Becnel et al v. Southland Rental Tools, Inc.

Defendant: Southland Rental Tools, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jason M. Becnel and Mark L. Becnel
Case Number: 2:2013cv00044
Filed: January 8, 2013
Court: Louisiana Eastern District Court
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Plaquemines
Presiding Judge: Kurt D. Engelhardt
Referring Judge: Joseph C. Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 18, 2014 195 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER and REASONS denying 66 Motion for Summary Judgment, as stated within document. Signed by Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt on 7/18/2014. (cbs)
March 21, 2014 188 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS denying 28 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt on 3/21/2014. (caa)
June 5, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER and REASONS - Presently before the Court is a motion to stay 10 urged by Defendant, Southland Rental Tools, Inc.. IT IS ORDERED that the motion is DENIED, as stated within document. Signed by Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt on 6/5/2013. (cbs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Becnel et al v. Southland Rental Tools, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southland Rental Tools, Inc.
Represented By: Philip Anthony Franco
Represented By: Jason Paul Mueller
Represented By: Victoria P. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason M. Becnel
Represented By: Micah John Fincher
Represented By: Celeste C. Laborde
Represented By: Joseph F. Lavigne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark L. Becnel
Represented By: Celeste C. Laborde
Represented By: Micah John Fincher
Represented By: Joseph F. Lavigne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?