Ainsworth v. Caillou Island Towing Company, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Tracy Ainsworth |
Defendant: |
Caillou Island Towing Company, Inc., Monteiro Fleet, Inc. and Monteiro Marine Services, Inc |
Case Number: |
2:2013cv00688 |
Filed: |
April 10, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana |
Office: |
New Orleans Office |
County: |
Terrebonne |
Presiding Judge: |
Nannette Jolivette Brown |
Presiding Judge: |
Joseph C. Wilkinson |
Nature of Suit: |
Marine |
Cause of Action: |
46 U.S.C. § 30104 Marine Personal Injury |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 25, 2013 |
Filing
71
ORDER AND REASONS denying 34 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 11/25/2013. (cms, )
|
November 14, 2013 |
Filing
60
ORDER & REASONS re dfts Caillou Island Towing Company, Inc., Monteiro Fleet, Inc. and Monteiro Marine Services, Inc.'s 35 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment: as set forth herein, after considering the pending motion, the memoranda in support, the memoranda in opposition, the record, and the applicable law, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 11/13/2013. (rll, )
|
October 21, 2013 |
Filing
38
ORDER & REASONS: Before the Court is Plaintiff Tracy Ainsworth's ("Plaintiff") "Unopposed Motion for Reconsideration of Defendants' Rule 12(c) Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings" (Rec. Doc. 33). After consideri ng the pending motion, the memorandum in support, the record, and the applicable law, for the reasons stated herein, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that "Unopposed Motion for Reconsideration of Defendants' Rule 12(c) Motion for Partial Judgment on th e Pleadings" (Rec. Doc. 33) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the portion of this Court's June 24, 2013 Order (Rec. Doc. 17) striking Plaintiff's request for punitive damages is VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the portions of this Court's June 24, 2013 Order (Rec. Doc. 17) striking Plaintiff's requests for lost future earning and loss of society damages remain unchanged. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 10/21/2013. (rll, )
|
June 24, 2013 |
Filing
17
ORDER AND REASONS that Defendants' Rule 12(c) Motion for Partial Judgment onthe Pleadings is GRANTED and Plaintiff's request for lost future earnings, loss of society damages, and punitive damages are STRICKEN from the complaint, as they are not recoverable here. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 6/24/2013. (cms, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?