Melancon et al v. Great Southern Dredging, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Lynn Melancon, George Loupe, Jr., Dana Loupe, Anthony Fillinich, Nancy Fillinich and Louisiana Delta Oil Company LLC |
Defendant: |
Great Southern Dredging, Inc., L&A Contracting Company and United States of America |
Case Number: |
2:2012cv02455 |
Filed: |
October 5, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana |
Office: |
New Orleans Office |
County: |
Jefferson |
Presiding Judge: |
Sally Shushan |
Presiding Judge: |
Stanwood R. Duval |
Nature of Suit: |
P.I.: Other |
Cause of Action: |
46 U.S.C. ยง 30104 Marine Personal Injury |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 22, 2015 |
Filing
209
ORDER AND REASONS: ORDERED that judgment be entered ordering the Clerk of Court to distribute with interest accrued from the funds deposited into the Registry of the Court pursuant to this Courts order dated January 21, 2015 (Doc. 129 ) the amounts as stated herein. Signed by Judge Stanwood R. Duval, Jr on 6/22/2015.(Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
|
May 8, 2015 |
Filing
196
ORDER denying 142 Motion to Strike ; denying 147 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order; denying 147 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 147 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Stanwood R. Duval, Jr on 5/7/15. (Reference: all cases)(jrc)
|
March 9, 2015 |
Filing
151
ORDER denying 132 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Stanwood R. Duval, Jr. (Reference: 12-2761)(jrc)
|
June 6, 2013 |
Filing
64
ORDER AND REASONS DENYING 32 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Stanwood R. Duval, Jr on 6/6/2013. (Reference: 12-2761)(swd, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Melancon et al v. Great Southern Dredging, Inc. et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Lynn Melancon |
Represented By: |
Charles A. Cerise, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Francis V. Liantonio, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Kyle Potts |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: George Loupe, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Charles A. Cerise, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Francis V. Liantonio, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Kyle Potts |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Dana Loupe |
Represented By: |
Charles A. Cerise, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Francis V. Liantonio, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Kyle Potts |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Anthony Fillinich |
Represented By: |
Charles A. Cerise, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Francis V. Liantonio, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Kyle Potts |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Nancy Fillinich |
Represented By: |
Charles A. Cerise, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Francis V. Liantonio, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Kyle Potts |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Louisiana Delta Oil Company LLC |
Represented By: |
Charles A. Cerise, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Francis V. Liantonio, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Kyle Potts |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Great Southern Dredging, Inc. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: L&A Contracting Company |
Represented By: |
Kurt Stephen Blankenship |
Represented By: |
Christopher Michael Hatcher |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: United States of America |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?