March 4, 2022 |
Filing
503
ORDER ADOPTING 499 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. IT IS ORDERED that the 487 Motion to Fix Attorney's Fees is granted in part and denied in part; Grill Holdings, LLC, shall pay CGH $56,679.27 in attorney's fees and expenses. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 3/4/2022.(Reference: All Cases)(cwa)
|
August 25, 2021 |
Filing
485
ORDER AND REASONS: For the foregoing reasons, the Motion to Alter or Amend 473 is GRANTED IN PART, as stated herein. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this Court's Order and Reasons (Doc. 470 ) is hereby AMENDED as identified herein. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a Judgment be rendered in favor of CGH on its breach of the License Agreement claim. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 08/25/2021. (Reference: All Cases)(am)
|
January 27, 2021 |
Filing
470
ORDER AND REASONS: granting in part and denying in part 414 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 435 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 442 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying 456 Motion for Sanctions, as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 1/27/2021. (Reference: All Cases)(am)
|
August 15, 2018 |
Filing
394
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the Report and Recommendations of the Magistrate Judge (Rec. Doc. 385 ) is ADOPTED in its entirety. Accordingly; IT IS ORDERED that CGH's Motion for Attorney Fees (Rec. Doc. 362 ) is GRANTED IN PART. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Chartres Grill, LLC and Grill Holdings, LLC be ordered to pay to CGH $22,362.56 in reasonable attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 8/14/2018.(Reference: All Cases)(sa)
|
April 17, 2018 |
Filing
357
FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo.(Reference: All Cases)(ecm)
|
March 7, 2018 |
Filing
347
ORDER AND REASONS denying 336 Motion for Reconsideration as set forth in Order. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. (Reference: All Cases)(ecm)
|
February 9, 2018 |
Filing
331
ORDER AND REASONS granting in part and denying in part 305 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 306 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 2/8/2018. (Reference: All Cases)(sa)
|
May 26, 2017 |
Filing
294
ORDER AND REASONS: Shwartz parties' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 236 is GRANTED with respect to Shwartz's claim that the Khodr parties' use of the registered Camellia Grill trademarks outside of Carrollton Avenue is a breach o f the License Agreement but DENIED in all other respects; the Khodr parties' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Trade Dress and Conversion 262 is GRANTED, the Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Damages 264 is GRANTED, and the Khodr parties' Rule 21 Motion to Drop Parties 266 is DENIED.Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 5/26/2017. (Reference: 13-6560 c/w 14-810; 14-837)(my)
|
October 17, 2016 |
Filing
245
ORDER AND REASONS. It is ORDERED that the 233 Motion to Quash is DENIED. The Khodr Parties shall supplement their response to the Shwartz Parties' request for financial statements of Chartres Grill, L.L.C. within ten days. Further, the Court declines to award sanctions. Oral argument scheduled on October 19, 2016, is cancelled. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (Reference: 15-3487)(gec)
|
July 10, 2015 |
Filing
204
ORDER AND REASONS granting 194 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 7/9/15. (Reference: All Cases)(ecm)
|
March 20, 2015 |
Filing
164
ORDER AND REASONS granting 76 MOTION for APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court. Camellia Grill Holdings, Inc.'s 65 Motion for Leave to File fourth Amended Petition is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 3/19/2015. (Reference: 14-810, 14-837)(ecm)
|
March 11, 2015 |
Filing
137
ORDERED that the motion of the Kohdr Parties to compel a further deposition of Mark Stein (Rec. doc. 109 ) is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan. (Reference: ALL CASES)(gec)
|
February 23, 2015 |
Filing
104
ORDERED that the motion of Camellia Grill Holdings, Inc., Camellia Grill, Inc. and Michael Louis Schwartz for protective order (Rec. doc. 93 ) is GRANTED in PART and DENIED in PART; and the motion of Camellia Grill Holdings, Inc., Camellia Gril l, Inc. and Michael Louis Schwartz for reconsideration (Rec. doc. 94 ) is GRANTED in PART and DENIED in PART. The Shwartz parties shall produce the federal tax returns for January 1, 2006 through June 2011 within seven calendar days of the entry of this order. Within seven calendar days of the entry of this order, Khodr shall produce the general ledger. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan. (Reference: ALL CASES)(gec)
|
August 20, 2014 |
Filing
50
ORDER AND REASONS denying 20 Motion to Remand; denying 11 Motion to Dismiss Case. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. (Reference: All Cases)(ecm)
|