Perez v. New Orleans City et al

Defendant: Ronal Serpas and New Orleans City
Plaintiff: Chad Perez
Case Number: 2:2012cv02280
Filed: September 14, 2012
Court: Louisiana Eastern District Court
Office: New Orleans Office
County: St Tammany
Presiding Judge: Carl Barbier
Referring Judge: Sally Shushan
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 30, 2016 157 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 142 ; IT IS ORDERED that: 1. Defendants' motion for sanctions (Rec. doc. 120) is GRANTED in PART and DENIED in PART as provided herein. 2. The claims asserted by the following plaintiffs are dismiss ed with prejudice: (1) Bernard Crowden; (2) Carlos Peralta; (3) Nathaniel Phillips; and (4) Jeremy Wilcox. 3. Defendants' motion for sanctions (Rec. doc. 120) is DENIED as to: (1) Catherine Beckett; (2) Aaron Blackwell; (3) Michael Cochran; (4) Christian Hart; (5) Jacob Lundy; (6) Desmond Pratt; and (7) Jeremy Smith. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 3/30/16.(sek)
March 24, 2016 155 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER & REASONS: ORDERED that Defendants' Motions in Limine (Rec. Doc. 130; Rec. Doc. 145) are GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss/Motion for Summary Judgment (Rec. Doc. 116) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Reply (Rec. Doc. 154) is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 3/24/16. (sek)
July 28, 2015 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER & REASONS: granting in part 82 Partial Motion to Dismiss; FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's claims arising between September 16, 2009 and April 6, 2011 are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 7/28/15. (sek)
April 7, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER & REASONS: granting 33 Motion to Certify Class; FURTHER ORDERED that the conditionally-certified class shall be defined as: "New Orleans Police Department officers denied earned overtime compensation and/or J&T time, beginning Septe mber 16, 2009." FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall produce the full names, last known addresses, telephone numbers, and email addresses of all potential class members, in both paper and electronic form accessible by Microsoft Office Suite, w ithin fourteen (14) days of this Order, or by Thursday, April 17, 2014. FURTHER ORDERED that the proposed Notice (Rec. Doc. 33-3) & the proposed Consent (Rec. Doc. 33-4) are hereby APPROVED. FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for the class shall transmi t the Notice and Consent form to all potential class members via U.S. mail and email, both work and personal (if available), within thirty (30) days, or by Monday, May 19, 2014. FURTHER ORDERED that potential class members may opt in to this collecti ve action if: (1) they have mailed, faxed, or emailed their Consent form to counsel for the class within sixty (60) days after the Notice and Consent forms have been mailed out to the class; or (2) they show good cause for any delay. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 4/4/14. (sek)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez v. New Orleans City et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronal Serpas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Orleans City
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Perez
Represented By: Eric John Hessler
Represented By: Michael W. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?