Cruz Mejia et al v. Brothers Petroleum, LLC et al
Plaintiff: |
Dania Gissell Cruz Mejia, Maria Elisa Bueso Mejia, Martha L. Martinez Balleza and Esther Sanchez Torres |
Defendant: |
Brothers Petroleum, L.L.C., Brothers Food Mart and Imad Faiez Hamden |
Case Number: |
2:2012cv02842 |
Filed: |
November 28, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana |
Office: |
New Orleans Office |
County: |
Jefferson |
Presiding Judge: |
Helen G. Berrigan |
Presiding Judge: |
Daniel E. Knowles |
Nature of Suit: |
Labor: Fair Standards |
Cause of Action: |
29 U.S.C. § 201 Denial of Overtime Compensation |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 30, 2019 |
Filing
284
ORDER AND REASONS: As stated herein, Defendants' 264 Motion to Extend the Stay is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 7/30/2019. (Reference: 12-02842)(mm)
|
September 9, 2015 |
Filing
211
ORDER GRANTING 208 MOTION to Continue trial and pretrial deadlines. It is FURTHER ORDERED that a trial date will be set when the stay in this matter is lifted. It is ORDERED that the limited stay imposed in the Court's December 11, 2014 is hereby converted into a complete stay of the proceedings. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the complete stay will remain in effect for a period of six (6) months from the date of this order, unless a material change in the criminal investigation or other circumstances indicate that the stay should be modified or lifted. All parties are ORDERED to notify the Court immediately if they become aware of any significant developments that warrant reconsideration of the complete stay. Status Conference set for 3/17/2016 02:30 PM before Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance.The parties shall be prepared to discuss with theCourt the status of the criminal investigation and the propriety of continuing the completestay.. Signed by Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance on 9/9/15.(Reference: ALL CASES)(jjs)
|
June 12, 2015 |
Filing
204
ORDER AND REASONS - plaintiff's motion 193 to conditionallycertify a collective action is DENIED.. Signed by Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance on 6/12/15. (Reference: 13-4831)(jjs)
|
June 9, 2015 |
Filing
202
ORDER AND REASONS granting LKM Defendants' Motion 168 to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and dismisses the LKM Defendants without prejudice. Plaintiffs will be allowed 21 (21) days from the date of this order to amend their complaint. Failure to timely amend the complaint will result in dismissal of plaintiffs' claims against the LKM Defendants with prejudice.. Signed by Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance on 6/9/15. (Reference: ALL CASES)(jjs)
|
February 13, 2015 |
Filing
185
ORDER that the 170 Motion for Protective Order is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III on 2/13/15. (plh) Modified doc type on 2/13/2015 (plh).
|
December 11, 2014 |
Filing
161
ORDER AND REASONS denying 128 Motion to lift the limited stay.. Signed by Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance on 12/11/14. (jjs)
|
September 3, 2014 |
Filing
107
ORDER AND REASONS granting in part and denying in part 88 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Helen G. Berrigan on 09/02/2014. (kac)
|
August 4, 2014 |
Filing
85
ORDER AND REASONS denying 73 Motion for Equitable Tolling. Signed by Judge Helen G. Berrigan on 8/4/2014. (kac)
|
July 16, 2014 |
Filing
79
ORDER AND REASONS granting 56 Motion to Proceed as a Collective Action and Facilitate Notice under 29 U.S.C. § 216(b). FURTHER ORDERED that the parties submit a completed proposed Notice of Collective Action Lawsuit and Opt-In Consent Form within 10 days from the date of this ordered. FURTHER ORDERED that defendants shall have 30 days to provide plaintiffs with a computer-readable data file containing all potential opt-in plaintiffs names, last known mailing addresses and email addresses. Signed by Judge Helen G. Berrigan on 07/15/2014. (kac)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?