Nola Ventures, LLC et al v. Upshaw Insurance Agency, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Nola Ventures, LLC, NOLA Restaurant Group, LLC and Critical Mass Holdings, LLC |
Defendant: |
Upshaw Insurance Agency, Inc. and Robert Bryan Bentley |
Case Number: |
2:2012cv01026 |
Filed: |
April 23, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana |
Office: |
New Orleans Office |
County: |
Jefferson |
Presiding Judge: |
Nannette Jolivette Brown |
Presiding Judge: |
Joseph C. Wilkinson |
Nature of Suit: |
Insurance |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 13, 2014 |
Filing
287
ORDER granting 285 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown. (Reference: 12-1026)(jrc)
|
September 23, 2014 |
Filing
230
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 72 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 9/22/14. (Reference: 12-1026)(jrc)
|
September 18, 2014 |
Filing
229
ORDER denying 71 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown. (Reference: 12-1026)(jrc)
|
March 19, 2013 |
Filing
31
ORDER & REASONS re dft Lexington Insurance Company's 23 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim: for the reasons stated, this Court finds that Louisiana law applies to Plaintiffs' claims against Lexington. Furthermore, Lexington has conceded that Plaintiffs have stated a cause of action under Louisiana law. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Lexington's Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 3/19/2013. (Reference: 12-1834)(rll, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Nola Ventures, LLC et al v. Upshaw Insurance Agency, Inc. et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Upshaw Insurance Agency, Inc. |
Represented By: |
John William Hite, III |
Represented By: |
Peyton C. Lambert |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Robert Bryan Bentley |
Represented By: |
John William Hite, III |
Represented By: |
Peyton C. Lambert |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Nola Ventures, LLC |
Represented By: |
Kristina L. Junot |
Represented By: |
P. Albert Bienvenu, Jr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: NOLA Restaurant Group, LLC |
Represented By: |
Kristina L. Junot |
Represented By: |
P. Albert Bienvenu, Jr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Critical Mass Holdings, LLC |
Represented By: |
P. Albert Bienvenu, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Kristina L. Junot |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?