Dixon v. Toyota Motor Credit Corporation et al

Defendant: Troy Campise and Toyota Motor Credit Corporation
Plaintiff: Landry Dixon
Case Number: 2:2012cv02150
Filed: August 27, 2012
Court: Louisiana Eastern District Court
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Orleans
Presiding Judge: Carl Barbier
Referring Judge: Sally Shushan
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 00:0000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 24, 2014 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER & REASONS: Before the Court is Plaintiff's Motion to Set Aside (Rec. Doc. 89) regarding the Court's granting of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Rec. Doc. 87) and the Court's entry of a final judgm ent in favor of Defendants (Rec. Doc. 88). The Court hereby construes this as a Motion for Reconsideration denying 89 Motion to Set Aside; ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Set Aside (Rec. Doc. 89) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 4/24/14. (Reference: 14-07)(sek)
April 10, 2014 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER & REASONS: granting 83 Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) (Civil Action No. 12-2150, Rec. Doc. 83) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all of Plaintiffs' claims against Toyota are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 4/10/14. (Reference: 14-07)(sek)
July 17, 2013 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER & REASONS: ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 7/17/13.(sek, )
June 19, 2013 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 24 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 6/18/13. (sek, )
January 8, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 13 Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Injunction. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 1/8/13. (sek, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dixon v. Toyota Motor Credit Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy Campise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Credit Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Landry Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?