In Re: The Matter of Marquette Transportation Company Gulf-Inland, LLC

Petitioner: Marquette Transportation Company Gulf-Inland, LLC
Case Number: 2:2013cv05114
Filed: July 19, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Sarah S. Vance
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 46:30504 Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER denying 121 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Marquette'smotion for a status conference is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 6/15/2016. (mmm)
April 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER AND REASONS - the Court finds that because John Tran was a nonseafarer killed in Texas's territorial waters, he is a "nonseafarer" for purposes of the Supreme Court's holding in Yamaha. Thus, Yamaha does not preclude the Tra n claimants from seeking pecuniary and non-pecuniary damages under Texas's wrongful death and survival statutes. The Court ORDERS the Tran claimants to file a memorandum clarifying what Texas state-law damages they are seeking from Marquette (be aring in mind that the Court has already dismissed all punitive damages claims with prejudice), and identifying the individuals whom they believe to be the appropriate claimants, by April 27, 2016 at 5:00 p.m. Marquette shall file any response by April 28 at 5:00 p.m.. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 4/26/16.(jjs)
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER AND REASONS granting 58 Motion by Marquette for Judgment on the Pleadings. The Tran claimants shall have five (5) days from the entry of this order to amend their claim that Marquette was negligent in hiring and retaining Kass as captain of the FATHER SEELOS. All other claims addressed in Marquette's motion are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE.. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 4/20/16. (jjs)
October 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER AND REASONS granting 32 MOTION to Stay. Scheduling Conference set for 10/30/2014 11:00 AM before courtroom deputy. Signed by Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance on 10/22/14.(jjs)
June 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER AND REASONS granting 24 Motion to Lift Stay. Signed by Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance on 6/19/14. (jjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: The Matter of Marquette Transportation Company Gulf-Inland, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Marquette Transportation Company Gulf-Inland, LLC
Represented By: Meredith W. Blanque
Represented By: Evans Martin McLeod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?