Hamed v. Chase Home Finance, LLC
Plaintiff: Walid Hamed
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2013cv05833
Filed: September 13, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: St Charles
Presiding Judge: Helen G. Berrigan
Presiding Judge: Alma L. Chasez
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER AND REASONS denying 23 Motion for Rehearing. Signed by Judge Helen G. Berrigan on 04/14/2014. (kac)
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER AND REASONS granting 15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Helen G. Berrigan on 02/03/2014. (kac, )
October 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER AND REASONS denying 9 Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Helen G. Berrigan on 10/17/2013. (kac, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hamed v. Chase Home Finance, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Michael David Ferachi
Represented By: Amanda Strickland Stout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walid Hamed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?