Marsala v. Mayo et al

Plaintiff: Charles E. Marsala
Defendant: Jacksonville Dining Concepts, A&S Recovery, Jerry Gabet, Michael Gray, Jerry L. Mayo and Scibmatt, LLC
Case Number: 2:2013cv06800
Filed: December 30, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Ouachita
Presiding Judge: Alma L. Chasez
Presiding Judge: Martin L.C. Feldman
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER & REASONS granting 72 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Party Gerald Gabet and Jacksonville Dining Concepts, LLC dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 10/6/2014. (caa)
September 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER & REASONS granting 59 Motion to Set Aside Default & denying 62 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 9/8/2014. (caa)
August 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER & REASONS granting 12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Party Scibmatt, LLC, A&S Recovery and Michael Gray dismissed. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 8/11/2014. (caa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marsala v. Mayo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacksonville Dining Concepts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A&S Recovery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Gabet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry L. Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scibmatt, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles E. Marsala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?