36 Motion for Entry of Default and 37 Motion for Default Judgment. FURTHER ORDERED that Boice-Durant shall show good cause, in writing, why his claims against Mr. Brand should not be dismissed, pursuant to Rule 4(m), fo r failure to timely serve his complaint on Mr. Brand. Boice-Durants written response to this show cause order shall be filed no later than May 3, 2013, and the document must be received by this Court by May 3, 2013 to be considered timely.. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 3/28/2013. (gbw, )
|
August 7, 2012 |
Filing
31
ORDERED that 28 Motion to Dismiss be and hereby is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Boice-Durant's claims against the Thibodaux Police Departments be and hereby are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE for failure to state a claim upon whichrelief can be granted. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 8/7/2012. (clm, )
|
July 6, 2012 |
Filing
27
ORDER granting 10 Motion to Dismiss; granting 12 Motion to Dismiss Party. Party Kenner Police Dept and Orleans Parish Sheriff Department dismissed. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 7/5/12. (cbn)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?