Matthews et al v. Stolier et al
Plaintiff: Charles Matthews, WJLT, L.L.C., Camillus Specialty Hospital, L.L.C., Lazarus Healthcare, L.L.C., Louisiana Specialty Hospital, LLC, New Orleans Rehabilitation Hospital in Luling and Sherita Matthews
Defendant: Jack Stolier, Stephen M Sullivan, Sullivan Stolier, A Partnership, Sullivan Stolier and Resor, APLC, Sullivan Stolier Knight, L.C., Michael Schulze, Red River Healthcare Management Company, L.L.C., James Morgan, Connie Morgan, Jefferson LTAC, L.L.C., CNA Insurance Company and Unidentified Party
Case Number: 2:2013cv06638
Filed: December 12, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Lafayette
Presiding Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 278 ORDER AND REASONS granting 213 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. The state and federal securities laws claims against these Defendants are DISMISSED. The Court notes that it is considering granting summary judgment sua sponte pursuant to Rule 56(f) to the Morgan Defendants on the securities laws claims asserted against them. Accordingly, the parties are permitted to submit additional briefing as outlined in this Order. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. (ecm)
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER AND REASONS granting 248 , 249 Motions to Enjoin State Court Proceedings. Plaintiffs are ENJOINED from prosecuting the lawsuit filed against Jack Stolier on November 28, 2015, in the Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, entitled, Charles Matthews et al. v. Jack Stolier, No. 2015-11315, Division J, Section 5. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 8/5/16. (ecm) Modified document type on 8/8/2016 (ecm).
May 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER AND REASONS denying 228 MOTION for APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. (ecm)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER AND REASONS GRANTING IN PART 165 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Because the Court finds that amendment would be futile, Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant North River based in breach of fiduciary duty are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 12/29/2015. (my)
December 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER AND REASONS granting 166 , 184 Motions to Disqualify Counsel. Marie Riccio is DISQUALIFIED from further representation of Plaintiffs in this case. A status conference is SET for February 25, 2016, at 2:30 p.m. to discuss the status of the case with Plaintiff's new counsel. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. (Copy mailed to Plaintiffs) (ecm)
October 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER AND REASONS denying 163 MOTION for APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court. Plaintiff's 167 Motion to Expedite is granted. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. (ecm)
July 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER AND REASONS denying 117 Motion for Entry of Judgment pursuant to Rule 54(b) and 121 Motion for Reconsideration, as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. (ecm)
April 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER AND REASONS granting IN PART 81 Motion for Reconsideration, 95 Motion to Dismiss, and 97 Motion to Dismiss. All claims not specifically designated as surviving this Order are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. (ecm)
October 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER AND REASONS granting in part 20 , 42 , & 71 Motions to Dismiss. Plaintiffs are granted leave to amend their complaint within 20 days of this order for the sole purpose of remedying the deficiencies outlined herein. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. (ecm)
May 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER AND REASONS dismissing Defendant, CNA Insurance Company, without prejudice. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 5/6/14.(ecm) Modified document type on 5/7/2014 (ecm).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Matthews et al v. Stolier et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Matthews
Represented By: Marie Olympia Riccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WJLT, L.L.C.
Represented By: Marie Olympia Riccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Camillus Specialty Hospital, L.L.C.
Represented By: Marie Olympia Riccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lazarus Healthcare, L.L.C.
Represented By: Marie Olympia Riccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louisiana Specialty Hospital, LLC
Represented By: Marie Olympia Riccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New Orleans Rehabilitation Hospital in Luling
Represented By: Marie Olympia Riccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherita Matthews
Represented By: Marie Olympia Riccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Stolier
Represented By: Cassandra Hewlings
Represented By: Thomas P. Owen, Jr.
Represented By: Richard C. Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen M Sullivan
Represented By: Cassandra Hewlings
Represented By: Thomas P. Owen, Jr.
Represented By: Richard C. Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sullivan Stolier, A Partnership
Represented By: Cassandra Hewlings
Represented By: Thomas P. Owen, Jr.
Represented By: Richard C. Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sullivan Stolier and Resor, APLC
Represented By: Cassandra Hewlings
Represented By: Thomas P. Owen, Jr.
Represented By: Richard C. Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sullivan Stolier Knight, L.C.
Represented By: Cassandra Hewlings
Represented By: Thomas P. Owen, Jr.
Represented By: Richard C. Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Schulze
Represented By: Cassandra Hewlings
Represented By: Thomas P. Owen, Jr.
Represented By: Richard C. Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red River Healthcare Management Company, L.L.C.
Represented By: John Charles Duplantier
Represented By: Michael J. Vondenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Morgan
Represented By: John Charles Duplantier
Represented By: Michael J. Vondenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Morgan
Represented By: John Charles Duplantier
Represented By: Michael J. Vondenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson LTAC, L.L.C.
Represented By: Amy Dunn Hotard
Represented By: Marcelle P. Mouledoux
Represented By: Stephen Charles Resor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNA Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unidentified Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?