Athletic Training Innovations LLC v. eTAGZ, Inc

Plaintiff: Athletic Training Innovations LLC
Defendant: eTAGZ, Inc
Case Number: 2:2012cv02540
Filed: October 18, 2012
Court: Louisiana Eastern District Court
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Nannette Jolivette Brown
Referring Judge: Joseph C. Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 30, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS denying as moot 9 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 1/30/2013. (cms, )
June 24, 2013 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER & REASONS re defendant eTagz's 16 Motion for Reconsideration requesting the Court to alter and amend its Order and Reasons (Rec. Doc. 15) denying dft's motion to dismiss: for the reasons stated, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that dft's Motion for Reconsideration is DENIED. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 6/24/2013. (rll, )
July 1, 2013 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER & REASONS re dft eTAGZ, Inc.'s 19 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction: for the reasons stated, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED and this action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 6/30/2013. (rll, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Athletic Training Innovations LLC v. eTAGZ, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Athletic Training Innovations LLC
Represented By: Kenneth L. Tolar
Represented By: J. Douglas Sunseri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: eTAGZ, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.