Pan American Life Insurance Company v. Louisiana Acquisitions Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Pan American Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Louisiana Acquisitions Corp. and Inter-Continental Hotels Corporation
Case Number: 2:2013cv05027
Filed: July 9, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Orleans
Presiding Judge: Jay C. Zainey
Presiding Judge: Daniel E. Knowles
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 501 ORDER AND REASONS GRANTING 462 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. FURTHER ORDERED that 469 Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Attorneys' Fees is DENIED. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 1/7/2020. (jeg)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 444 ORDER AND REASONS: IT IS ORDERED that 417 Motion for Entry of Final Judgment and Motion to Stay is GRANTED; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 420 Motion to Reopen Case is DENIED; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 423 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is DISMISSED AS PREMATURE; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 428 Motion to Stay Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 10/25/2017. (ajn)
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 415 ORDER AND REASONS: IT IS ORDERED that 306 Motion for Summary Judgment by Inter-Continental Hotels Corp. and 308 Motion for Summary Judgment by Louisiana Acquisitions Corp. are GRANTED. PALIC's complaint is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE in its e ntirety. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 345 Motion for Summary Judgment against Inter-Continental Hotels Corp. and 347 Motion for Summary Judgment against Louisiana Acquisitions Corp are DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 367 Motion to Strike filed by Defendants is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 8/18/2017. (ajn)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 327 ORDER denying 316 MOTION for APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 2/22/2017. (ajn)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 315 ORDERED that 245 Motion for Sanctions is GRANTED in Part to the extent outline in document. PALIC shall comply with this Order no later than fifteen (15) days from the date of its entry. IT IS ORDERED that 246 Motion to Compel Deposition of Richard L. Solomons is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III on 12/9/2016. (cms)
October 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 312 Minute Entry Proceedings held before Judge Jay C. Zainey: Status Conference held on 10/7/2016. ORDERED that Plaintiff's 309 Motion to Strike is DENIED. The 310 Motion to Expedite is DENIED AS MOOT. FURTHER ORDERED that 306 MOTION f or Summary Judgment , 308 MOTION for Summary Judgment are RESET for 12/14/2016. FURTHER ORDERED that as to any filings greater than 100 pages in length, counsel for the filing party shall deliver a hard-copy to the Court's c hambers for the Court's use. The copy delivered must be printed from the Court's CM/ECF filing system so that each page contains the CM/ECF document header. The submission must be placed in a binder with all exhibits labeled and tabbed for the Court's ease of use. The exhibit section shall contain a table of contents. FURTHER ORDERED that the Jury Trial is set for 11/6/2017 08:30 AM before Judge Jay C. Zainey. and the Final Pretrial Conference is set for 10/5/2017 11:00 AM before Judge Jay C. Zainey. (clc)
May 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 287 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 163 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 5/18/16. (jrc)
July 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER that the 117 Motion to Compel is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that the 123 Motion to Compel is DISMISSED AS MOOT in part and DENIED in part as set forth in document. FURTHER ORDERED that the 140 Motion to Compel is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as set forth in document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III on 7/9/15. (plh) Modified doc type on 7/9/2015 (plh).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pan American Life Insurance Company v. Louisiana Acquisitions Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pan American Life Insurance Company
Represented By: George J. Fowler, III
Represented By: W. Jacob Gardner, Jr.
Represented By: Norman Charles Sullivan, Jr.
Represented By: Jon Wesley Wise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana Acquisitions Corp.
Represented By: Nancy Scott Degan
Represented By: Matthew A. Woolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inter-Continental Hotels Corporation
Represented By: Nancy Scott Degan
Represented By: Matthew A. Woolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?