Mitchell v. Hood
Plaintiff: Kiana Aaron Mitchell
Defendant: Brett Hood
Case Number: 2:2013cv05875
Filed: September 19, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Orleans
Presiding Judge: Eldon E. Fallon
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER AND REASONS granting 153 Motion for Summary Judgment; FURTHER ORDERED that 167 Motion to Quash and 168 Motion to Expedite are dismissed as moot. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon. (lag)
December 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER & REASONS that the 118 Motion to Dismiss; 121 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; 125 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; 128 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction are DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the stay on discovery and discovery proceedings authorized by this Courts November 25, 2015, Order, R. Doc. 138, is hereby LIFTED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 12/2/15. (dno)
August 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER d& REASONS that Mitchell's 93 Motion to Amend Order and 94 Motion to Fix Attorney Fees and Costs are DENIED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 8/5/15. (dno)
May 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER & REASONS granting 68 Motion for Certification of Interlocutory Appeal pursuant to 28 USC 1292(b); granting 70 Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Appeal; granting 76 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon. (jtd)
April 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER & REASONS regarding the 46 MOTION to Strike Complaint as Amended Pursuant to Louisiana Code of Civil Procedure Article 971 filed by Ernestine Teena Anderson-Trahan. IT IS ORDERED that the parties have sixty days to conduct limited, specific discovery focused on the question of who made the statements on the postcard and who made and authorized the postcard. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 4/21/14.(dno)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchell v. Hood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brett Hood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kiana Aaron Mitchell
Represented By: Craig Bernard Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?