Najor v. Plaquemines Clay Co., LLC et al
Plaintiff: |
Robert Najor |
Defendant: |
Plaquemines Clay Co., LLC and Hai Nguyen |
Case Number: |
2:2013cv05000 |
Filed: |
July 5, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana |
Office: |
New Orleans Office |
County: |
Out of State |
Presiding Judge: |
Carl Barbier |
Presiding Judge: |
Joseph C. Wilkinson |
Nature of Suit: |
Negotiable Instrument |
Cause of Action: |
15 U.S.C. § 1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 5, 2021 |
Filing
246
ORDER AND REASONS regarding 207 Motion for Summary Judgment and 211 Motion for Summary Judgment. IT IS ORDERED that Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to the Second and Third Claim for Relief: Single Business Enterprise a nd Alter Ego (Rec. Doc. 207) be GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to the Fourth Claim for Relief: Simulation (Rec. Doc. 209) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment on Acquisitive Prescription (Rec. Doc. 211) is DENIED as moot. Considering that the Court has now dismissed all claims brought by Plaintiff in this matter, Plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 11/5/21. (Reference: All Cases)(cg)
|
October 15, 2019 |
Filing
178
ORDER AND REASONS denying 146 Motion for Summary Judgment and 154 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 10/15/2019. (Reference: All cases)(cg)
|
April 15, 2019 |
Filing
141
ORDER AND REASONS granting in part and denying in part 130 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiff's first, sixth, and seventh claims to relief are DISMISSED with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, with respect to Plain tiff's fourth claim to relief, Plaintiff's claim that the 2002 transfer was an absolute nullity under article 2030 is DISMISSED with prejudice. However, the Court retains jurisdiction over Plaintiff's claim that the 2002 transfer was a simulation. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 4/15/2019. (Reference: All cases)(cg)
|
January 16, 2019 |
Filing
127
ORDER AND REASONS: Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint is before me. Record Doc. No. 117 . The motion is therefore granted as set forth in document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 1/16/2019.(Reference: All Cases)(mmv)
|
October 5, 2018 |
Filing
94
ORDER AND REASONS - IT IS ORDERED that the Motion for New Trial or Alternatively for Relief from Judgment (Rec. Doc. 84 ) is GRANTED, as set forth in document. The Court will schedule a telephone conference to discuss the status of this case. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 10/5/2018. (Reference: Both Cases)(sa)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?